Richland County Children's Services v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Richland County Children's Services
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Actavis, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Mylan Specialty, L.P., Richard S. Sackler, Anda, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Beverly Sackler, Mallinckrodt PLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Mylan Pharms, Inc., Perry Fine, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Actavis PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., west-ward pharmaceuticals corp. k/n/a hikma pharmaceuticals, inc., Theresa Sackler, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Russell Portenoy, Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., David A. Sackler, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Scott Fishman, John N. Kapoor, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Miami-Luken, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Perdue Frederick Company, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Wal-Mart, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Kathe A. Sackler, Watson Pharma, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Jonathan D. Sackler, Noramco, Inc., Rite Aid Corp., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Lynn Webster, Prescription Supply Inc, The Kroger Co., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc. and Stuart D. Baker
Case Number: 1:2017op45003
Filed: October 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 42 Attorney Appearance by Scott D. Simpkins filed by on behalf of Richland County Children's Services. (Simpkins, Scott)
April 2, 2019 Filing 41 Notice of Withdrawal of Brian J. Laliberte filed by McKesson Corporation. (Laliberte, Brian)
March 26, 2019 Filing 40 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
March 18, 2019 Filing 39 Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) SpecGx LLC; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.; West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. k/n/a Hikma Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Mylan Specialty, L.P.; Mylan Pharms, Inc.; The Kroger Co.; CVS Health Corporation; Wal-Mart, Inc.; Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.; Rite Aid Corp.; Walgreen Co.; Prescription Supply Inc.; Richard S. Sackler; Jonathan D. Sackler; Mortimer D.A. Sackler; Kathe A. Sackler; Ilene Sackler Lefcourt; Beverly Sackler; Theresa Sackler; David A. Sackler; Rhodes Technologies; Rhodes Technologies Inc.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family; The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.; Stuart D. Baker; John N. Kapoor; Miami-Luken, Inc.; Mallinckrodt, LLC; Insys Therapeutics, Inc.; Mallinckrodt plc; Noramco, Inc.; Anda, Inc.; Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.; and Walgreen Eastern Co.. Filed by Richland County Children's Services. (Sacks, Shayna)
October 30, 2018 Filing 38 Attorney Appearance by Shayna Erin Sacks filed by on behalf of Richland County Children's Services. (Sacks, Shayna)
October 25, 2018 Filing 37 Attorney Appearance by Hunter J. Shkolnik filed by on behalf of Richland County Children's Services. (Shkolnik, Hunter)
October 5, 2018 Filing 36 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Alana Valle Tanoury and adding attorney Brian J. Laliberte filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Laliberte, Brian)
January 11, 2018 Filing 35 Attorney Appearance by Michael W. Czack filed by on behalf of Richland County Children's Services. (Czack, Michael)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Related Doc #34 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/17/2017.(K,K)
November 17, 2017 Filing 34 Unopposed Motion to stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Perdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Rendon, Carole)
November 15, 2017 Filing 33 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Richland County Children's Services. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1- Cardinal Health Notice)(Climaco, John)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motions for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Paul J. Napoli, Joseph L. Ciaccio, Salvatore C. Badala for Richland County Children's Services. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc # #30 , #31 , #32 ) Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/6/2017.(K,K)
November 6, 2017 Filing 32 Motion for attorney Salvatore C. Badala to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8400840, filed by Plaintiff Richland County Children's Services. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Statement and Oath)(Climaco, John)
November 6, 2017 Filing 31 Motion for attorney Joseph L. Ciaccio to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8400835, filed by Plaintiff Richland County Children's Services. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Statment and Oath)(Climaco, John)
November 6, 2017 Filing 30 Motion for attorney Paul J. Napoli to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8400817, filed by Plaintiff Richland County Children's Services. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Statement and Oath)(Climaco, John)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Charles C. Lifland for Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #29 ) Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/1/2017.(K,K) Modified text; notice regenerated 11/1/2017 (K,K).
October 31, 2017 Filing 29 Motion for attorney Charles C. Lifland to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8393522, filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Rice, Justin) Modified duplicate text on 11/1/2017. s/ by John Q. Lewis (G,CA).
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Jennifer G. Levy, Timothy W. Knapp, Donna M. Welch, Martin L. Roth for Actavis, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #25 . #26 , #27 , #28 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/31/2017.(K,K)
October 27, 2017 Filing 28 Motion for attorney Martin L. Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8388124, filed by Defendant Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Good Standing)(Daloia, Andrea)
October 27, 2017 Filing 27 Motion for attorney Donna M. Welch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8388116, filed by Defendant Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Good Standing)(Daloia, Andrea)
October 27, 2017 Filing 26 Motion for attorney Timothy W. Knapp to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8388105, filed by Defendant Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Good Standing)(Daloia, Andrea)
October 27, 2017 Filing 25 Motion for attorney Jennifer G. Levy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8388090, filed by Defendant Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Good Standing)(Daloia, Andrea)
October 25, 2017 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. Judge Christopher A. Boyko terminated. (P,WL)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment as related to 1:17CV1639 to Judge Dan Aaron Polster for all further proceedings. Judge Christopher A. Boyko and Dan Aaron Polster on 10/25/2017. (H,CM)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' Motions for extension of time to respond to complaint (Related Doc #'s #9 , #15 , #16 , #17 ). Defendants shall have 60 days from final determination on removal/remand to answer, respond or move. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/24/2017.(H,CM)
October 23, 2017 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Rice, Justin)
October 23, 2017 Filing 22 Notice of State Court Orders Filed on October 16, 2017 filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Granting Fine, et al. Motion for Extension, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order Granting McKesson Motion for Extension)(Holzhall, Vincent)
October 23, 2017 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent)
October 23, 2017 Filing 20 Attorney Appearance by Alana V. Tanoury filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Tanoury, Alana)
October 23, 2017 Filing 19 Attorney Appearance by Vincent I. Holzhall filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent)
October 23, 2017 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. Judge James S. Gwin terminated. (P,WL)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order of Recusal signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/23/17. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. (D,MA)
October 20, 2017 Filing 17 Unopposed Motion to stay the Date by which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and for an Extension of Time Pending Final Determination of Removal filed by Defendant Russell Portenoy. (Rauch, Jordan)
October 20, 2017 Filing 16 Unopposed Motion to stay the Date By Which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and For an Extension of Time Pending Final Determination of Removal as to the Pharmaceutical Defendants filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Tera)
October 20, 2017 Filing 15 Motion for extension of time until 21 days after remand to answer filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Murray, Joseph)
October 20, 2017 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Coleman, Tera)
October 20, 2017 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Corporate Parent Cupric Holding Co., Inc. for Cephalon, Inc.; Corporate Parent Orvet UK Unlimited, Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Holdings Cooperatieve U.A., Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Corporate Parent IVAX LLC, Corporate Parent Teva Ltd for Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. filed by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.. (Blake, Jason)
October 20, 2017 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion to reassign case to Judge Dan Aaron Polster filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Coleman, Tera)
October 20, 2017 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Blake, Jason)
October 20, 2017 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Jason J. Blake , Albert J. Lucas, and Georgia Yanchar filed by on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Blake, Jason)
October 18, 2017 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion to stay the Date by which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 60 Days Following Final Determination of Removal to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tarney, Tyler)
October 18, 2017 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr terminated. (S,SR)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 10/18/2017. (R,Sh)
October 18, 2017 Notice to Attorney Darrin c. Leist. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
October 17, 2017 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (W,Jo)
October 17, 2017 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (W,Jo)
October 17, 2017 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (W,Jo)
October 16, 2017 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Buckley, Daniel)
October 16, 2017 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Buckley, Daniel)
October 16, 2017 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Purdue Pharma Inc.. (Buckley, Daniel)
October 16, 2017 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Allergan PLC. (Daloia, Andrea)
October 16, 2017 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Allergan plc for Actavis, Inc. filed by Actavis, Inc.. (Daloia, Andrea)
October 16, 2017 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Richland County, case number 2017cv0662 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8370106.. Filed by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Part A: Richland County Record, #2 Exhibit 1-Part B: Richland County Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Buckley, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richland County Children's Services v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Jason J. Blake
Represented By: Albert J. Lucas
Represented By: Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Represented By: Stacey A. Greenwell
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Stacey A. Greenwell
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Alana V. Tanoury
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Represented By: Brian J. Laliberte
Represented By: Vincent I. Holzhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Specialty, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Bruce A. Moore
Represented By: Daniel J. Hyzak
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Represented By: Stacey A. Greenwell
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jason J. Blake
Represented By: Albert J. Lucas
Represented By: Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: west-ward pharmaceuticals corp. k/n/a hikma pharmaceuticals, inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Represented By: O. Judson Scheaf, III
Represented By: Jordan D. Rauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Jason J. Blake
Represented By: Albert J. Lucas
Represented By: Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph F. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Jason J. Blake
Represented By: Albert J. Lucas
Represented By: Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Jason J. Blake
Represented By: Albert J. Lucas
Represented By: Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fishman
Represented By: Bruce A. Moore
Represented By: Daniel J. Hyzak
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John N. Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Justin E. Rice
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Stacey A. Greenwell
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Justin E. Rice
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Jason J. Blake
Represented By: Albert J. Lucas
Represented By: Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Justin E. Rice
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Justin E. Rice
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Bruce A. Moore
Represented By: Daniel J. Hyzak
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prescription Supply Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richland County Children's Services
Represented By: Patrick G. Warner
Represented By: Scott D. Simpkins
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Darrin C. Leist
Represented By: Joseph L. Ciaccio
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. Czack
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: D. Scott Kalish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?