City of Huntington v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Plaintiff: City of Huntington
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Express Scripts Holding Company, Purdue Pharma L.P., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. f/k/a Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc., Beverly Sackler, Actavis Totowa LLC, Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC f/k/a Allergan, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Rhodes Technologies, Inc., Impax Laboratories, LLC, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Wal-Mart Stores East LP d/b/a Walmart Pharmacy Warehouse #46, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Theresa Sackler, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership II, Actavis Kadian LLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, David A. Sackler, Tasmanian Alkaloids Pty LTD, par pharm, Jonathan D. Sackler, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership I, Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Optum, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., KVK-Tech, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Rite Aid of West Virginia, Inc., West Virginia CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Walmart Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Richard S. Sackler, M.D., Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS Tennessee Distribution, LLC, Kathe A. Sackler, SpecGX LLC, Express Scripts, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse #45, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Actavis LLC, Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. fka Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. fka Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. and Allergan USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017op45054
Filed: December 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] - Pharmacy Defendants' Motion for Clarification (Doc. #: #128 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs may not proceed in the Track 2 cases with discovery against any severed defendants. As stated in other Orders, global discovery against the Pharmacy Defendants, including discovery of transactional data involving West Virginia, will proceed before this Court in Track 1B.. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 1/3/20.(P,R)
January 6, 2020 Filing 129 Suggestion of Remand. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 1/6/20. (P,R)
December 24, 2019 Filing 128 Motion to clarify Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Sever filed by CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS Tennessee Distribution, LLC, Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc., Rite Aid of West Virginia, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Walmart Inc., West Virginia CVS Pharmacy, LLC. Related document(s) #123 . (Moore, Kelly)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] - The Court construes Plaintiffs' notice of dismissal (docket no. #125 ) as a motion to dismiss certain claims. That motion is GRANTED. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 12/23/19. (P,R)
December 20, 2019 Filing 127 Answer to #80 Amended complaint with affirmative defenses filed by Cardinal Health Inc.. (Pyser, Steven)
December 20, 2019 Filing 126 Answer and Statement of Defenses to the Corrected Joint and Third Amended Complaint file by Cabell County Commission and the City of Huntington filed by McKesson Corporation. (Hobart, Geoffrey)
December 19, 2019 Filing 125 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of claims against AmerisourceBergen, Cardinal and McKesson filed by City of Huntington. (Kearse, Anne) Modified on 12/20/2019 (P,R).
December 19, 2019 Filing 124 Answer to #80 Amended complaint with Affirmative Defenses filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Nicholas, Robert)
December 16, 2019 Filing 123 Marginal Entry Order granting #122 Plaintiff's Motion to Sever. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 12/16/19.(P,R)
December 14, 2019 Filing 122 Motion to sever filed by Plaintiff City of Huntington. (Kearse, Anne)
December 12, 2019 Filing 121 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Rite Aid Corporation waiver sent on 12/12/2019, answer due 2/10/2020 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
December 9, 2019 Filing 120 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation. (P,R)
December 6, 2019 Filing 119 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by City of Huntington. (Attachments: #1 Summons Rite Aid Corporation, #2 Summons Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation)(Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 118 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. West Virginia CVS Pharmacy, LLC waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 117 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Warner Chilcott Company, LLC waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 116 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 115 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Walmart Inc. waiver sent on 10/3/2019, answer due 12/2/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 114 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Walgreen Co. waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 113 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 112 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Rite Aid of West Virginia, Inc. waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 111 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Rhodes Technologies, Inc. waiver sent on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 110 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. waiver sent on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 109 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. OptumRX, Inc. waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 108 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Optum, Inc. waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 107 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. KVK-Tech, Inc. waiver sent on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 106 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Impax Laboratories, LLC waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 105 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Express Scripts, Inc. waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 104 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Express Scripts Holding Company waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 103 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. CVS Tennessee Distribution, LLC waiver sent on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 102 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. CVS RX Services, Inc. waiver sent on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 101 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 100 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. CVS Health Corporation waiver sent on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 99 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Caremark RX, LLC waiver sent on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 98 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 97 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 96 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 95 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Allergan USA, Inc. waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 94 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Allergan Sales, LLC waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 93 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 92 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 91 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Actavis Totowa LLC waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 90 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Actavis South Atlantic LLC waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 89 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 88 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 87 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 86 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Actavis Kadian LLC waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 85 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Actavis Elizabeth LLC waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Kearse, Anne)
September 27, 2019 Filing 84 Attorney Appearance (CORRECTED) by Tina M. Tabacchi filed by on behalf of Walmart Inc.. (Tabacchi, Tina)
September 27, 2019 Filing 83 Attorney Appearance (CORRECTED) by Tara A. Fumerton filed by on behalf of Walmart Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
September 27, 2019 Filing 82 Attorney Appearance by Tina M. Tabacchi filed by on behalf of Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse, Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse #45, Wal-Mart Stores East LP d/b/a Walmart Pharmacy Warehouse #46, Walmart Inc.. (Tabacchi, Tina)
September 27, 2019 Filing 81 Attorney Appearance by Tara A. Fumerton filed by on behalf of Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse, Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse #45, Wal-Mart Stores East LP d/b/a Walmart Pharmacy Warehouse #46, Walmart Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
September 16, 2019 Filing 80 Third Amended complaint (Joint) against All Defendants. Filed by City of Huntington. (Kearse, Anne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 79 Third Amended complaint against All Defendants. Filed by City of Huntington. (Singer, Linda)
September 10, 2019 Filing 78 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KVK-Tech, Inc.. (Rice, Thomas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 77 Attorney Appearance by Thomas E. Rice, Jr filed by on behalf of KVK-Tech, Inc.. (Rice, Thomas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 76 Third Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Acatvis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa, LLC, Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC f/k/a Allergan Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Caremark Rx, LLC, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Rx Services, Inc., CVS Tennessee Distribution, LLC, Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Impax Laboratories, LLC, KVK-Tech, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals LP, Rhodes Technologies, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of West Virginia, Inc., Richard S. Sackler, M.D., Kathe A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, Theresa Sackler, David A. Sackler, Tasmanian Alkaloids Pty. Ltd., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse #45, Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, West Virginia CVS Pharmacy, LLC. Filed by City of Huntington. (Singer, Linda)
September 9, 2019 Filing 75 SEALED Document:Corrected Joint and Third Amended Complaint (for Case Track 2 Plaintiffs, Cabell County Commission and City of Huntington) filed by City of Huntington. Related document(s) #74 . (Kearse, Anne)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order - Plaintiff grated leave to file Third Amended Complaint under seal. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/9/19. (P,R)
March 26, 2019 Filing 73 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
March 15, 2019 Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. filed by Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
March 15, 2019 Filing 71 Attorney Appearance by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr filed by on behalf of Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
January 25, 2019 Filing 70 Initial Notice Regarding Potential Non-Party Fault Under W. Va. Code 55-7-13d filed by Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.. (McEnroe, Elisa)
January 4, 2019 Filing 69 Initial Notice Regarding Potential Nonparty Fault under W. Va. Code Section 55-7-13d filed by CVS Indiana, L.L.C.. (Delinsky, Eric)
November 5, 2018 Filing 68 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Purdue Pharma Inc. waiver sent on 7/16/2018 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Hurst, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 67 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 7/16/2018 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Hurst, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 66 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The waiver sent on 7/16/2018 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Hurst, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 65 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 8/7/2018 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Hurst, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 64 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. fka Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. fka Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 8/7/2018 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Hurst, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 63 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 7/10/2018 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Hurst, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 62 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. CVS Indiana, L.L.C. waiver sent on 9/10/2018 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Hurst, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 61 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 9/13/2018 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Hurst, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 60 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 9/13/2018, answer due 11/13/2018 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Hurst, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 59 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Noramco, Inc. waiver sent on 8/9/2018 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Hurst, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 58 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. SpecGX LLC waiver sent on 8/8/2018 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Hurst, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 57 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Mallinckrodt, LLC waiver sent on 8/18/2018 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Hurst, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 56 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Hurst, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 55 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. par pharm waiver sent on 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Hurst, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 54 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Hurst, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 53 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Endo Health Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Hurst, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 52 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. waiver sent on 7/23/2018 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Hurst, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 51 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 7/12/2018 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Hurst, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 50 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 7/11/2018 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Hurst, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 49 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Huntington. H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. waiver sent on 7/18/2018 filed on behalf of City of Huntington (Hurst, John)
September 19, 2018 Filing 48 Attorney Appearance by John D. Hurst filed by on behalf of City of Huntington. (Hurst, John)
May 25, 2018 Filing 47 Second Amended complaint City of Huntington, West Virginia against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) PURDUE PHARMA L.P., PURDUE PHARMA, INC., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., CEPHALON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., NORAMCO, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., MALLINCKRODT PLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC., SPECGX LLC; CVS INDIANA, L.L.C.; RITE AID MID-ATLANTIC CUSTOMER SUPPORT CENTER, INC.; KROGER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP I; KROGER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP II; WAL-MART STORES EAST D/B/A WAL-MART PHARMACY WAREHOUSE #46; WALGREEN EASTERN CO., INC.; AND H. D. SMITH WHOLESALE DRUG CO. Filed by City of Huntington. (Singer, Linda)
December 13, 2017 Filing 46 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern. Case number 3:17-cv-01362. Electronic file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 12, 2017 Filing 45 TRANSFER ORDER, JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Northern District of Ohio transferring this action to the USDC/NDOH for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair for the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 12/05/2017. (cc: attys)(rmc) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
December 11, 2017 Filing 44 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Joseph F. Rice on behalf of The City of Huntington. Local counsel: Charles R. "Rusty" Webb. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-6138118. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transaction Receipt from The West Virginia State Bar for $358.00 (USD))(Webb, Charles) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
December 5, 2017 Filing 43 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Transfer Order MDL 2804. (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
November 8, 2017 Filing 42 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Robert A. Nicholas on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. Local counsel: Adam J. Schwendeman. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-6091295. (Schwendeman, Adam) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
November 3, 2017 Filing 41 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Shannon E. McClure on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. Local counsel: Adam J. Schwendeman. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-6083885. (Schwendeman, Adam) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
October 24, 2017 Filing 40 MOTION by Meredith S. Auten to Withdraw Appearance on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Emch, A.) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
October 24, 2017 Filing 39 MOTION by Eric Sitarchuk to Withdraw Appearance on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Emch, A.) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's #18 MOTION to Remand to Circuit Court; directing that this action, insofar as it relates to Defendant Gregory Donald Chaney, is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge David A. Faber on 8/3/2017. (cc: counsel of record; unrepresented parties; Circuit Court of Cabell County, West Virginia) (jsa) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Plaintiff filed a #34 MOTION for voluntary dismissal of its complaint, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). On 7/24/2017, Plaintiff moved to withdraw its #35 MOTION to dismiss. Plaintiff's MOTION to withdraw is GRANTED and the motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 7/25/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mk) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #29 and #30 MOTIONS by Elizabeth P. Kessler and James R. Wooley to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. Attorney Elizabeth P. Kessler and James R. Wooley terminated. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 7/25/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mk) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 24, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE OF WITHDRAW by The City of Huntington of #34 MOTION by The City of Huntington to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the F.R.C.P. (Webb, Charles) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 34 MOTION by The City of Huntington to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the F.R.C.P. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order - Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2))(Webb, Charles) (Modified on 7/21/2017 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE Regarding Potential Nonparty Fault Under W.Va. Code 55-7-13d by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Schwendeman, Adam) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE Regarding Potential Nonparty Fault Under W.Va. Code 55-7-13d by McKesson Corporation (Holliday, Jason) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE Regarding Potential Non-Party Fault Under W. Va. Code 55-7-13d by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
May 11, 2017 Filing 30 MOTION by James R. Wooley to Withdraw Appearance on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order) (Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 5/12/2017 to remove # 11 link and to convert event to motion to withdraw as attorney) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
May 11, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION by Elizabeth P. Kessler to Withdraw Appearance on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 5/12/2017 to remove link to # 10 and convert event to motion to withdraw attorney) (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
May 2, 2017 Filing 28 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Eric Sitarchuk on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. Local counsel: Adam J. Schwendeman. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-5570435. (Schwendeman, Adam) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Order entered on April 26, 2017, the court scheduled a status conference for May 2, 2017, at 11:00 a.m., in Charleston in the following cases that have issues similar to the ones presented herein: 2:17-cv-01666, 3:17-cv-01665, 2:17-cv-01957, 3:17-cv-01962, 2:17-cv-02028, 2:17-cv-02296, and 5:17-cv-02311; if counsel in the cases herein wish to participate in the status conference, they are invited to do so. Signed by Judge David A. Faber on 4/27/2017. (cc: attys) (mkw) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER for reasons appearing to the Court, the referral of this civil action for discovery matters is transferred from the Honorable Cheryl A. Eifert, United States Magistrate Judge, to the Honorable Omar J. Aboulhosn, United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Clerk of Court Teresa L. Deppner on 4/24/2017. (cc: Magistrate Judge Eifert; Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn; counsel of record; any unrepresented party). (klc) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER for reasons appearing to the Court, this action is hereby REASSIGNED from the docket of the Honorable Robert C. Chambers, United States District Judge, to the docket of the Honorable David A. Faber, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk of Court Teresa L. Deppner on 4/5/2017. (cc: Judge Chambers, Judge Faber, all counsel of record, and any unrepresented party). (skh) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
March 29, 2017 Filing 24 OPPOSITION by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation to #18 MOTION by The City of Huntington to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Cabell County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 MOTION by The City of Huntington to Stay response deadline to #13 MOTION by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation to Dismiss Complaint, #15 MOTION by Cardinal Health, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint and Amended Complaint, #20 MOTION by McKesson Corporation for Judgment on the Pleadings and other pending case management deadlines; STAYING all deadlines pertaining to the said pending motions and STAYING deadlines set by this Court for the Rule 26(f) meeting; directing the parties to respond and reply to Plaintiff's #18 MOTION to Remand as directed by the federal rules; the Court will reset deadlines for responses and replies for the other pending motions, if necessary, after resolution of Plaintiff's motion. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/16/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
March 15, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION by The City of Huntington to Stay response deadline to #13 MOTION by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation to Dismiss Complaint, #15 MOTION by Cardinal Health, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint and Amended Complaint, #20 MOTION by McKesson Corporation for Judgment on the Pleadings and other pending case management deadlines re: #3 Order and Notice. (Webb, Charles) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
March 15, 2017 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by McKesson Corporation in support of #20 MOTION by McKesson Corporation for Judgment on the Pleadings (Wakefield, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
March 15, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION by McKesson Corporation for Judgment on the Pleadings (Wakefield, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
March 15, 2017 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by The City of Huntington in support of #18 MOTION by The City of Huntington to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Cabell County (Webb, Charles) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
March 15, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION by The City of Huntington to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Cabell County (Webb, Charles) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
March 2, 2017 Filing 17 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Meredith S. Auten on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. Local counsel: Adam J. Schwendeman. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-5390248. (Schwendeman, Adam) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
March 2, 2017 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by Cardinal Health, Inc. in support of #15 MOTION by Cardinal Health, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint and Amended Complaint attached to the #1 Notice of Removal (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
March 2, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION by Cardinal Health, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint and Amended Complaint attached to the #1 Notice of Removal (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
March 2, 2017 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation in support of #13 MOTION by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation to Dismiss Complaint attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Emch, A.) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
March 2, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation to Dismiss Complaint attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Emch, A.) (Modified on 3/3/2017 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (dvb) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
March 2, 2017 Filing 12 ANSWER TO Complaint attached to the #1 Notice of Removal by McKesson Corporation.(Wakefield, Jeffrey) (Modified on 3/3/2017 to add link to the # 1 notice of removal) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
February 27, 2017 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from James R. Wooley on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. Local counsel: Susan M. Robinson. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-5378502. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
February 27, 2017 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Elizabeth P. Kessler on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. Local counsel: Susan M. Robinson. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-5378486. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
February 27, 2017 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Steven M. Pyser on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. Local counsel: Susan M. Robinson. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-5377922. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
February 27, 2017 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Enu Abhilasha Mainigi on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. Local counsel: Susan M. Robinson. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-5377885. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
February 27, 2017 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from F. Lane Heard, III on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. Local counsel: Susan M. Robinson. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-5377824. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
February 27, 2017 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Wakefield, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
February 24, 2017 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant AmerisouceBergen Drug Corporation (Schwendeman, Adam) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
February 24, 2017 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 3/15/2017. Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/27/2017. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 4/3/2017. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 4/17/2017 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 4/24/2017. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 5/1/2017. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/24/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
February 23, 2017 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
February 23, 2017 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]
February 23, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation with summons, complaint, amended complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Cabell County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #0425-5366317. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, Part 1, #3 Exhibit B, Part 2, #4 Exhibit B, Part 3, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Huntington v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Huntington
Represented By: Joseph F. Rice
Represented By: Charles R. Webb
Represented By: John D. Hurst
Represented By: Anne McGinness Kearse
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Geoffrey Edward Hobart
Represented By: Jason L. Holliday
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Wakefield
Represented By: Matthew Michael Benov
Represented By: Matthew M. Benov
Represented By: Geoffrey E. Hobart
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Meredith S. Auten
Represented By: Robert A. Nicholas
Represented By: Eric W. Sitarchuk
Represented By: A. L. Emch
Represented By: Adam J. Schwendeman
Represented By: Shannon E. McClure
Represented By: Alvin L. Emch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: F. Lane Heard, III
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Represented By: Robert H. Akers
Represented By: James R. Wooley
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Kessler
Represented By: Steven M. Pyser
Represented By: Frank Lane Heard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. f/k/a Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC f/k/a Allergan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.
Represented By: Elisa P. McEnroe
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP d/b/a Walmart Pharmacy Warehouse #46
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana, L.L.C.
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark RX, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasmanian Alkaloids Pty LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: par pharm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of West Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Tara A. Fumerton
Represented By: Tina M. Tabacchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Tennessee Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse #45
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. fka Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. fka Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?