City of Parma v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: City of Parma
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Russell Portenoy, Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Perry Fine, Cephalon, Inc., Scott Fishman, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Lynn Webster, Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Inc., Actavis PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Watson Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv01872
Filed: September 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order and Notice of Party Dismissal as to Russell Portenoy without prejudice. Related document #53 . Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/21/2018. (K,K)
March 20, 2018 Filing 53 Amended Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) without prejudice filed by Russell Portenoy. (Spencer, S.)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order and Notice of Party Dismissal as to Russell Portenoy. Related document #51 . Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/20/2018. (K,K)
March 19, 2018 Filing 51 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by City of Parma. (s/ Paul J. Napoli, Spencer, S.)
December 11, 2017 Filing 50 Transfer Order from Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (MDL) transferring case to MDL 2804. (1:17-op-45001, Judge Dan A. Polster) (C,KA)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion to stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Related Doc #49 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/17/2017.(K,K)
November 17, 2017 Filing 49 Unopposed Motion to stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Rendon, Carole)
October 26, 2017 Filing 48 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Further Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by City of Parma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Staubus v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., 2:17-cv-122 (E.D. Tenn. Oct. 20, 2017))Related document(s) #37 .(Badala, Salvatore)
October 23, 2017 Filing 47 Notice of Joinder in Endo Health Solutions Inc.'s and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. Related document(s) #42 .(Blake, Jason)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #45 Notice and #46 Notice for joinder in Endo Health Solutions, Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/23/2017. (K,K)
October 23, 2017 Filing 46 Notice of Joinder in Endo Health Solutions, Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster. Related document(s) #42 . (Tarney, Tyler)
October 23, 2017 Filing 45 Notice of Joinder in Endo Health Solution Inc.'s and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Russell Portenoy. Related document(s) #42 .(Rauch, Jordan)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' Motions for joinder in Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand as to the Manufacturer and Physician Defendants. Related documents #43 , #44 . Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/23/2017.(K,K)
October 20, 2017 Filing 44 Motion (Notice) for joinder in Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand as to the Manufacturer and Physician Defendants filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Lifland, Charles) Modified text on 10/23/2017 (P,WL).
October 20, 2017 Filing 43 Motion (Notice) for joinder in Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand as to the Manufacturer and Physician Defendants filed by Defendant Actavis, Inc. Related document(s) #42 . (Greenwell, Stacey) Modified text on 10/23/2017 (P,WL).
October 20, 2017 Filing 42 Opposition to #37 Memorandum in Support of Motion to remand to State Court filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL Motion to Transfer In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation)(Coleman, Tera)
October 17, 2017 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Allergan PLC. (Daloia, Andrea)
October 17, 2017 Filing 40 Consent to Notice of Removal filed by Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC. (Daloia, Andrea) Modified text on 10/23/2017 (P,WL).
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Unopposed Motion that McKesson Corporation not be required to respond to complaint (Related Doc #38 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/10/2017.(K,K)
October 10, 2017 Filing 39 Attorney Appearance by Andrea B. Daloia filed by on behalf of Actavis, Inc.. (Daloia, Andrea)
October 9, 2017 Filing 38 Unopposed Motion that McKesson Corporation not be required to respond to complaint filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent)
October 6, 2017 Filing 37 Memorandum in Support of Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff City of Parma. (Climaco, John) Modified text on 10/10/2017 (P,WL).
September 29, 2017 Filing 36 Attorney Appearance by Albert J. Lucas filed by on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Lucas, Albert)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motions for appearance pro hac vice by attorneys Donna M. Welch, Jennifer G. Levy, Martin L. Roth, and Timothy W. Knapp for Actavis, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc # #31 , #32 , #33 , #34 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/25/2017.(K,K)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Marginal Order approving #30 Notice of Withdrawal filed by Margaret M. Metzinger. Attorney Margaret M. Metzinger terminated. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/25/2017. (K,K)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Brian M. Ercole for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #29 ) Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/25/2017.(K,K)
September 22, 2017 Filing 34 Motion for attorney Timothy W. Knapp to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8338389, filed by Defendant Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Greenwell, Stacey)
September 22, 2017 Filing 33 Motion for attorney Martin L. Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8338377, filed by Defendant Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Greenwell, Stacey)
September 22, 2017 Filing 32 Motion for attorney Jennifer G. Levy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8338367, filed by Defendant Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Greenwell, Stacey)
September 22, 2017 Filing 31 Motion for attorney Donna M. Welch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8338316, filed by Defendant Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Greenwell, Stacey)
September 22, 2017 Filing 30 Notice of withdrawal of Margaret M. Metzinger filed by City of Parma. (Metzinger, Margaret) Modified text on 9/25/2017 (P,WL).
September 22, 2017 Filing 29 Motion for attorney Brian M. Ercole to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8338017, filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Yanchar, Georgia)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motions for appearance pro hac vice by Paul J. Napoli, Joseph L. Ciaccio, and Salvatore C. Badala for City of Parma. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc # #26 , #27 , #28 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/22/2017.(K,K)
September 21, 2017 Filing 28 Motion for attorney Salvatore C. Badala to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8336241, filed by Plaintiff City of Parma. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verified Statement and Oath)(Climaco, John)
September 21, 2017 Filing 27 Motion for attorney Joseph L. Ciaccio to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8336231, filed by Plaintiff City of Parma. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verified Statement and Oath)(Climaco, John)
September 21, 2017 Filing 26 Motion for attorney Paul J. Napoli to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8336212, filed by Plaintiff City of Parma. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verified Statement and Oath)(Climaco, John)
September 21, 2017 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lewis, John)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motions for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Ingo W. Sprie, Jr. and Sean O. Morris for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Endo Health Solutions, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc # #23 , #24 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/21/2017.(K,K)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Steven A. Reed and Tinos Diamantatos for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc # #21 , #22 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/20/2017.(K,K)
September 19, 2017 Filing 24 Motion for attorney Sean O. Morris to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8332918, filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Rendon, Carole)
September 19, 2017 Filing 23 Motion for attorney Ingo W. Sprie, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8332801, filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Rendon, Carole) Modified attorney's name on 9/20/2017 (G,CA).
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion to withdraw as attorney; attorney J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. removed from case. (Related Doc #20 ) Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/19/2017.(K,K)
September 19, 2017 Filing 22 Motion for attorney Tinos Diamantatos to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8332012, filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing over 30 days old)(Yanchar, Georgia) Modified exhibit text on 9/20/2017 (G,CA).
September 19, 2017 Filing 21 Motion for attorney Steven A. Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8331970, filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing over 30 days old)(Yanchar, Georgia) Modified exhibit text on 9/20/2017 (G,CA).
September 19, 2017 Filing 20 Motion by J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. to withdraw as attorney filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order)(Yanchar, Georgia)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #19 Defendants' Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, and Lynn Webster's Unopposed Motion to stay the Date by Which They Are Required to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and for extension of time to answer Plaintiff's Complaint Sixty (60) Days Following Final Determination of Removal. Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/18/2017.(K,K) Modified text on 10/19/2017 (P,WL).
September 18, 2017 Filing 19 Unopposed Motion to stay the Date by Which They Are Required to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer Plaintiff's Complaint Sixty (60) Days Following Final Determination of Removal filed by Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hyzak, Daniel)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion to stay the Date By Which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and For an Extension of Time Pending Final Determination of Removal as to the Served Pharmaceutical Defendants (Related Doc #15 ). Answers are due 60 days after the final determination of removal. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/15/2017.(K,K)
September 14, 2017 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Allergan PLC for Actavis, Inc. filed by Actavis, Inc.. (Greenwell, Stacey)
September 14, 2017 Filing 16 Attorney Appearance by Stacey A. Greenwell and John R. Mitchell filed on behalf of Actavis, Inc. (Greenwell, Stacey) Modified text on 9/18/2017 (P,WL).
September 14, 2017 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion to stay the Date By Which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and For an Extension of Time Pending Final Determination of Removal as to the Served Pharmaceutical Defendants filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Tera)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Charles C. Lifland for Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Johnson & Johnson. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #14 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/14/2017.(K,K)
September 14, 2017 Filing 14 Motion for attorney Charles C. Lifland to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8325889, filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Charles Lifland, #4 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Lewis, John)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney R. Ryan Stoll and Patrick J. Fitzgerald for Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., and Purdue Pharma L.P. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #11 , #12 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/13/2017.(K,K)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion that Cardinal Health, Inc. Not be Required to Respond to Complaint (Related Doc #10 ). Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/13/2017.(K,K)
September 12, 2017 Filing 12 Motion for attorney R. Ryan Stoll to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8322798, filed by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Buckley, Daniel)
September 12, 2017 Filing 11 Motion for attorney Patrick J. Fitzgerald to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8322762, filed by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Buckley, Daniel)
September 12, 2017 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion that Cardinal Health, Inc. Not be Required to Respond to Complaint filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Murray, Joseph)
September 12, 2017 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Daniel J. Hyzak filed by on behalf of Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster. (Hyzak, Daniel)
September 12, 2017 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Bruce A. Moore filed by on behalf of Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster. (Moore, Bruce)
September 12, 2017 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Tyler G. Tarney filed by on behalf of Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster. (Tarney, Tyler)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Marginal Entry Order granting in part Defendant Portenoy's #5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer complaint and for an extension of time pending final determination of removal. The answer is due 60 days following the final determination of removal. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/11/2017.(K,K)
September 8, 2017 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer complaint and for an extension of time pending final determination of removal filed by Defendant Russell Portenoy. (Scheaf, O.)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion to withdraw as attorney; attorney David M. Cuppage removed from case. (Related Doc #4 ) Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/8/2017.(K,K)
September 8, 2017 Filing 4 Motion of David M. Cuppage to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff City of Parma. (Cuppage, David)
September 8, 2017 Notice to Attorney Salvatore C. Badala. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
September 8, 2017 Notice to Attorney Joseph L. Ciaccio. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
September 8, 2017 Notice to Attorney Paul J. Napoli. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
September 8, 2017 Notice to Attorney Charles C. Lifland. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
September 8, 2017 Notice to Attorney Brian M. Ercole. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
September 8, 2017 Notice to Attorney Steven A. Reed. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
September 8, 2017 Notice to Attorney J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
September 8, 2017 Notice to Attorney Tinos Diamantatos. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
September 8, 2017 Notice to Attorney R. Ryan Stoll. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
September 8, 2017 Notice to Attorney Patrick J. Fitzgerald. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
September 8, 2017 Notice to Attorney Sean O. Morris. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
September 8, 2017 Notice to Attorney Ingo W. Sprie, Jr. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
September 7, 2017 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,SR)
September 7, 2017 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (S,SR)
September 7, 2017 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (S,SR)
September 6, 2017 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Coleman, Tera)
September 6, 2017 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas, case number CV 17 884281 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8314264. Filer has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-cv-1639. Filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 State Court filings, #4 614 F.Supp.2d 868, #5 2017 WL 2843614, #6 2017 WL 3317300) (Coleman, Tera) Modified text on 9/7/2017 (S,SR).
September 6, 2017 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas, case number CV 17 884281 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8314264. Filer has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-cv-1639. Filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Complaint, # 3 State Court filings, # 4 614 F.Supp.2d 868, # 5 2017 WL 2843614, # 6 2017 WL 3317300) (Coleman, Tera) Modified text on 9/7/2017 (S,SR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Parma v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Vincent I. Holzhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Patrick J. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Jason J. Blake
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Albert J. Lucas
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Represented By: Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Represented By: Ingo W. Sprie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Represented By: O. Judson Scheaf, III
Represented By: S. Amy Spencer
Represented By: Jordan D. Rauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Jason J. Blake
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Albert J. Lucas
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Represented By: Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Hadden
Represented By: Joseph F. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Jason J. Blake
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Albert J. Lucas
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Represented By: Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Patrick J. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Represented By: Daniel J. Hyzak
Represented By: Bruce A. Moore
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Jason J. Blake
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Albert J. Lucas
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Represented By: Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fishman
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Represented By: Daniel J. Hyzak
Represented By: Bruce A. Moore
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Represented By: Ingo W. Sprie, Jr.
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Patrick J. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Jason J. Blake
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Represented By: Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Represented By: Daniel J. Hyzak
Represented By: Bruce A. Moore
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Albert J. Lucas
Represented By: Stacey A. Greenwell
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Albert J. Lucas
Represented By: Stacey A. Greenwell
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Albert J. Lucas
Represented By: Stacey A. Greenwell
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Jason J. Blake
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Albert J. Lucas
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Represented By: Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Parma
Represented By: Joseph L. Ciaccio
Represented By: Patrick G. Warner
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: David M. Cuppage
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Margaret M. Metzinger
Represented By: D. Scott Kalish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?