City of Chicago v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al.
Plaintiff: City Of Chicago
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis plc, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc., endo health solutions, Actavis Inc, DEPOMED, INC., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Allergan Finance, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis, Inc. and Watson Pharma, Inc.
Respondent: Linda Singer and Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
Intervenor: USA Today, Los Angeles Times and Chicago Tribune Company
Case Number: 1:2017op45169
Filed: December 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Out Of State
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Certified Suggestion of Remand, Conditional Remand Order, Stipulated Record of Remand, member case and master dockets provided electronically to the Northern District of Illinois on 12/30/19 (P,R)
December 30, 2019 Filing 692 Conditional Remand Order by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation remanding case to the Northern District of Illinois. (P,R)
December 24, 2019 Filing 691 Joint Stipulation of Designation of Remand Record filed by City Of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Singer, Linda)
December 19, 2019 Filing 690 Unredacted Fourth Amended Complaint filed by City Of Chicago. Related document(s) 331 , 477 , #168 , 327 , #478 , #186 , #395 , 165 , #669 , #328 , #673 , 167 , #672 .(Weinberger, Peter)
July 19, 2019 Filing 689 Supplement - Supplement to Position Paper Pursuant to the Court's June 24, 2019 Order Regarding ARCOS Data and Documents Previously Filed Under Seal, filed by City Of Chicago. (Singer, Linda)
August 24, 2018 Filing 688 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by City Of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ross County, Ohio Order)Related document(s) #684 .(Cabraser, Elizabeth)
July 25, 2018 Filing 687 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by City Of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kentucky Motion to Dismiss Order, #2 Exhibit B - Alaska Motion to Dismiss Order, #3 Exhibit C - New York Motion to Dismiss Order)Related document(s) #684 .(Cabraser, Elizabeth)
July 13, 2018 Filing 686 Reply in support of #671 Joint Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim / Manufacturer Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Lifland, Charles)
June 26, 2018 Filing 685 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. filed on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc. (B,R)
June 22, 2018 Filing 684 Opposition to #671 Joint Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim / Manufacturer Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by City Of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Singer, Linda)
June 1, 2018 Filing 683 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperatieve U.A., Corporate Parent IVAX LLC, Corporate Parent Teva Ltd, Corporate Parent Orvet UK Unlimited for Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.; Corporate Parent Cupric Holding Co., Inc., Corporate Parent Teva Phamaceutical Industries Ltd for Cephalon Inc. filed by Cephalon Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.. (Reed, Steven)
June 1, 2018 Filing 682 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Teva Phamaceutical Industries Ltd for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc.. (Reed, Steven)
May 31, 2018 Filing 681 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt LLC filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (O'Connor, Brien)
May 31, 2018 Filing 680 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
May 31, 2018 Filing 679 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Purdue Pharma Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
May 31, 2018 Filing 678 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Cheffo, Mark)
May 30, 2018 Filing 677 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Lifland, Charles)
May 30, 2018 Filing 676 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC. (Welch, Donna)
May 30, 2018 Filing 675 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC for Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Welch, Donna)
May 30, 2018 Filing 674 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Johnson & Johnson filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Lifland, Charles)
May 29, 2018 Filing 673 SEALED Document:Fourth Amended Complaint (corrected) filed by City Of Chicago. Related document(s) #668 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Singer, Linda)
May 29, 2018 Filing 672 Fourth Amended complaint (corrected/redacted) against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Mallinckrodt LLC. Filed by City Of Chicago. (Singer, Linda)
May 25, 2018 Filing 671 Joint Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim / Manufacturer Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Lifland, Charles)
May 18, 2018 Filing 670 Attorney Appearance by Justin Tresnowski filed by on behalf of City Of Chicago. (Tresnowski, Justin)
April 25, 2018 Filing 669 SEALED Document:Fourth Amended Complaint filed by City Of Chicago. Related document(s) #668 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Weinberger, Peter)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 668 Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion to strike ECF Doc. 257 and granting Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for leave to file Amended Complaints under seal (Related Doc # 260 ). Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804) on 4/25/2018. All documents relating to this matter have been filed in 17md2804.(B,R)
January 3, 2018 Filing 667 Attorney Appearance by Joseph F. Rice filed by on behalf of City Of Chicago. (Rice, Joseph)
December 22, 2017 Filing 666 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Illinois Northern. Case number 1:14-cv-04361. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 21, 2017 ELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to the Northern District of Ohio as case 1:17-op-45169, filed 12/21/2017. (ags, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 20, 2017 Filing 665 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #664 , #662 , #663 sent to Attorney Jason L Drori returned as: Other mail system problem. Mailed to attorney Jason L Drori a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (jk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 20, 2017 Filing 664 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Ohio the electronic record. (jjr, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 20, 2017 Filing 663 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: All matters relating to the referral of this action having been concluded, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned District Judge. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 20, 2017 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2804 Conditional Transfer Order filed 12/20/2017. (jjr, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 20, 2017 Filing 662 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to Northern District of Ohio. (jjr, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 661 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Minute entry dated 11/16/17 #659 is amended as follows: Status hearing held and continued to 1/9/18 at 9:00 a.m. Remainder of order to stand. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 660 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: In light of the stay granted by the assigned District Judge, the parties are no longer required to file a joint status report by December 1, 2017, or appear for a status hearing on December 5, 2017. The court will monitor the docket and issue a follow-up order when appropriate. Mailed notice (Kim, Young) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 659 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 1/19/18 at 9:00 a.m. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendants' motion to stay pending decision by JPML on a motion to transfer #639 is granted. Defendants' pending motions to dismiss #492 , #494 , #501 , #508 , #513 , and #639 are moot. Parties shall file a joint status report before the next status hearing. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 14, 2017 Filing 658 REPLY by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. to motion to stay, #639 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibit, #2 Exhibit 1)(Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 10, 2017 Filing 657 RESPONSE by City Of Chicagoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. to stay Pending Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multi #639 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 6, 2017 Filing 656 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Jane E. Dudzinski (Dudzinski, Jane) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 6, 2017 Filing 655 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Megan Rose Braden (Braden, Megan) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 6, 2017 Filing 654 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Jeremy A. Menkowitz (Menkowitz, Jeremy) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 6, 2017 Filing 653 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Brian M. Ercole (Ercole, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 3, 2017 Filing 652 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, and Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc's applications to appear pro hac vice #650 and #651 are granted. Attorneys Jeremy A. Menkowitz and Brian M. Ercole are given leave to file appearance forms on behalf of Defendants. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 3, 2017 Filing 651 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13756711. (Ercole, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 3, 2017 Filing 650 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13756621. (Menkowitz, Jeremy) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 649 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Tinos Diamantatos (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 648 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Steven A. Reed (Reed, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 647 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by J. Gordon Cooney, Jr (Cooney, J.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 646 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing held. Defendants' motion to stay pending decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a motion to transfer #639 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff's response shall be filed by 11/10/17. Defendants' reply in support shall be filed by 11/14/17. Defendants Acquired Actavis Entities' motion for substitution of counsel #643 is granted. Motion hearing date of 11/7/17 is stricken. Status hearing set for 11/16/17 at 9:00 a.m. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 645 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's motion to compel [ 623 #624 ] is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted to the extent that Janssen Defendants ("Janssen") are to add six of the ten custodians sought in Plaintiff's motion to Janssen's ESI search. There is ample information to establish that the accounts of these six custodians should be searched for the reasons argued by Plaintiff, but Janssen never explained to Plaintiff in detail why a search of their accounts would yield mostly duplicate documents and why Janssen is unable to de-dupe the search result to identify only unique documents. The motion is denied to the extent that Janssen is not required to search the accounts of the four support individuals with initials HM, CI, JH, and LB identified on page 4 of the motion. Although Plaintiff is correct that Janssen did not specify the exact burden it must bear to search these accounts, the information it has provided about them is sufficient for the court to find that spending resources looking into their electronic drawers is not sensible. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 31, 2017 Filing 644 NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion to substitute attorney #643 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/7/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 31, 2017 Filing 643 MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. to substitute attorney For Substitution of Counsel (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 31, 2017 Filing 642 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #635 is granted. Appearance is not necessary on November 2, 2017, to present this motion. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 30, 2017 Filing 641 NOTICE of Motion by R. Ryan Stoll for presentment of motion to stay, #639 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/2/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 30, 2017 Filing 640 MEMORANDUM by Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. in support of motion to stay, #639 Pending Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a Motion to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 30, 2017 Filing 639 MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. to stay Pending Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a Motion to Transfer (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 30, 2017 Filing 638 REPLY by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to motion to compel #624 (Ackerman, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 30, 2017 Filing 637 SEALED REPLY by City Of Chicago to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago 623 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Ackerman, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 30, 2017 Filing 636 NOTICE of Motion by David I. Ackerman for presentment of motion for leave to file #635 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 11/2/2017 at 11:00 AM. (Ackerman, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 30, 2017 Filing 635 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file Reply Memorandum Under Seal (Ackerman, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 634 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants ALLERGAN PLC and Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc's motion to withdraw as counsel #627 is granted. Attorney Jason R. Parish is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 633 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Motion and status hearing held by phone. Janssen Defendants' motion for leave to file under seal #629 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to compel [ 623 , #624 ] is entered and continued. Plaintiff has until October 30, 2017, to file its reply in support of its motion. The court will rule electronically. Parties are ordered to complete their discussions on ESI search terms by November 3, 2017. If there are any remaining issues, parties are to file a joint motion for a ruling on ESI search terms by November 13, 2017, with each side identifying the search terms they wish to use. Parties are ordered to also file a joint status report by December 1, 2017, identifying any other discovery disputes and including a chart showing the status of Plaintiff's subpoenas for records. A status hearing is scheduled for December 5, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. by phone. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 632 RESPONSE by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.in Opposition to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago 623 , MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to compel Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Include Relevant Custodians in its ESI Searches #624 (REDACTED) (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 631 SEALED RESPONSE by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago 623 , MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to compel Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Include Relevant Custodians in its ESI Searches #624 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 630 NOTICE of Motion by Charles C. Lifland for presentment of motion to seal #629 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 10/26/2017 at 11:00 AM. (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 629 MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Leave to File Opposition to Motion to Compel Under Seal. (Lifland, Charles) (Docket Text Modified on 10/24/2017 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 628 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a motion to compel under seal #621 is granted. Plaintiff has already filed the unredacted version of the motion as document No. 623 under seal and the redacted public version of the motion without exhibits as document No. 624. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 627 MOTION by Attorney Jason R. Parish to withdraw as attorney for ALLERGAN PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. No party information provided (Levy, Jennifer) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 626 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document # 623 , #621 , #624 , #622 , #625 sent to Attorney Jason R. Parish returned as: Unknown Address Error. The Clerk telephoned Jason R. Parish, no contact made. Mailed to attorney Jason R. Parish a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 625 NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of Sealed motion 623 , motion to compel #624 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 10/23/2017 at 02:00 PM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 624 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to compel Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Include Relevant Custodians in its ESI Searches (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 623 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 622 NOTICE of Motion by David I. Ackerman for presentment of motion to seal #621 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 10/23/2017 at 02:00 PM. (Ackerman, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 621 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for Leave to File the Motion to Compel Under Seal. (Ackerman, David) (Docket Text Modified on 10/18/2017 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 620 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's application to appear pro hac vice #619 is granted. Attorney David I. Ackerman is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Plaintiff. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 619 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13642637. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ackerman, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 27, 2017 Filing 618 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant Depomed, Inc.'s motion to withdraw as local counsel #616 is granted. Attorneys Mariah E Moran and David J. Stetler are given leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendant. Motion hearing date of 10/3/17 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 617 NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #616 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/3/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Moran, Mariah) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 616 MOTION by Attorney David J. Stetler and Mariah E. Moran to withdraw as attorney for DEPOMED, INC.. No party information provided (Moran, Mariah) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 21, 2017 Filing 615 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Kara Anne Elgersma (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Elgersma, Kara) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 20, 2017 Filing 614 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., and Purdue Frederick Company's applications to appear pro hac vice #611 and #612 are granted. Attorneys Hayden A. Coleman and Sheila L Birnbaum are given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of those Defendants. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 612 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13595263. (Sheila, Birnbaum) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 611 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13595171. (Coleman, Hayden) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 15, 2017 Filing 613 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #612 , #610 , #611 sent to Attorney Mark S Cheffo returned as:Unknown Address Error.Mailed to attorney Mark S Cheffo a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 15, 2017 Filing 610 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Allergan PLC, Actavis PLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.'s application to appear pro hac vice #609 is granted. Attorney Jason R. Parish is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 14, 2017 Filing 609 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13580014. (Parish, Jason) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 608 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., and Purdue Frederick Company's application to appear pro hac vice #607 is granted. Attorney Mark S. Cheffo is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of those Defendants. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 606 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Jennifer G. Levy Corrected (Levy, Jennifer) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 605 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Jennifer G. Levy (Levy, Jennifer) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 607 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark S. Cheffo Filing fee $ 50, Receipt Number: 4624188437. (eaa, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 604 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, Defendants' joint motion to compel #588 is granted. The motion is granted to the extent that Plaintiff will be required to respond to Defendants interrogatories and production requests seeking identification of the following after the close of party written discovery and third-party (except health care providers and patients) written discovery: (1) the prescription claims submitted to and paid for by Plaintiff that it asserts were medically unnecessary and to whom they were written; (2) the physicians or health care providers who wrote the prescriptions Plaintiff alleges to have been medically unnecessary; and (3) Plaintiff's basis for identifying the prescription claims to be "medically unnecessary." The court will set the response deadline at the next status hearing, if possible. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 603 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, Plaintiff's motion to compel #586 is granted. The motion is granted only to the extent that for the opioid products at issue in this litigation that the FDA approved or Defendants acquired prior to January 1, 2004, the time period for responding to Plaintiffs discovery requests for marketing plan documents, communications related to marketing plans, sales training materials, and marketing materials shall start on January 1, 2004. Defendants must also provide their products' launch plans and communications relating to the launch plans. For the opioid products that the FDA approved or Defendants acquired after January 1, 2004, the time period for responding to Plaintiffs discovery requests for marketing plan documents, communications related to marketing plans, sales training materials, and marketing materials shall start one year prior to the product's approval or acquisition date. Defendants (including Endo to the extent that it has agreed to produce documents), shall have until October 23, 2017, to comply with this order. A status hearing is scheduled for October 23, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. by phone for an update on written discovery. The conference call number for the status hearing is (877) 336-1839 and the passcode is 4333213. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 18, 2017 Filing 602 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' application to appear pro hac vice #601 is granted. Attorney Jennifer Levy is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 601 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13485100. (Levy, Jennifer) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's office on 8/16/2017. [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 600 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Timothy William Knapp (Knapp, Timothy) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 599 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Martin Louis Roth (Roth, Martin) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 598 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Donna M. Welch (Welch, Donna) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 9, 2017 Filing 597 REPLY by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to motion to compel,, #588 in Support of Their Joint Motion to Compel Phased Identification of the Medically Unnecessary Claims at Issue (Attachments: #1 Index of Supplemental Exhibits, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E)(Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 9, 2017 Filing 596 REPLY by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to motion to compel #586 re. temporal scope of discovery (Nelson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 9, 2017 Filing 595 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Bryan D Pasciak (Pasciak, Bryan) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 4, 2017 Filing 594 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Parties' agreed motion for an extension of time to file reply briefs #592 is granted. Appearance is not required on August 10, 2017, to present this motion. Parties now have until August 9, 2017, to file their reply in support of their motion to compel. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 4, 2017 Filing 593 NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #592 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 8/10/2017 at 12:00 PM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 4, 2017 Filing 592 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for extension of time to file response/reply (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 2, 2017 Filing 591 RESPONSE by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to compel - Temporal Scope of Discovery #586 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Declaration of Robert S. Hoff, #9 Hoff Decl. Exhibit 1, #10 Hoff Decl. Exhibit 2, #11 Hoff Decl. Exhibit 3, #12 Hoff Decl. Exhibit 4, #13 Hoff Decl. Exhibit 5, #14 Hoff Decl. Exhibit 6, #15 Declaration of Matthew Day)(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 2, 2017 Filing 590 MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago in Opposition to motion to compel,, #588 and The City of Chicago's Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Phased Identification of the Medically Unnecessary Claims at Issue (ECF 588) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Motion in Janssen Litigation), #2 Exhibit B (Order in Eli Lilly Litigation), #3 Exhibit C (Order in janssen Litigation))(Doyle, Thomas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 25, 2017 Filing 589 STATEMENT by Plaintiff City Of Chicagoin Support of MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to compel - Temporal Scope of Discovery #586 -- Amendment to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Temporal Scope of Discovery) (ECF 586) (Doyle, Thomas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 588 MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to compel Phased Identification of the Medically Unnecessary Claims at Issue (Joint) (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Appendix 1)(Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 587 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Charles Nelson for presentment of motion to compel #586 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 8/21/2017 at 02:00 PM. (Nelson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 586 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to compel - Temporal Scope of Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Nelson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 12, 2017 Filing 585 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's motion for extension of time #583 is granted. Appearance is not necessary on July 17, 2017, to present this motion. The court adopts the parties' amended agreed briefing schedule for motions to compel written discovery as follows: (1) motions to compel are now due by July 19, 2017; (2) responses to the motions are now due by August 2, 2017; and (3) replies thereto are now due by August 7, 2017. The August 21, 2017 hearing date to stand. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 11, 2017 Filing 584 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Charles Nelson for presentment of extension of time #583 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 7/17/2017 at 11:00 AM. (Nelson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 11, 2017 Filing 583 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for extension of time for briefing the motions to compel written discovery (Nelson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 28, 2017 Filing 582 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Endo Health Solutions and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s motion to withdraw appearance of counsel #580 is granted. Attorney Melissa A Ku is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants. Motion hearing date of 7/13/17 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 27, 2017 Filing 581 NOTICE of Motion by Joshua M. Davis for presentment of motion to withdraw #580 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/13/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 27, 2017 Filing 580 MOTION by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to withdraw appearance of Melissa Ku (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 23, 2017 Filing 579 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion to withdraw the appearance of Michael J. Dolesh as one of its counsel #577 is granted. Attorney Michael J. Dolesh is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. Motion hearing date of 7/11/17 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 578 NOTICE of Motion by Fiona A Burke for presentment of motion to withdraw #577 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/11/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 577 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to withdraw the appearance of Michael J. Dolesh as one of its counsel (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 20, 2017 Filing 576 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Ana M. Francisco (Francisco, Ana) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 19, 2017 Filing 575 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' application to appear pro hac vice #574 is granted. Attorney Ana M. Francisco is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., and Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 16, 2017 Filing 574 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13286827. (Francisco, Ana) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 16, 2017 Filing 573 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Today's status hearing is cancelled. The court adopts the parties' agreed briefing schedule for motions to compel written discovery as follows: (1) motions to compel are due by July 12, 2017; (2) responses to the motions are due by July 26, 2017; and (3) replies thereto are due by July 31, 2017. A hearing on the motions will take place on August 21, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 1019, if the court does not rule on the motions electronically before then. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 15, 2017 Filing 572 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Sean O. Morris (Morris, Sean) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 13, 2017 Filing 571 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' Endo Health Solutions and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s application to appear pro hac vice #570 is granted. Attorney Sean O. Morris is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 1, 2017 Filing 570 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13236917. (Morris, Sean) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 26, 2017 Filing 569 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant Endo Health Solutions's motion to withdraw as attorney #567 is granted. Attorney Peter Vincent Baugher is given leave to withdrawn as counsel for Defendant. Motion hearing date of 6/7/17 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 25, 2017 Filing 568 NOTICE of Motion by Peter Vincent Baugher for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #567 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 6/7/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 25, 2017 Filing 567 MOTION by Attorney Peter V. Baugher to withdraw as attorney for Endo Health Solutions. No party information provided (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 24, 2017 Filing 566 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/8/17 before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy LaBella, 312-435-6890, NLaBella.ilnd@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/14/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2017. (Labella, Nancy) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 24, 2017 Filing 565 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2/27/17 before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy LaBella, 312-435-6890, NLaBella.ilnd@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/14/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2017. (Labella, Nancy) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 8, 2017 Filing 564 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held. Parties have until June 7, 2017, to meet and confer to resolve their written discovery issues. A follow-up status hearing is scheduled for June 16, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. by phone to discuss whether any written discovery issues remain unresolved. If so, the court will issue a briefing schedule for cross-motions to compel. The conference call number is (877) 336-1839 and the passcode is 4333213. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 5, 2017 Filing 563 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Jonathan L. Stern (Stern, Jonathan) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 5, 2017 Filing 562 STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 5/5/2017. (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 5, 2017 Filing 561 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: The court treats the parties' stipulation order, (R. 556), as a joint request to have a stipulated order regarding discovery of ESI entered and grants the same. Enter Stipulated Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 5, 2017 Filing 560 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Endo Health Solutions and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s application to appear pro hac vice #559 is granted. Attorney Jonathan L. Stern is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 4, 2017 Filing 559 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13139563. (Stern, Jonathan) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 558 STATUS Report Discovery Issues by City Of Chicago (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 557 STATUS Report (Defendants' Joint Supplemental) by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Wolf, Gretchen) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 556 STIPULATION Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information (Nelson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 555 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by David Barry Goroff (Goroff, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 554 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Thomas Arthur Doyle (Doyle, Thomas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 19, 2017 Filing 553 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: At the parties' request, the April 24, 2017 status hearing is rescheduled for May 8, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 1019. Parties are ordered to file any supplements, jointly or separately, to the April 14, 2017 joint status report by May 3, 2017, identifying their outstanding discovery disputes, if any. Also, at the request of the parties, they are permitted to serve requests for production and interrogatories up to the numerical limitations specified in the December 19, 2016 order through and including May 3, 2017. Parties may seek leave of court to serve supplemental discovery requests at a later time for good cause. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 14, 2017 Filing 552 STATUS Report JOINT STATUS REPORT by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 7, 2017 Filing 551 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' application to appear pro hac vice #550 is granted. Attorney Robert S Hoff is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., and The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 7, 2017 Filing 550 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13046452. (Hoff, Robert) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 6, 2017 Filing 549 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's application to appear pro hac vice #548 is granted. Attorney Elizabeth Smith is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Plaintiff. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 5, 2017 Filing 548 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13037542. (, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 547 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's application to appear pro hac vice #545 is granted. Attorney Jeffrey Charles Nelson is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Plaintiff. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 546 PAYMENT by City Of Chicago of Pro Hac Fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13032284. (Nelson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 545 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $50, receipt number 0752-13032263. (Nelson, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/4/2017 (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office)(pk, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 3/3/2017. (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 3, 2017 Filing 543 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Parties in this case are ordered to amend and supplement their Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by March 17, 2017. Enter Order. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 27, 2017 Filing 542 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held by phone and on the record. Plaintiff is ordered to submit the parties' Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by close of business tomorrow. Parties are reminded that they are to serve their written discovery responses by March 24, 2017. A status hearing is scheduled for April 24, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 1019. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 541 STATUS Report of the Parties in Response to Dkt. No. 532 by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 540 NOTICE by Linda Jill Singer of Change of Address (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 17, 2017 Filing 539 REPLY by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to memorandum in support of motion, #517 / Reply in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike Counts 2 and 4 to 10 of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6) and 12(f) (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 17, 2017 Filing 538 REPLY by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to memorandum in support of motion, #509 / Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss Counts 4 to 10 of Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 17, 2017 Filing 537 REPLY by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to motion to dismiss #508 Reply Memorandum In Support Of The Motion To Dismiss Counts II And IV-X Against Defendants Cephalon, Inc. And Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 17, 2017 Filing 536 REPLY by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #492 /Dismiss Counts II and IV-X of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(B)(6) (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 17, 2017 Filing 535 REPLY by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #501 (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 17, 2017 Filing 534 REPLY by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Actavis Defendants' Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 533 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 9, 2017 Filing 532 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Parties are to file a joint status report on written discovery by February 22, 2017. Parties are to also report on the issues they wish to discuss at the February 27, 2017 status hearing. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 6, 2017 Filing 531 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion to withdraw appearance of counsel #529 is granted. Attorneys Joshua Dubin Glickman and Anthony Raymond Juzaitis are given leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. Motion hearing date of 2/7/17 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
January 31, 2017 Filing 530 NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #529 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/7/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
January 31, 2017 Filing 529 MOTION by Attorney Joshua D. Glickman and Anthony R. Juzaitis to withdraw as attorney for City Of Chicago. No party information provided (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
January 31, 2017 Filing 528 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/1/16 before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy LaBella, 312-435-6890, NLaBella.ilnd@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2017. (Labella, Nancy) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
January 27, 2017 Filing 527 MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago in Opposition to motion to dismiss, #513 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #494 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #506 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #501 , motion to dismiss #508 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #492 (Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
January 13, 2017 Filing 526 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/19/16 before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kathleen_Fennell@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017. (Fennell, Kathleen) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 20, 2016 Filing 525 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Rodriguez Esteban (Esteban, Rodriguez) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 20, 2016 Filing 524 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Dave Roberts (Roberts, Dave) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 20, 2016 Filing 523 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's agreed motion for extension of time and for leave to file a joint brief in response to defendants' motions #521 is granted to 1/27/17. Defendants' replies shall be filed by 2/17/17. Motion hearing date of 12/22/16 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2016 Filing 522 Agreed NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth A. Wexler for presentment of extension of time #521 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/22/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2016 Filing 521 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for extension of time Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for the Filing of Plaintiff City of Chicago's Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2016 Filing 520 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held. Parties are directed to adhere to the following written discovery schedule: (1) exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by January 16, 2017; (2) serve interrogatories and requests for production of documents as noted herein by January 30, 2017; (3) meet and confer on ESI protocol by no later than February 17, 2017; (4) serve responses to interrogatories and requests to produce by March 24, 2017; (4) meet and confer by April 7, 2017, in order to resolve any written discovery issues; and (5) file a joint status report identifying the written discovery issues that remain in dispute by April 14, 2017. As for Rule 33 interrogatories, the City is ordered to serve no more than 20 interrogatories on each Defendant Family (Janssen, Endo, Purdue, Teva, and Actavis) and each Defendant Family is ordered to serve no more than 20 interrogatories on the City. As for Rule 34 requests for production of documents, the City is ordered to serve no more than 50 requests on each Defendant Family and each Defendant Family is ordered to serve no more than 50 requests on the City. Also, the City will be granted 525 hours of party depositions and Defendants will be granted 350 hours of party depositions. A follow-up status hearing is scheduled for February 27, 2017, at 3:00 p.m. (C.S.T.) by phone to discuss written and ESI discovery. The conference call number is (877) 336-1839 and the passcode is 4333213. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 519 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' application to appear pro hac vice #490 is granted. Attorney David K. Roberts is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. Defendants' motions to dismiss #492 , #494 , #501 , #506 , #508 , and #513 are taken under advisement. Briefing schedule previously set in this court's order of 11/1/16 #483 . The court will rule electronically and set further dates in the ruling. Defendants' motion for leave to file under seal #504 is granted. Motion hearing date of 12/21/16 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 518 ANSWER to Complaint / Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint #478 by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 517 MEMORANDUM by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss, #513 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles C. Lifland, #2 Exhibit 1)(Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 516 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. [ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT] regarding answer to complaint #515 (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 515 ANSWER to Complaint [ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT] by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 514 Joint NOTICE of Motion by Charles C. Lifland for presentment of motion to dismiss, #513 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/21/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 513 MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to dismiss / Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike Counts 2 and 4-10 of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6) and 12(f) (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 512 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. regarding memorandum in support of motion #510 (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 511 NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion to dismiss #508 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/21/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 510 MEMORANDUM by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #508 (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 509 MEMORANDUM by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #506 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles C. Lifland, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 508 MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to dismiss Counts II and IV-X of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 507 NOTICE of Motion by Charles C. Lifland for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #506 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/21/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 506 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM/ Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Counts 4 to 10 of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 505 NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion to seal #504 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/21/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 504 MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to seal [FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL] (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 503 NOTICE of Motion by Joshua M. Davis for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #501 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/21/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 502 MEMORANDUM by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #501 (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 501 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 500 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses (regarding Third Amended Complaint, Dkt 478) by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 499 NOTICE of Motion by R. Ryan Stoll for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #492 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/21/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 498 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Third Amended Complaint by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc.(Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 497 NOTICE of Motion by James W Matthews for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #494 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/21/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 496 MEMORANDUM by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #494 (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 495 DECLARATION of R. Ryan Stoll regarding Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #492 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 494 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 493 MEMORANDUM by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #492 (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 492 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM/ Dismiss Counts II and IV-X of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(B)(6) (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 491 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses (regarding Third Amended Complaint Dkt.478) by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.(Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 490 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12668027. (Roberts, Dave) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 489 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' application to appear pro hac vice #488 is granted. Attorney Esteban Rodriguez is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 14, 2016 Filing 488 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12664096. (Esteban, Rodriguez) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 8, 2016 Filing 487 AMENDED AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY Order Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 12/8/2016. (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 5, 2016 Filing 486 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 28, 2016 Filing 485 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. by Gretchen Maria Wolf (Wolf, Gretchen) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 1, 2016 Filing 484 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: A status hearing is scheduled for December 19, 2016, at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 1019 to discuss discovery. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 483 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to modify order dated October 11, 2016 #479 is granted. Defendants shall answer Counts I and III of the third amended complaint by 12/15/16. Any motions to dismiss in lieu of answers on the remaining counts shall filed by 12/15/16. The Court will not consider substantive arguments made on issues already decided in its prior order #471 . If motions to dismiss are filed, Plaintiff's response shall be filed by 1/12/17 and Defendants' replies in support shall be filed by 2/2/17. The court will rule electronically and set further dates in the ruling. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 28, 2016 Filing 482 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion to file the unredacted third amended complaint under seal #475 is granted. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 26, 2016 Filing 481 RESPONSE by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to Modify the Order Dated October 11, 2016 #479 DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO CITY OF CHICAGO'S MOTION TO MODIFY ORDER DATED OCTOBER 11, 2016 (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 25, 2016 Filing 480 NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth A. Wexler for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #479 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/1/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 25, 2016 Filing 479 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to Modify the Order Dated October 11, 2016 (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 25, 2016 Filing 478 AMENDED Third Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit A3, #4 Exhibit A4, #5 Exhibit A5, #6 Exhibit A6, #7 Exhibit A7, #8 Exhibit B1, #9 Exhibit B2)(Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 25, 2016 Filing 477 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago Third Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1, # 2 Exhibit A2, # 3 Exhibit A3, # 4 Exhibit A4, # 5 Exhibit A5, # 6 Exhibit A6, # 7 Exhibit A7, # 8 Exhibit B1, # 9 Exhibit B2)(Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 25, 2016 Filing 476 NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth A. Wexler for presentment of motion to seal document #475 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/1/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 25, 2016 Filing 475 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to seal document The City of Chicago's Motion to File the Unredacted Third Amended Complaint Under Seal (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 11, 2016 Filing 474 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso:Defendants' motion for extension of time #472 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead by 12/15/16. The motion hearing date of 10/13/16 is stricken. Mailed notice (lxs, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 10, 2016 Filing 473 NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of extension of time,, #472 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/13/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 10, 2016 Filing 472 MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for extension of time Motion for Extension of Time (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 471 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Defendants' motion to dismiss or stay #415 is denied. Defendants' motions to dismiss #401 , #404 , #407 , #411 , #416 , #423 are granted in part and denied in part. Counts II and IV through X are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is given a final opportunity, until October 31, 2016, to replead those counts as directed herein. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/29/2016. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 9, 2016 Filing 470 REPLY by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to Response,, #466 Reply to Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Notices of Supplemental Authority (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 8, 2016 Filing 469 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a reply to defendants' joint response to plaintiff's notices of supplemental authority #467 is granted. The motion hearing date of 8/11/16 is stricken. No further motions of supplemental authority regarding the pending motions to dismiss will be considered by the Court. Mailed notice (np, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 5, 2016 Filing 468 NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for leave to file #467 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 8/11/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 5, 2016 Filing 467 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file a Reply to Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiff's Notices of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 28, 2016 Filing 466 RESPONSE by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to other #457 , other #462 Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiff's Notices of Supplemental Authority (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 26, 2016 Filing 465 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' motion for leave to file their joint response to Plaintiff's notices of supplemental authority #463 is granted. Motion hearing date of 8/2/16 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 25, 2016 Filing 464 NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion for leave to file,, #463 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 8/2/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 25, 2016 Filing 463 MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for leave to file Defendants' Joint Motion for Leave to File Joint Response to Plaintiff's Notices of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiff's Notices of Supplemental Authority)(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 12, 2016 Filing 462 Notice of Supplemental Authority by City Of Chicago (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appellate Court Opinion)(Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 6, 2016 Filing 461 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion to withdraw appearance of counsel #459 is granted. Attorney Mary Eileen Cunniff Wells is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. Motion hearing date of 7/19/16 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 5, 2016 Filing 460 NOTICE of Motion by Mary Eileen Cunniff Wells for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #459 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/19/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Wells, Mary) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 5, 2016 Filing 459 MOTION by Attorney Mary Eileen Cunniff Wells to withdraw as attorney for City Of Chicago. No party information provided (Wells, Mary) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 21, 2016 Filing 458 WITHDRAWING Melissa Ku (counsel of record from Honigman Miller and Anrold & Porter will continue to represent defendant) as counsel for Defendant Endo Health Solutions and substituting Peter Vincent Baugher as counsel of record (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 21, 2016 Filing 457 Notice of Supplemental Authority by City Of Chicago (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supreme Court Opinion)(Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 6, 2016 Filing 456 AMENDED AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 5/6/2016. (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 6, 2016 Filing 455 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Defendants' motion for the entry of an amended agreed confidentiality order #453 is granted. Appearance on May 12, 2016, is not required to present this motion. Enter Amended Agreed Confidentiality Order. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 5, 2016 Filing 454 Agreed NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald for presentment of motion for protective order, #453 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 5/12/2016 at 11:00 AM. (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 5, 2016 Filing 453 MOTION by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. for protective order Amended, Agreed (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 4, 2016 Filing 452 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Janssen Defendants' motion to withdraw appearance of counsel #450 is granted. Attorney Ivana Cingel is given leave to withdraw as counsel for the Janssen Defendants. Motion hearing date of 5/10/16 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 4, 2016 Filing 451 NOTICE of Motion by Ivana Cingel for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #450 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/10/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Cingel, Ivana) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 4, 2016 Filing 450 MOTION by Attorney Ivana J. Cingel to withdraw as attorney for Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. No party information provided (Cingel, Ivana) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 15, 2016 Filing 449 REPLY by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Cephalon, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 8(a), Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 9(b) #401 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of the Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Defendants Cephalon, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 8(a), Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 9(b) (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 15, 2016 Filing 448 REPLY by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #423 (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 15, 2016 Filing 447 REPLY by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #416 (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 15, 2016 Filing 446 REPLY by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. In Support of Actavis Defendants' Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Drori, Jason) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 15, 2016 Filing 445 REPLY by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #407 (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 15, 2016 Filing 444 DECLARATION of R. Ryan Stoll regarding reply,, #443 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11)(Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 15, 2016 Filing 443 REPLY by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to motion to dismiss,, #415 (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 15, 2016 Filing 442 DECLARATION of Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald regarding reply #441 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16)(Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 15, 2016 Filing 441 REPLY by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #411 (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 13, 2016 Filing 440 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Counsel, Nicholas A. Gowen by Endo Health Solutions (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 11, 2016 Filing 439 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' uncontested in part motion for modification of briefing schedule(agreed) and page limits (not agreed) for briefing in reply to Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' motions to dismiss second amended complaint #437 is granted. Defendants' reply memoranda in support of joint and individual motions to dismiss are extended to 4/15/16. Defendants' reply memoranda in support of their joint and individual motions to dismiss will not exceed 85 pages total. Motion hearing date of 3/17/16 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 10, 2016 Filing 438 NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of extension of time, motion for leave to file excess pages,,,,,,,,,, #437 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/17/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 10, 2016 Filing 437 MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for extension of time , MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for leave to file excess pages UNCONTESTED IN PART MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE (AGREED) AND PAGE LIMITS (NOT AGREED) FOR BRIEFING IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 22, 2016 Filing 436 NOTICE by Jeffrey Irvine Cummings of Change of Address (Cummings, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 22, 2016 Filing 435 NOTICE by George Freeman Galland, Jr of Change of Address (Galland, George) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 22, 2016 Filing 434 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file its memorandum of law in opposition under seal #430 is granted. Plaintiff shall file a redacted version of its memorandum on the docket of this case. Motion hearing date of 2/24/16 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 18, 2016 Filing 433 MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #411 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #423 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #416 , motion to dismiss,, #415 , motion to dismiss #404 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #401 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #407 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fiona A. Burke, #2 Appendix)(Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 18, 2016 Filing 432 SEALED RESPONSE by City Of Chicago to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #411 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM / Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #423 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM / Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #416 , MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #404 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Cephalon, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 8(a), Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 9(b) #401 , MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Purdue Pharma L.P., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., ALLERGAN PLC, Purdue Pharma Inc, John #415 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #407 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Fiona A. Burke, # 2 Appendix)(Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 18, 2016 Filing 431 NOTICE of Motion by Brian E. Bowcut for presentment of motion for leave to file #430 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/24/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 18, 2016 Filing 430 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file Opposition to Defendants' Joint and Individual Motions to Dismiss Under Seal (Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 25, 2015 Filing 429 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's agreed motion for extension of time #428 is granted. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motions to dismiss are extended to 2/18/16. Defendants' replies in support are extended to 3/21/16. The court will rule electronically and set further dates in the ruling. Motion hearing date of 12/2/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 24, 2015 Filing 428 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for extension of time for the Filing of Plaintiff City of Chicago's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Wexler, Kenneth) Modified on 11/30/2015 (ntf, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 24, 2015 Filing 427 Agreed NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth A. Wexler for presentment of before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/2/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 23, 2015 Filing 426 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' motions to dismiss #401 , #404 , #407 , #411 , #415 , #416 , and #423 are taken under under advisement. Plaintiff's responses shall be filed by 12/23/15. Defendants' replies in support shall be filed by 1/20/16. The court will rule electronically and set further dates in the ruling. Motion hearing date of 12/1/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 425 Joint NOTICE of Motion by Charles C. Lifland for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #423 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/1/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 424 MEMORANDUM by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #423 / Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 423 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM / Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 422 NOTICE of Motion by Charles C. Lifland for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #416 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/1/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 421 DECLARATION of Charles C. Lifland regarding Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #416 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27)(Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 420 Joint NOTICE of Motion by R. Ryan Stoll for presentment of motion to dismiss,, #415 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/1/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 419 DECLARATION of R. Ryan Stoll regarding motion to dismiss,, #415 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 418 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of of Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint under Rule 12(b)(6) for failure to state a claim #416 . (Lifland, Charles) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/24/2015 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 417 MEMORANDUM by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of defendants' joint motion to dismiss or stay Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint under the primary jurisdiction doctrine and the court's inherent authority to stay proceedings #415 . (Attachments: #1 Index of Appendices, #2 Appendix 1, #3 Appendix 2)(Stoll, R.) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/24/2015 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 416 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM / Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 415 MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Purdue Pharma L.P., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., ALLERGAN PLC, Purdue Pharma Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to dismiss or Stay Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Under the Primary Jurisdiction Doctrine and the Court's Inherent Authority to Stay Proceedings (Joint) (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 414 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #411 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/1/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 413 DECLARATION of Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald regarding Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #411 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 412 MEMORANDUM by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Under 12(b)(6) #411 . (Fitzgerald, Patrick) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/24/2015 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 411 MOTION TO DISMISS Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6). (Fitzgerald, Patrick) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/24/2015 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 410 NOTICE of Motion by Joshua M. Davis for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #407 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/1/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 409 DECLARATION of Melissa A. Ku in support of Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc.'s and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint under Rule 12(b)(6) for failure to State a Claim by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Davis, Joshua) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/24/2015 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 408 MEMORANDUM by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #407 (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 407 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 406 NOTICE of Motion by James W Matthews for presentment of motion to dismiss #404 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/1/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 405 MEMORANDUM by ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #404 Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration First, #2 Declaration Second, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 404 MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 403 NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #401 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/1/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 402 MEMORANDUM by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #401 Memorandum of Law In Support of the Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Defendants Cephalon, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 401 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Cephalon, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 8(a), Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 9(b) (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 16, 2015 Filing 400 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' agreed motion for modification of page limits for briefing in response to Plaintiff's second amended complaint #398 is granted. Motion hearing date of 11/19/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 13, 2015 Filing 399 Agreed NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, #398 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/19/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 13, 2015 Filing 398 MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Agreed) (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 10, 2015 Filing 397 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Pursuant to parties' notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice #396 , Defendant DEPOMED,INC. is dismissed as a Defendant in this case. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 9, 2015 Filing 396 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by City Of Chicago Without Prejudice Dismissing Defendant Depomed, Inc. (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 5, 2015 Filing 395 Second AMENDED complaint by City Of Chicago against ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., DEPOMED, INC., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (with Redactions Per November 2, 2015 Order) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 2, 2015 Filing 394 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Pursuant to the parties' agreement, the Court grants the Janssen defendants, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., and Cephalon, Inc.'s motions to maintain certain information in the second amended complaint under seal #356 and #383 . Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 29, 2015 Filing 393 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/22/2015 before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Court Reporter Contact Information: ALEXANDRA ROTH, alexandra_roth@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312) 408-5038. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2016. (Roth, Alexandra) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 20, 2015 Filing 392 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' agreed motion for expansion of page limits for briefing in response to plaintiff's second amended complaint #390 is granted. Motion hearing date of 10/27/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 19, 2015 Filing 391 AGREED NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages,, #390 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/27/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 19, 2015 Filing 390 MOTION by Defendants ALLERGAN PLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., DEPOMED, INC., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Agreed) (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 13, 2015 Filing 389 RESPONSE by City Of Chicago to MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson to seal /to Maintain Under Seal Janssen's Confidential Information Appearing in the Second Amended Complaint #383 , MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to seal Motion to Maintain Seal on Select Paragraphs of the City of Chicago's Unredacted Second Amended Complaint #356 (Reflecting an Agreement by the Parties) (Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 30, 2015 Filing 388 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: The city's motion to lift the discovery stay #289 is denied. In its motion, the city seeks to move forward with all discovery against Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P. and Purdue Pharma Inc. (together, "Purdue") because the assigned District Judge has ruled that the city is entitled to pursue a portion of its claims against Purdue. Specifically, on May 8, 2015, the assigned District Judge partially denied Purdue's motion to dismiss, ruling that only counts one and two out of the eleven-count complaint can proceed against it. (R. 288 at 34.) In August 2015 the city filed a second amended complaint reasserting many of the claims the District Judge dismissed. (R. 328.) At a status hearing on September 22, 2015, Purdue argued for the discovery stay to remain in place because it plans to move to dismiss the second amended complaint. Purdue argues that discovery should not begin until there is certainty as to the issues to be litigated in this case. The city countered at the status hearing that discovery should move forward because the core consumer fraud allegations against Purdue remain the same. The court agrees with Purdue's position on this point. While the city is correct in its representation that this case boils down to whether Purdue (and other pharma companies) engaged in fraud and deception when promoting and marketing its opiods, the contours of the allegations now pending against Purdue are immensely broader than the contours of the allegations that survived Purdue's first motion to dismiss. The only claims of fraud and deceptive practice that survived the first motion to dismiss were based on the allegation that Purdue misrepresented its products when promoting them through "their own websites." (R. 288 at 29.) The claims against Purdue in the second amended complaint, however, are much more robust and include many of the same counts and allegations dismissed from the first amended complaint. The court finds that if the second amended complaint remains in-tact after the anticipated motions to dismiss, the scope of discovery will be much more expansive than the scope of discovery this court would permit based only on the claims that survived the first motion to dismiss. The court weighed the possibility of permitting the parties to engage in discovery to address only the website allegations while waiting for a ruling on the anticipated motions to dismiss, but the issues pertaining to the websites constitute only a sliver of the claims against Purdue set forth in the second amended complaint. Starting any discovery now, before the District Judge has a chance to rule on the anticipated motions to dismiss the second amended complaint, would not promote efficiency in managing discovery in this case. Also, there is no suggestion that discovery pertaining to the websites allegedly controlled by Purdue would be destroyed or lost if discovery did not commence immediately. Although there can be some benefit from collecting necessary discovery during the motion to dismiss phase, here any such benefit does not outweigh the complication and added burden that necessarily would be imposed on the court and Purdue (and potentially the other pharma companies) from having three or more separate discovery tracks. For these reasons, the most prudent approach is to wait to see what claims and allegations survive the second round of motions to dismiss. The discovery stay remains. The status hearing scheduled for October 1, 2015, is cancelled. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 30, 2015 Filing 387 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson's motion to maintain under seal Janssen's confidential information appearing in the second amended complaint #383 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff's response shall be filed by 10/14/15. Defendants' reply in support shall be filed by 10/28/15. The Court will rule electronically. Motion hearing date of 10/6/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 29, 2015 Filing 386 AGREED QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE Order For Protected Health Information Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 9/29/2015. (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 29, 2015 Filing 385 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Parties' agreed motion for entry of an agreed HIPAA protective order #381 is granted. Enter Agreed Qualified Protective Order for Protected Health Information. Appearance is not necessary to present this motion. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 28, 2015 Filing 384 NOTICE of Motion by Carolyn June Kubota for presentment of motion to seal, #383 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/6/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 28, 2015 Filing 383 MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson to seal /to Maintain Under Seal Janssen's Confidential Information Appearing in the Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Cardelus, #2 Declaration of Ronald Kuntz)(Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 28, 2015 Filing 382 NOTICE of Motion by Brian E. Bowcut for presentment of motion for protective order #381 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/6/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 28, 2015 Filing 381 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for protective order (Agreed Motion for Entry of a HIPAA Protective Order) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 28, 2015 Filing 380 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY Order Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 9/28/2015. (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 28, 2015 Filing 379 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant DEPOMED, INC's applications to appear pro hac vice #368 , #371 , and #372 are granted. Attorneys Robert B. Hawk, Christopher Mitchell, Samuel R. Welch are given leave to appear as counsel for Defendant DEPOMED, INC. Defendant DEPOMED, INC's agreed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's second amended complaint #375 is granted. Motion hearing date of 9/30/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 28, 2015 Filing 378 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DEPOMED, INC. by Michael J. Shepard (Shepard, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 26, 2015 Filing 377 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 4-2-15 before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Transcript-Order-Form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 10/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/27/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (Warren, Pamela) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 25, 2015 Filing 376 NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #375 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/30/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Moran, Mariah) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 25, 2015 Filing 375 MOTION by Defendant DEPOMED, INC. for extension of time to file answer Agreed (Moran, Mariah) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 25, 2015 Filing 374 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DEPOMED, INC. by David J. Stetler (Stetler, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 25, 2015 Filing 373 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DEPOMED, INC. by Mariah E Moran (Moran, Mariah) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 25, 2015 Filing 372 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11123124. (Welch, Samuel) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 25, 2015 Filing 371 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11123075. (Mitchell, Christopher) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 25, 2015 Filing 370 ATTORNEY Appearance Form filed by Mariah E. Moran. (Moran, Mariah) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 9/28/2015 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 25, 2015 Filing 369 ATTORNEY Appearance Form by David J. Stetler. (Stetler, David) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's office on 9/28/2015 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 25, 2015 Filing 368 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11122847. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Hawk, Robert) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 24, 2015 Filing 367 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso:Motion for order #354 Extending the Sealing of Certain Documents is granted. Motion hearing set for 9/29/2015 on this motion is hereby stricken. Mailed notice (tsa, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 24, 2015 Filing 366 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso:Motion for leave to file #358 an exhibit under seal is granted. MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to maintain seal #356 on Select Paragraphs of the City of Chicago's Unredacted Second Amended Complaint is entered and briefed as follows: Responses due by 10/14/2015. Replies due by 10/28/2015. The Court will rule electronically. Motion hearings set for 10/7/2015 on these motions are hereby stricken.Mailed notice (tsa, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 24, 2015 Filing 365 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso:Motions to withdraw #361 , #363 as counsel are granted. William G. Potter and Nicholas William Marietti are given leave to withdraw their appearances. Motion hearings set for 9/30/2015 on these motions are hereby stricken. Mailed notice (tsa, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 24, 2015 Filing 364 NOTICE of Motion by Nicholas William Marietti for presentment of motion to withdraw #363 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/30/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Marietti, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 24, 2015 Filing 363 MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to withdraw Appearance of Nicholas W. Marietti (Marietti, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 24, 2015 Filing 362 NOTICE of Motion by William G. Potter for presentment of motion to withdraw #361 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/30/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Potter, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 24, 2015 Filing 361 MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to withdraw Appearance of William G. Potter (Potter, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 23, 2015 Filing 360 EXHIBIT by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Exhibit C to Document 356 (REDACTED) regarding MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to seal Motion to Maintain Seal on Select Paragraphs of the City of Chicago's Unredacted Second Amended Complaint #356 , MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. for leave to file Motion for Leave to File An Exhibit Under Seal #358 (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 23, 2015 Filing 359 NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion for leave to file #358 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/7/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 23, 2015 Filing 358 MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. for leave to file Motion for Leave to File An Exhibit Under Seal (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 23, 2015 Filing 357 NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion to seal, #356 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/7/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 23, 2015 Filing 356 MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to seal Motion to Maintain Seal on Select Paragraphs of the City of Chicago's Unredacted Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 23, 2015 Filing 355 NOTICE of Motion by Brian E. Bowcut for presentment of motion for order #354 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/29/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 23, 2015 Filing 354 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for order Extending the Sealing of Certain Documents (Unopposed) (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibits A1 to A7, #2 Redacted Exhibits B1 to B2)(Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 23, 2015 Filing 353 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso:Unopposed motion #352 for additional time to move to extend the seal as to portions of the second amended complaint is granted. Mailed notice (tsa, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 23, 2015 Filing 352 MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.Additional Time To Move To Extend The Seal As To Portions Of The Second Amended Complaint Unopposed Emergency Motion (Garlough, Jonathan) (Docket Text Modified by Clerks' Office on 9/23/2015) (mr, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 22, 2015 Filing 351 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso:Agreed motion for extension of time #348 for Filing of Responsive Pleading by the Defendants to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is granted. November 20, 2015 will be the Responsive filing by the Defendants. January 19, 2016 will be the date for Opposition to responsive filing filed by the City. February 18, 2016 will be the date to Reply in support of responsive filing, if any, filed by the Defendants. Motion hearing set for 9/29/2015 on this motion is hereby stricken. Mailed notice (tsa, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 22, 2015 Filing 350 (Agreed) NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald for presentment of extension of time, #348 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/29/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 22, 2015 Filing 349 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held and continued to October 1, 2015, at 1:00 p.m. in courtroom 1019. Parties are to email a draft agreed confidentiality order in Word to this court (proposed_order_kim@ilnd.uscourts.gov) by September 25, 2015. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 22, 2015 Filing 348 MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc, Cephalon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Actavis PLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., ALLERGAN PLC for extension of time (Agreed) for Filing of Responsive Pleading by the Defendants to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Fitzgerald, Patrick) (Docket Text Modified by Clerks' Office on 9/22/2015; Added correct defendants) (sxn, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 18, 2015 Filing 347 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Purdue's [Proposed] Confidentiality Order, #2 Exhibit B (Redline Showing Suggested Modifications), #3 Exhibit C (City's [Proposed] Confidentiality Order, #4 Exhibit D (Redline Showing City's Suggested Modifications))(Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 346 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion for an order extending the sealing of certain documents #338 is moot. Plaintiff's agreed motion to extend the seal on the plaintiff's unredacted second amended complaint #340 is granted. Motion hearing date of 9/22/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 17, 2015 Filing 345 NOTICE by Peter Vincent Baugher of Change of Address for Steven G. Reade of Arnold & Porter LLP (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 17, 2015 Filing 344 NOTICE by Peter Vincent Baugher of Change of Address for Melissa A. Ku of Arnold & Porter LLP (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 17, 2015 Filing 343 NOTICE by Peter Vincent Baugher of Change of Address for Joshua M. Davis of Arnold & Porter LLP (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 17, 2015 Filing 342 NOTICE by Peter Vincent Baugher of Change of Address for Joanna G. Persio of Arnold and Porter LLP (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 16, 2015 Filing 341 NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion to seal document, motion for relief,,,, #340 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/22/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 16, 2015 Filing 340 MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to seal document sealed document 327 , sealed document 331 Agreed Motion To Extend The Seal on The City of Chicago's Unredacted Second Amended Complaint (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 16, 2015 Filing 339 NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for order #338 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/22/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 16, 2015 Filing 338 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for order Extending the Sealing of Certain Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 14, 2015 Filing 337 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City Of Chicago as to DEPOMED, INC. on 9/4/2015, answer due 9/25/2015. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 11, 2015 Filing 336 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: At the parties' request, the deadline for filing their discovery plan is extended from September 11 to September 18, 2015. The status hearing is rescheduled from September 15 to September 22, 2015, at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 1019. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 31, 2015 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant DEPOMED, INC. (jp, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 28, 2015 Filing 335 NOTICE by Katy E Koski of Change of Address (Koski, Katy) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 28, 2015 Filing 334 NOTICE by Jason L Drori of Change of Address (Drori, Jason) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 28, 2015 Filing 333 NOTICE by James W Matthews of Change of Address (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 28, 2015 Filing 332 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion to file the unredacted second amended complaint under seal #325 is granted. Motion hearing date of 9/1/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 27, 2015 Filing 331 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago Sealed Second Amended Complaint (Corrected Version) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A.1 through A.7, # 2 Exhibits B.1 through B.2)(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 26, 2015 Filing 330 NOTICE by City Of Chicago re sealed document 327 , amended complaint,, #328 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 26, 2015 Filing 329 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff City Of Chicago regarding sealed document 327 , amended complaint,, #328 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 26, 2015 Filing 328 Second AMENDED complaint by City Of Chicago against Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., DEPOMED, INC., ALLERGAN PLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A.1 to A.7, B.1 to B.2 Placeholders)(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 26, 2015 Filing 327 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago Sealed Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A.1 through A.7, # 2 Exhibits B.1 through B.2)(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 26, 2015 Filing 326 NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for leave to file #325 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/1/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 26, 2015 Filing 325 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file the Unredacted Second Amended Complaint Under Seal (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 26, 2015 Filing 324 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Anthony Raymond Juzaitis (Juzaitis, Anthony) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 24, 2015 Filing 323 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Jonathan William Garlough (Garlough, Jonathan) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 14, 2015 Filing 322 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Thomas P. McNulty (McNulty, Thomas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 10, 2015 Filing 321 STIPULATION Agreement that the Purdue Defendants Need Not File a Responsive Pleading to the First Amended Complaint in Light of Plaintiff's Intent to File a Second Amended Complaint (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 10, 2015 Filing 320 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held and continued to September 15, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 1019. Parties are ordered to file their discovery plan, either jointly or separately, by September 11, 2015. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 27, 2015 Filing 319 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: A status hearing is scheduled for August 10, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 1019. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. The Court denies Purdue's motion for reconsideration #300 and the City's motion for clarification #306 . Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/27/2015. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 16, 2015 Filing 317 REPLY by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to motion to clarify #306 Court's May 8, 2015 Order and for Discovery (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 2, 2015 Filing 316 MEMORANDUM by Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for clarification and discovery #306 . (Matthews, James) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 7/7/2015 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 1, 2015 Filing 315 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on May 15, 2015, before the Honorable Young B. Kim. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura LaCien, 312-408-5032, laura_lacien@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2015. (Lacien, Laura) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 1, 2015 Filing 314 REPLY by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. to memorandum, #307 , motion for reconsideration, motion for relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #300 (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 30, 2015 Filing 313 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant Endo Health Solutions' motion to withdraw appearance of counsel #311 is granted. Attorney Kristen Elizabeth Hudson is given leave to withdraw as counsel for DefendantEndo Health Solutions. Motion hearing date of 7/7/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 25, 2015 Filing 312 NOTICE of Motion by Nicholas A Gowen for presentment of motion to withdraw #311 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/7/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Gowen, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 25, 2015 Filing 311 MOTION by Defendant Endo Health Solutions to withdraw Appearance of Counsel (Gowen, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 19, 2015 Filing 310 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion to clarify #306 is taken under advisement. Defendants' response shall be filed by 7/2/15. Plaintiff's reply in support shall be filed by 7/16/15. The court will rule electronically. Motion hearing date of 7/7/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 18, 2015 Filing 309 NOTICE by Nicholas A Gowen of Change of Address Change of Firm Name (Gowen, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 17, 2015 Filing 308 NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion to clarify #306 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/7/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 17, 2015 Filing 307 PLAINTIFF'S Combined Memorandum in Opposition to the Purdue Defendants' Motion for reconsideration and in support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Clarification and Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Singer, Linda) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 6/18/2015 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 17, 2015 Filing 306 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to clarify Court's May 8, 2015 Order and for Discovery (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 17, 2015 Filing 305 NOTICE by Peter Vincent Baugher of Change of Address Change of Firm Name (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 12, 2015 Filing 304 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant City of Chicago's application to appear pro hac vice #303 is granted. Attorney Brian E. Bowcut is given leave to appear as counsel for City Of Chicago. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 12, 2015 Filing 303 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10750970. (Bowcut, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 27, 2015 Filing 302 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' motion for reconsideration #300 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff's response shall be filed by 6/17/15. Defendants' reply in support shall be filed by 7/1/15. The court will rule electronically. Motion hearing date of 6/2/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 26, 2015 Filing 301 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald for presentment of motion for reconsideration, motion for relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #300 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 6/2/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 26, 2015 Filing 300 MOTION by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. for reconsideration regarding order on motion to dismiss, order on motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,, memorandum opinion and order, add and terminate parties,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #288 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 26, 2015 Filing 299 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to amend its complaint #298 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to amend #296 is moot. Motion hearing date of 5/27/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 21, 2015 Filing 298 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for extension of time to amend Corrected Dkt. 296 Unopposed Motion (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 21, 2015 Filing 297 NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for extension of time to amend #296 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/27/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 21, 2015 Filing 296 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for extension of time to amend (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 21, 2015 Filing 295 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.'s unopposed motion to file a responsive pleading to the first amended complaint in light of plaintiff's intention to file a second amended complaint and the Purdue Defendants' intention to timely file a limited motion for reconsideration #293 is granted. Motion hearing date of 5/26/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 20, 2015 Filing 294 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by R. Ryan Stoll for presentment of extension of time, #293 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/26/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 20, 2015 Filing 293 MOTION by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. for extension of time to File a Responsive Pleading to the First Amended Complaint in Light of Plaintiff's Intention to File a Second Amended Complaint and the Purdue Defendants' Intention to Timely File a Limited Motion for Reconsideration (Unopposed) (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 18, 2015 Filing 292 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2/20/15 before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy LaBella, 312-435-6890, Nancy_LaBella@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2015. (Labella, Nancy) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 15, 2015 Filing 291 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to lift discovery stay #289 is entered and continued. For the reasons stated in open court, the court is inclined to grant the motion if Purdue Defendants' motion for reconsideration, to be filed soon, is denied. The court will issue a follow-up order when appropriate. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 11, 2015 Filing 290 NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth A. Wexler for presentment of motion for discovery #289 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 5/15/2015 at 11:00 AM. (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 11, 2015 Filing 289 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for discovery Motion to Lift Discovery Stay (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 288 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. The Court: (1) grants the Cephalon entities' motion to dismiss #224 and terminates Teva Pharmaceuticals, Ltd. as a party to this case; and (2) grants the Actavis entities' motion to dismiss #220 , the Endo entities' motion to dismiss #226 , and the Janssen entities' motion to dismiss #232 ; and (3) grants in part and denies in part defendants' joint motion to dismiss #228 , which is denied as to the claims asserted in Counts One and Two against the Purdue entities but otherwise granted. The City has thirty days from the date of this Memorandum Opinion and Order to amend the dismissed claims, if it can do so and comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11. If the City fails to do so, the Court will dismiss those claims with prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/8/2015. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 13, 2015 Filing 287 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Adam Michael Prom (Prom, Adam) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 13, 2015 Filing 286 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Justin Nicholas Boley (Boley, Justin) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 13, 2015 Filing 285 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Bethany R. Turke (Turke, Bethany) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 13, 2015 Filing 284 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Kenneth A. Wexler (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 9, 2015 Filing 283 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendatns' motion for leave to file Joint Response to Plaintiff's Supplement to its Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, Instanter #281 is granted. The court will entertain no further briefing. Motion hearing date of 4/14/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 8, 2015 Filing 282 Joint NOTICE of Motion by R. Ryan Stoll for presentment of motion for leave to file, #281 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 4/14/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 8, 2015 Filing 281 MOTION by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. for leave to file Joint Response to Plaintiff's Supplement to its Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, Instanter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 7, 2015 Filing 280 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file Supplement to its Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, Instanter #277 is granted. Motion hearing date of 4/14/15 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 6, 2015 Filing 279 NOTICE of Motion by Fiona A Burke for presentment of motion for leave to file #277 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 4/14/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 6, 2015 Filing 278 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago regarding MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file Supplement to its Opposition to Defendants Joint Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, Instanter #277 (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 6, 2015 Filing 277 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file Supplement to its Opposition to Defendants Joint Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, Instanter (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 2, 2015 Filing 276 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, Plaintiff's motion for an order directing the parties to continue discussions related to discovery #273 is denied. Despite the title of the motion, the city is seeking to have limited discovery move forward while the motions to dismiss are pending. The parties are not in agreement on the scope of this limited discovery. The court finds that the better and more efficient approach to discovery is to wait for the assigned District Judge's rulings on the pending motions to dismiss so that the parties can identify the surviving claims, if any, and define the scope of discovery permissible under Rule 26. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
April 1, 2015 Filing 275 MEMORANDUM by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in Opposition to motion for order #273 Defendants' Joint Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For An Order Directing The Parties To Continue Discussions Related To Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 30, 2015 Filing 274 NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for order #273 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 4/2/2015 at 11:00 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 30, 2015 Filing 273 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for order directing parties to continue discussions related to discovery (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 27, 2015 Filing 272 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: According to the parties' joint status report filed on February 6, 2015, the pending motions to dismiss the first amended complaint are dispositive in nature. The court will monitor the docket and issue a follow-up order when appropriate. Mailed notice (ma,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 25, 2015 Filing 271 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER:Case referred to the Honorable Young B. Kim. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/25/15.(gcy, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 24, 2015 Filing 270 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Gilbert for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision. However, due to a conflict with a Defendant in this case, Magistrate Judge Gilbert hereby recuses himself from presiding over discovery supervision in this matter. This case will be referred to the Executive Committee for reassignment of a new magistrate judge by lot. Recusal Order to follow. Judge Gilbert no longer referred to this case. Mailed notice (ber, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 20, 2015 Filing 269 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' application to appear pro hac vice #268 is granted. Attorney Ivana Cingel is given leave to appear as counsel for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 19, 2015 Filing 268 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10456888. (Cingel, Ivana) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 18, 2015 Filing 267 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision. (ntf, ) Notice mailed by judge's staff [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 18, 2015 Filing 266 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing previously set for 3/19/15 is stricken. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Gilbert for discovery supervision. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 16, 2015 Filing 265 Proposed Discovery Plan by Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Proposed] Agreed Confidentiality Order, #2 Exhibit [Proposed] Agreed Confidentiality Order (Redline Comparison))(Drori, Jason) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 16, 2015 Filing 264 Proposed Discovery Plan by City Of Chicago (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Priority Request List, #2 Appendix B - Plaintiff's Proposed Confidentiality Order (Compare), #3 Appendix C - Plaintiff's Proposed Confidentiality Order (Clean))(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 3, 2015 Filing 263 REPLY by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #232 /Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.s Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 3, 2015 Filing 262 REPLY by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #228 /Reply in Support of Defendants Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint Under the Primary Jurisdiction Doctrine and Under Rule 12(B)(6) for Failure to State a Claim (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 3, 2015 Filing 261 REPLY by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMMotion To Dismiss All Claims Against Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(2), Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 9(b) #224 , memorandum in support of motion, #225 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 3, 2015 Filing 260 REPLY by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #226 (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 3, 2015 Filing 259 REPLY by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to motion to dismiss #220 (Drori, Jason) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. The Court denies defendants' joint motion for relief from improper delegation of police power #148 . Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/2/2015. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 26, 2015 Filing 257 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's application to appear pro hac vice #256 is granted. Attorney Anthony Raymond Juzaitis is given leave to appear as counsel for Plaintiff City Of Chicago. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 26, 2015 Filing 256 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10385361. (Juzaitis, Anthony) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 20, 2015 Filing 255 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 3/19/15 at 9:30 a.m. Parties' pending motions #148 , #220 , #224 , #226 , #228 , and #232 are taken under advisement. The court will rule electronically. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file #250 is granted. Plaintiff's oral motion for leave to file a motion to strike is denied. Parties are directed to meet and confer to discuss a discovery schedule and shall report on that schedule at the next status hearing. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 9, 2015 Filing 254 MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago in Opposition to motion to dismiss #220 , motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction,, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #224 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Michael Dolesh, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 9, 2015 Filing 253 SEALED RESPONSE by City Of Chicago to MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint "Corrected" #220 , MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMMotion To Dismiss All Claims Against Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(2), Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 9(b) #224 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Michael Dolesh, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12)(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 9, 2015 Filing 252 MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago in Opposition to motion to dismiss #220 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #228 , motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction,, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #224 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #226 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #232 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 9, 2015 Filing 251 NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for leave to file #250 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/20/2015 at 01:00 PM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 9, 2015 Filing 250 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file Under Seal (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 6, 2015 Filing 249 STATUS Report for Reassigned Case (Joint) by City Of Chicago (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 6, 2015 Filing 248 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for page limit extension #246 is granted. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 5, 2015 Filing 247 UNOPPOSED NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #246 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/10/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 5, 2015 Filing 246 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file excess pages UNOPPOSED (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing UNOPPOSED Motion for Page Limit Extension)(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
February 3, 2015 Filing 245 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' agreed motion for leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants #242 is granted. Attorneys Jeffrey D. Colman, Michael A. Scodro, and Jason M Bradford are given leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants City of Chicago, Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, and Linda Singer. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
January 29, 2015 Filing 244 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey D. Colman for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #242 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/20/2015 at 01:00 PM. (Colman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
January 29, 2015 Filing 243 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey D. Colman for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #242 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/20/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Colman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
January 29, 2015 Filing 242 MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff City Of Chicago, Respondents Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, Linda Singer to withdraw as attorney (Agreed) (Colman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: This case has been reassigned to the calendar of Judge Jorge L. Alonso. Unless otherwise ordered by the court, all previously-set discovery and briefing schedules and deadlines remain intact. All previously-set status dates and motion hearing dates are stricken. A reassignment status conference is set for 2/20/15 at 1:00 p.m. before Judge Alonso in Courtroom 1700. The parties are directed not to file or notice any motions, with the exception of emergency motions, prior to appearing at the reassignment status conference. For all emergency motions arising prior to the date scheduled for the reassignment status conference, the parties are directed to contact chambers. To help the court learn about the case, it is hereby ordered that within 10 calendar days of this order's entry, counsel shall confer, prepare, and file a joint status report, not to exceed five pages. If the defendant's counsel has not yet filed an appearance, the plaintiff's counsel should prepare the status report. The report shall provide the information listed in the court's "Initial Status Report for Reassigned Case," a link to which is provided on Judge Alonso's web site. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER OF THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE: It appearing that, pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on December 19, 2014, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Jorge Luis Alonso; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 306 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Jorge Luis Alonso. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order shall become effective on January 16, 2015. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/16/15.(gcy, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
January 14, 2015 Filing 239 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Plaintiff's Agreed Motion for extension of time to file response #237 is granted. Plaintiff to respond to defendants' motions to dismiss 220, 224, 226, 228 and 232 by 2/9/2015. Defendants to reply by 3/3/2015. Ruling by mail. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
January 13, 2015 Filing 238 NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #237 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/16/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
January 13, 2015 Filing 237 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for extension of time to file response/reply (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 23, 2014 Filing 236 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendants' Motions to Dismiss #220 , #224 , #226 , #228 and #232 are taken under advisement. Plaintiff to respond by 1/26/2015. Defendants to reply by 2/17/2015. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 3/20/2015 at 9:30 AM. The previously filed Motions #58 , #111 , #114 , #117 , #119 and #123 are terminated as moot. No appearance is required on 12/29/2014. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 235 NOTICE of Motion by Charles C. Lifland for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #232 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/29/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 234 DECLARATION of Charles C. Lifland regarding Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #232 / Declaration of Charles C. Lifland in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21)(Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 233 MEMORANDUM by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #232 / Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 232 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM / by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 231 NOTICE of Motion by Charles C. Lifland for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #228 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/29/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 230 DECLARATION of Carolyn J. Kubota regarding Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #228 / Declaration of Carolyn J. Kubota in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21)(Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 229 MEMORANDUM by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #228 / / Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Index of Appendices, #2 Appendix 1, #3 Appendix 2, #4 Appendix 3)(Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 228 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. / Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Under the Primary Jurisdiction Doctrine and Rule 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 227 MEMORANDUM by Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #226 and Under the Primary Jurisdiction Doctrine (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 226 DEFENDANTS ENDO Health Soluktions Inc.'s and ENDO Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s MOTION to Dismiss. (Davis, Joshua) Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office on 12/23/2014 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 225 MEMORANDUM by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss all claims against Defendants pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2), Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 9(b). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Diamantatos, Tinos) Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office on 12/23/2014 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 224 MOTION by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to dismiss all claims against Defendants pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2), Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 9(b). (Diamantatos, Tinos) Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office on 12/23/2014 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 223 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement And Local Rule 3.2 Notification of Affiliates by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 222 NOTICE of Motion by James W Matthews for presentment of motion to dismiss #220 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/29/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 221 MEMORANDUM by Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #220 " Corrrected " (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Declaration of Sheldon V. Hirt in Support of Actavis Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Second Declaration of Sheldon V. Hirt in Support of Actavis Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 220 MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint "Corrected" (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 219 MEMORANDUM by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #218 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 218 MOTION by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Matthews, James) (Duplicate filing of Entry No. 220 - Modified by Clerk's Office on 12/22/2014)(sxw). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 217 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by William G. Potter (Potter, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 216 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Jason L Drori (Drori, Jason) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 215 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Katy E Koski (Koski, Katy) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 214 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by James W Matthews (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 213 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Peter Vincent Baugher (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 212 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Steven G. Reade (Reade, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 211 Defendant Endo Health Solutions Inc.'s Amended Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Local Rule 3.2 Notification of Affiliates. (Davis, Joshua) Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office on 12/23/2014 (jh, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 210 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 209 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Kristen Elizabeth Hudson (Hudson, Kristen) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 208 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Melissa A Ku (Ku, Melissa) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 207 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Joanna G Persio (Persio, Joanna) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 206 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Joshua M. Davis (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 18, 2014 Filing 205 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Ruling on Defendants' Joint Motion for relief from improper delegation of governmental police power to a financially-interested private party #148 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 2/2/2015 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2014 Filing 204 Enter MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/15/2014. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 15, 2014 Filing 203 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendants' Motion to disqualify counsel #101 is denied. Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 3, 2014 Filing 202 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City Of Chicago. Actavis, Inc. waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
December 3, 2014 Filing 201 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City Of Chicago. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 26, 2014 Filing 200 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City Of Chicago. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 11/17/2014, answer due 1/16/2015. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 26, 2014 Filing 199 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City Of Chicago. Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 26, 2014 Filing 198 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City Of Chicago. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 26, 2014 Filing 197 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City Of Chicago. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 21, 2014 Filing 196 REPLY by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson to MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Relief From Improper Delegation of Governmental Police Power To A Financially-Interested Private Party (Joint Motion for Relief from Improper Delegation of Governmental Police #148 (Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 21, 2014 Filing 195 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Joint Motion for extension of time until 12/19/2014 to file responsive pleading and page limit #188 is granted. Plaintiff to respond to defendants' responsive pleadings by 1/26/2015. Defendants to reply by 2/17/2015. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 18, 2014 Filing 194 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notification of Affiliates (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 18, 2014 Filing 193 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. by J. Gordon Cooney, Jr (Cooney, J.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 18, 2014 Filing 192 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. by Steven A. Reed (Reed, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 17, 2014 Filing 191 NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for leave to file excess pages, motion for relief,,, #188 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/24/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 14, 2014 Filing 190 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. by Tinos Diamantatos (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 14, 2014 Filing 189 NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 14, 2014 Filing 188 MOTION by Defendant Cephalon, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to amended complaint #186 Joint Motion for Extension of Time and Page Limit, MOTION by Defendant Cephalon, Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 10, 2014 Filing 187 CERTIFICATE of Service by Linda Singer on behalf of City Of Chicago regarding sealed document 185 , amended complaint #186 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 10, 2014 Filing 186 First AMENDED complaint by City Of Chicago against All Defendants (Redactions Per Nov. 6, 2014 Order) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A through C)(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 10, 2014 Filing 185 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago First Amended Complaint (Fully Unredacted Per Nov. 6, 2014 Order) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit A through C)(Singer, Linda) Modified on 11/10/2014 (mjc, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 7, 2014 Filing 184 RESPONSE by City Of Chicagoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Relief From Improper Delegation of Governmental Police Power To A Financially-Interested Private Party (Joint Motion for Relief from Improper Delegation of Governmental Police #148 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 6, 2014 Filing 183 Enter ORDER Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/6/2014. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER: Defendants objections to unredacting the Citys first amended complaint are granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs motion for leave to file a fully unredacted first amended complaint under seal #171 is granted. Plaintiff is to publicly file an amended complaint containing only the redactions approved in the order by 11/10/2014. Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/6/2014. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 6, 2014 Filing 181 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City Of Chicago. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 11/4/2014, answer due 1/5/2015. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 3, 2014 Filing 180 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Carolyn June Kubota (Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 3, 2014 Filing 179 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Charles C. Lifland (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 3, 2014 Filing 178 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City Of Chicago. Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 10/30/2014, answer due 12/29/2014. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
November 3, 2014 Filing 177 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City Of Chicago. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. waiver sent on 10/30/2014, answer due 12/29/2014. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 31, 2014 Filing 176 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion hearing held on 10/31/2014 regarding motion for leave to file. Mailed notice (jdh) Modified on 11/3/2014 (ef, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 29, 2014 Filing 175 OBJECTIONS DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INC.S OBJECTIONS TO LIFTING THE SEAL ON THE UNREDACTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 29, 2014 Filing 174 OBJECTIONS by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson to text entry, #170 , order on motion for leave to file, terminate hearings, motion hearing, terminate motion and R&R deadlines/hearings, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,,,,,,,,,, #163 , MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file The Unredacted First Amended Complaint Under Seal #161 /Jannsen Defendants' Objections to the Unsealing of Jannsen's Confidential Information Appearing in Paragraphs 279 and 280 of the First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 27, 2014 Filing 173 CERTIFICATE of Service by Linda Singer on behalf of City Of Chicago regarding MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file a Fully Unredacted First Amended Complaint Under Seal #171 , notice of motion #172 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 27, 2014 Filing 172 NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for leave to file #171 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/31/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 27, 2014 Filing 171 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file a Fully Unredacted First Amended Complaint Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 22, 2014 Filing 170 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The order entered in this case following the hearing on 10/20/14 is clarified to state, as I stated on the record, that defendants are given until 10/29/14 to file any objections to lifting the seal on the unredacted amended complaint. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 21, 2014 Filing 169 CERTIFICATE of Service for First Amended Complaint (Revised Redactions) by Linda Singer on behalf of City Of Chicago regarding amended complaint #168 , sealed document 167 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 21, 2014 Filing 168 First AMENDED complaint by City Of Chicago against City Of Chicago (Revised Redactions) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A through C)(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 21, 2014 Filing 167 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago First Amended Complaint (Revised Redactions) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit A through C)(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 20, 2014 Filing 166 CERTIFICATE of Service for First Amended Complaint by Linda Singer on behalf of City Of Chicago regarding amended complaint 164 , sealed document 165 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 20, 2014 Filing 165 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago Sealed First Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit A through C)(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 20, 2014 Filing 164 First AMENDED complaint by City Of Chicago against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A through C)(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 20, 2014 Filing 163 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion hearing held on 10/20/2014 regarding motion for leave to file #161 . Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file the unredacted first amended complaint under seal #161 is temporarily granted. The first amended complaint will remain under seal until 11/3/2014. Defendants to file any objections to by 10/29/2014. Ruling by mail. Plaintiff given until 11/7/2014 to respond to defendants' joint motion for relief from improper delegation of governmental police power to a financially-interested private party. Defendants to reply by 11/21/2014. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo reset to 12/19/2014 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 14, 2014 Filing 162 NOTICE of Motion by Linda Singer for presentment of motion for leave to file #161 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/20/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 14, 2014 Filing 161 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file The Unredacted First Amended Complaint Under Seal (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 14, 2014 Filing 160 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The Order dated 10/10/2014 is amended as follows: Defendants Johnson & Johnsons and Janssen Pharmaceutrical, Inc.s Motion for a protective order #90 and Defendant Cephalon, Inc.s Motion for a protective order #96 are denied. Proposed Intervenor USA Today's Renewed Petition for leave to intervene #132 is denied as moot. The remainder of the Order to stand. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 10, 2014 Filing 159 Enter MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/10/2014. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER: Defendants Johnson & Johnsons and Janssen Pharmaceutrical, Inc.s Motion for a protective order #90 and Defendant Cephalon, Inc.s Motion for a protective order #96 are denied as moot. Defendants Joint Motion for relief from improper delegation of governmental police power to a financially-interested private party #148 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff to respond by 10/31/2014. Defendants to reply by 11/14/2014. Ruling set for 12/12/2-14 at 9:30 a.m. Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/10/2014. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
October 2, 2014 Filing 157 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The ruling on the Purdue Defendants' motion to disqualify counsel (Dkt. No. 101) will be by mail. No appearance is required on 10/3/2014.Mailed notice (mad, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 24, 2014 Filing 156 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Plaintiff's Uncontested Motion for extension of time #146 is granted. Plaintiff to file its First Amended Complaint by 10/20/2014. Defendants to file their responsive pleadings by 12/4/2014. Plaintiff to respond to defendants' responsive pleadings by 1/5/2015. Defendant to reply by 1/26/2015. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo reset to 3/13/2015 at 9:30 a.m. Defendants' Joint Motion for relief from improper delegation of governmental police power to a financially-interested private party #148 is taken under advisement. No appearance is required on 9/25/2014. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 22, 2014 Filing 155 NOTICE of Motion by Mary Eileen Cunniff Wells for presentment of extension of time #146 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/25/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Wells, Mary) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 19, 2014 Filing 154 DECLARATION of Patrick Fitzgerald regarding motion for miscellaneous relief, #148 in support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Relief from Improper Delegation of Governmental Police Power To A Financially-Interested Private Party) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 19, 2014 Filing 153 DECLARATION of Tinos Diamantatos regarding motion for miscellaneous relief, #148 in support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Relief from Improper Delegation of Governmental Police Power To A Financially-Interested Private Party) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 19, 2014 Filing 152 DECLARATION of Joshua M. Davis regarding motion for miscellaneous relief, #148 in support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Relief from Improper Delegation of Governmental Police Power To A Financially-Interested Private Party) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 19, 2014 Filing 151 DECLARATION of Scott D. Stein regarding motion for miscellaneous relief, #148 in support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Relief from Improper Delegation of Governmental Police Power To A Financially-Interested Private Party) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 19, 2014 Filing 150 NOTICE of Motion by Carolyn June Kubota for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #148 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/25/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 19, 2014 Filing 149 MEMORANDUM motion for miscellaneous relief, #148 by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Relief from Improper Delegation of Governmental Police Power To A Financially-Interested Private Party) (Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 19, 2014 Filing 148 MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Relief From Improper Delegation of Governmental Police Power To A Financially-Interested Private Party (Joint Motion for Relief from Improper Delegation of Governmental Police Power to a Financially-Interested Private Party) (Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 18, 2014 Filing 147 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Proposed Intervenor USA Today's Renewed Petition for leave to intervene #132 is taken under advisement. Ruling on Defendants' motions for a protective order [90 and 96] and USA Today's petition to intervene #132 will be by mail. No appearance is required on 9/22/2014 or 9/24/2014. Application to appear pro hac vice of Joshua Glickman as counsel for plaintiff City of Chicago #140 is granted. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 16, 2014 Filing 146 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for extension of time (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 15, 2014 Filing 145 REPLY by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc. to motion to disqualify counsel #101 (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 12, 2014 Filing 144 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Joshua Dubin Glickman (Glickman, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 11, 2014 Filing 143 REPLY by Cephalon, Inc. to Response, #131 , MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson for protective order #90 , reply #141 , MOTION by Defendant Cephalon, Inc. for protective order Defendant Cephalon, Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order #96 , memorandum in support of motion #91 Defendant Cephalon, Inc.'s Reply Memorandum To The City of Chicago's Response To Cephalon, Inc.'s Motion For A Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 11, 2014 Filing 142 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson regarding reply #141 (Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 11, 2014 Filing 141 REPLY by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson to motion for protective order #90 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 11, 2014 Filing 140 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9851313. (Glickman, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 8, 2014 Filing 139 RESPONSE by City Of Chicago, Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, Linda Singerin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc. to disqualify counsel for Plaintiff, Linda Singer and Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC #101 (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20)(Colman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 8, 2014 Filing 138 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Jason Michael Bradford (Bradford, Jason) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 8, 2014 Filing 137 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Jeffrey D. Colman (Colman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 8, 2014 Filing 136 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Michael Anthony Scodro (Scodro, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 5, 2014 Filing 135 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Agreed Motion for leave to file a brief in excess fifteen pages #129 is granted. Motion to withdraw of Eric A. Harrington as attorney for plaintiff #134 is granted. Attorney Eric Harrington terminated. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 5, 2014 Filing 134 MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff City Of Chicago to withdraw as attorney Eric A. Harrington (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 4, 2014 Filing 133 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Irvine Cummings for presentment of motion to intervene #132 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/22/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Cummings, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 4, 2014 Filing 132 MOTION by Intervenor USA Today to intervene -- PROPOSED INTERVENOR USA TODAY'S RENEWED PETITION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(Cummings, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 4, 2014 Filing 131 RESPONSE by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to motion for protective order #90 , motion for protective order #96 , memorandum in support of motion #91 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 3, 2014 Filing 130 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey D. Colman for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #129 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/8/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Colman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 3, 2014 Filing 129 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago, Respondents Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, Linda Singer for leave to file excess pages /Agreed (Colman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 3, 2014 Filing 128 NOTICE by Actavis PLC re memorandum in support of motion #112 Original Signature Exhibit A (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Original Signature))(Marietti, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
September 3, 2014 Filing 127 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for leave to appear of Jeffery D. Colman, Michael A. Scodro and Jason M. Bradford of the law firm of Jenner & Block LLP as additional counsel for City of Chicago and in conjunction of Purdue's disqualification motion #106 is granted. Various defendants Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #111 , #114 , #117 , #119 and #123 are taken under advisement. The briefing schedule previously set calling for plaintiff to respond by 10/13/2014 and defendants replies due by 11/3/2014. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/9/2014 at 9:30 AM. All motion noticed for 9/4/2014 are stricken as unnecessary. No appearances are required on 9/4/2014 and 9/22/2014. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 126 DECLARATION of Charles C. Lifland regarding Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #123 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30)(Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 125 NOTICE of Motion by Charles C. Lifland for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #123 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/4/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 124 MEMORANDUM by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #123 (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 123 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM(Defendant Johnson & Johnson and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 122 DECLARATION of Carolyn J. Kubota regarding Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction,, #119 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 121 NOTICE of Motion by Charles C. Lifland for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction,, #119 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/4/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 120 MEMORANDUM by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction,, #119 (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 119 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under the Primary Jurisdiction Doctrine and Under Rule 12 (b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 118 MEMORANDUM by Endo Health Solutions in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #117 and Under the Primary Jurisdiction Doctrine (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 117 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND UNDER THE PRIMARY JURISDICTION DOCTRINE (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 116 NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction,, #114 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/4/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 115 MEMORANDUM by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction,, #114 Memorandum of Law in Support of The Motion To Dismiss All Claims Against Cephalon, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(2), Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 9(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 114 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION by Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Cephalon, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Motion To Dismiss All Claims Against Cephalon, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(2), Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 9(b) (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 113 NOTICE of Motion by James W Matthews for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #111 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/4/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM by Actavis PLC in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #111 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Sheldon V. Hirt)(Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 111 MOTION by Defendant Actavis PLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and for failure to state a claim (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 26, 2014 Filing 110 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, Linda Singer by Michael Anthony Scodro (Scodro, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 109 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, Linda Singer by Jason Michael Bradford (Bradford, Jason) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 108 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Linda Singer, Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC by Jeffrey D. Colman (Colman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 107 NOTICE of Motion by Mary Eileen Cunniff Wells for presentment of motion for leave to appear #106 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/22/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Wells, Mary) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 106 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to appear as additional counsel (Wells, Mary) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 105 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendants' Motion to disqualify counsel #101 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff to respond by 9/8/2014. Defendants' to reply by 9/15/2014. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/3/2014 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 21, 2014 Filing 104 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald for presentment of motion to disqualify counsel #101 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/22/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 21, 2014 Filing 103 APPENDIX memorandum in support of motion #102 to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Linda Singer and Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 21, 2014 Filing 102 MEMORANDUM by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc. in support of motion to disqualify counsel #101 for Plaintiff, Linda Singer and Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 21, 2014 Filing 101 MOTION by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc. to disqualify counsel for Plaintiff, Linda Singer and Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 20, 2014 Filing 100 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Proposed Intervenors' Motion to intervene #66 is withdrawn. Application to appear pro hac vice of Jason L. Droi #85 , Katy E. Koski #86 , William G. Potter #87 and James W. Matthews #88 as counsel for defendant Actavis plc are granted. Defendants' Motions for protective order #90 , #96 are taken under advisement. Responses due by 9/4/2014. Defendants' replies due by 9/11/2014. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/24/2014 at 9:30 AM. Various Defendants' Uncontested Motion for leave to file excess pages #98 is granted. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 19, 2014 Filing 99 NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #98 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/25/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 19, 2014 Filing 98 MOTION by Defendant Cephalon, Inc. for leave to file excess pages Uncontested Motion for Extension of Page Limit (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 18, 2014 Filing 97 NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion for protective order #96 , motion for protective order #90 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/21/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 18, 2014 Filing 96 MOTION by Defendant Cephalon, Inc. for protective order Defendant Cephalon, Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 18, 2014 Filing 95 NOTICE of Motion by Michael P. Doss for presentment of motion for protective order #90 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/21/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 18, 2014 Filing 94 DECLARATION of Carolyn J. Kubota regarding motion for protective order #90 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 18, 2014 Filing 93 EXHIBIT by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson regarding declaration #92 (Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 18, 2014 Filing 92 DECLARATION of Michael P. Doss regarding motion for protective order #90 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 18, 2014 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of motion for protective order #90 (Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 18, 2014 Filing 90 MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson for protective order (Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 18, 2014 Filing 89 ACTAVIS PLC'S RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND LOCAL RULE 3.2 NOTIFICATION OF AFFILIATES by Actavis PLC (Marietti, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 18, 2014 Filing 88 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9774555. (Matthews, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 18, 2014 Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9774536. (Potter, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 18, 2014 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9774510. (Koski, Katy) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
August 18, 2014 Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9774457. (Drori, Jason) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 28, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY WITHDRAWAL OF PETITION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE BY PROPOSED INTERVENORS THE CHICAGO TRIBUNE, THE LOS ANGELES TIMES, AND USA TODAY by Chicago Tribune Company, Los Angeles Times, USA Today (Cummings, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 24, 2014 Filing 83 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion hearing held on 7/24/2014 regarding motion to intervene #66 . Counsel for the proposed intervenors to advise the Court in writing if the petition will be withdrawn by 8/1/2014. Application to appear pro hac vice of Joshua M. Davis #77 , Joanna G. Persio #78 , Melissa A. Ku #79 and Steven G. Reade #80 as counsel for defendant Endo Health Solutions are granted. Ruling as to defendants' motion to dismiss before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/9/2014 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 22, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE by City Of Chicago of Filing Fully Unredacted Complaint (Attachments: #1 Supplement Fully Unredacted Complaint)(Harrington, Eric) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 22, 2014 Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9693752. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Attachment A)(Reade, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 22, 2014 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9692673. (Ku, Melissa) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 22, 2014 Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9691784. (Persio, Joanna) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 22, 2014 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9691680. (Davis, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 17, 2014 Filing 82 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion hearing held on 7/17/2014 regarding motion to intervene #66 and continued to 7/24/2014 at 9:30 AM. Petition for leave to intervene by proposed intervenors The Chicago Tribune, The Los Angeles Times and USA Today #66 is entered and continued. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 17, 2014 Filing 76 Copy of Complaint with all Redactions Removed Except Those Redactions that Pertain to Allegations Based on Information Provided by the American Pain Foundation by City Of Chicago (Harrington, Eric) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 16, 2014 Filing 75 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file the complaint under seal #49 is withdrawn. Uncontested Motion for extension of time until 7/28/2014 for defendant Actavis PLC to respond to plaintiff's complaint #70 is granted. Motion to withdraw #72 is granted. Joint Motion for orders authorizing plaintiff to disclose to defendants redacted allegations based on information produced by the American Pain Foundation and extending defendants' time to respond to plaintiff's complaint until 8/29/2014 and plaintiff's time to respond to defendants' responsive pleading until 10/13/2014 and defendants' time to reply until 11/3/2014 #72 is granted. Hearing on the motion to intervene set for 7/17/2014 to stand. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 16, 2014 Filing 74 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Endo Health Solutions by Nicholas A Gowen (Gowen, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 16, 2014 Filing 72 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to withdraw motion for leave to file #49 the Complaint Under Seal, MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for order (1) Authorizing Plaintiff To Disclose To Defendants Redacted Allegations Based On Information Produced By The American Pain Foundation; and (2) Extending Defendants Time To Respond To Plaintiffs Complaint, Plaintiffs Time To Respond To Defendants Responsive Pleadings, and Defendants Time To Reply (Joint Motion) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Joint Motion to Withdraw Motion to File Complaint Under Seal and Joint Motions For Order Seeking Authorization to Disclose Redacted Materials to Defendants and Extensions of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, Defendants' Response and Defendants' Reply)(Harrington, Eric) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 15, 2014 Filing 71 NOTICE of Motion by Nicholas William Marietti for presentment of extension of time #70 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 7/18/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Marietti, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 15, 2014 Filing 70 MOTION by Defendant Actavis PLC for extension of time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (UNCONTESTED) (Marietti, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 15, 2014 Filing 69 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Actavis PLC by Nicholas William Marietti (Marietti, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 15, 2014 Filing 68 ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor USA Today by George Freeman Galland, Jr (Galland, George) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 73 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Hearing on plaintiff's motion for leave to file complaint under seal #49 set for 7/17/2014 at 9:30 AM. Application to appear pro hac vice of Steven A. Reed as counsel for defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. and Cephalon, Inc. #53 is granted. Mailed notice (jdh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 67 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Irvine Cummings for presentment of motion to intervene #66 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 7/17/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Cummings, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 66 MOTION by Intervenor Parties Chicago Tribune Company, Los Angeles Times, USA Today to intervene -- PETITION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE BY PROPOSED INTERVENORS THE CHICAGO TRIBUNE, THE LOS ANGELES TIMES, AND USA TODAY (Cummings, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 65 ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor USA Today by Jeffrey Irvine Cummings (Cummings, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 9, 2014 Filing 64 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo for all further proceedings. Entered by Executive Committee on 7/9/14.(gcy, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 9, 2014 Filing 63 ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Parties Chicago Tribune Company, Los Angeles Times by George Freeman Galland, Jr (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Galland, George) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 9, 2014 Filing 62 ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Parties Chicago Tribune Company, Los Angeles Times by Jeffrey Irvine Cummings (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cummings, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 9, 2014 Filing 61 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion for order #58 deferring presentment of motion to file amended complaint under seal is granted and the presentment date of 7/10/2014 is stricken. This Court has signed a recusal order in this case. The receiving Judge is requested to hear the motion to file under seal on 7/17/2014, pursuant to the parties' request for such a continuance. Mailed notice (gds) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 9, 2014 Filing 60 EXHIBIT by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson regarding MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson for order Deferring Presentment of Plaintiff's Motion to File Amended Complaint Under SealMOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & JohnsonAuthorizing Plaintiff to Disclose to Defendants Redacted Allegations Based on Information Produced by the American Pain Foundation #58 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 9, 2014 Filing 59 NOTICE of Motion by Michael P. Doss for presentment of motion for order, motion for miscellaneous relief,, #58 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/15/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 9, 2014 Filing 58 MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson for order Deferring Presentment of Plaintiff's Motion to File Amended Complaint Under Seal, MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & JohnsonAuthorizing Plaintiff to Disclose to Defendants Redacted Allegations Based on Information Produced by the American Pain Foundation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 8, 2014 Filing 56 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Notice to withdraw #55 is granted and the motion to remand #10 is withdrawn. Telephone notice (gds) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 8, 2014 Filing 55 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to withdraw motion to remand #10 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 8, 2014 Filing 54 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago Correcting Exhibit G regarding memorandum in support of motion, #50 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 8, 2014 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9645255. (Reed, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 8, 2014 Filing 52 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff City Of Chicago Correcting Exhibit A regarding memorandum in support of motion, #50 (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: Motion #47 of J. Gordon Cooney for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. (gcy, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 7, 2014 Filing 51 NOTICE of Motion by Linda Jill Singer for presentment of motion for leave to file #49 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/10/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 7, 2014 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago in support of motion for leave to file #49 Complaint Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 7, 2014 Filing 49 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago for leave to file Complaint Under Seal (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 7, 2014 Filing 48 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant Janssen's motion #25 for extension of time to 7/28/2014 to respond to the complaint is granted. Purdue defendants' motion #37 for extension of time to 7/28/2014 to respond to the complaint is granted. Defendant Endo Health's motion #40 for extension of time to 7/28/2014 to respond to the complaint is granted. Defendant Cephalon's motion #45 for extension of time to 7/28/2014 to respond to the complaint is granted. Motion presentment date of 7/9/2014 is stricken. Mailed notice (gds) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 7, 2014 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9642677. (Cooney, J.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 3, 2014 Filing 46 NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of extension of time #45 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/9/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 3, 2014 Filing 45 MOTION by Defendant Cephalon, Inc. for extension of time UNCONTESTED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 3, 2014 Filing 44 NOTICE of Motion by R. Ryan Stoll for presentment of extension of time #37 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/9/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 3, 2014 Filing 43 NOTICE of Motion by Kristen Elizabeth Hudson for presentment of extension of time #40 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/9/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Hudson, Kristen) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 42 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman for all further proceedings, pursuant to 28 USC Section 455(b)(4). Signed by Executive Committee on 7/2/2014. (For further details see order.) (mgh, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE of Motion by Kristen Elizabeth Hudson for presentment of extension of time #40 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/9/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Hudson, Kristen) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 40 MOTION by Defendant Endo Health Solutions for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Uncontested) (Hudson, Kristen) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 39 AMENDED other, #4 Notice of Removal of Action by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Hudson, Kristen) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 38 NOTICE of Motion by R. Ryan Stoll for presentment of extension of time #37 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/8/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 37 MOTION by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc. for extension of time to Respond, Answer, or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint (Uncontested) (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 36 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd. by Tinos Diamantatos (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City Of Chicago. (Wells, Mary) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 33 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Endo Health Solutions by Kristen Elizabeth Hudson (Hudson, Kristen) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Endo Health Solutions by Peter Vincent Baugher (Baugher, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City Of Chicago (Wells, Mary) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City Of Chicago (Wells, Mary) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 1, 2014 Filing 29 NOTICE by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc. of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Objections as to Diversity of the Purdue Defendants (Uncontested) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
July 1, 2014 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: On the Court's own motion, the status hearing and motion presentment hearing set for 7/2/2014 are stricken. The parties shall await further orders from the Court. Mailed notice (ac, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 25, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Johnson & Johnson (jp, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 25, 2014 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Michael P. Doss for presentment of extension of time #25 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/2/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 25, 2014 Filing 25 MOTION by Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. for extension of time To Respond To Plaintiffs Complaint (Joint Motion) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 25, 2014 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Charles C. Lifland (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 25, 2014 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc. by R. Ryan Stoll (Stoll, R.) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 25, 2014 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Carolyn June Kubota (Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 25, 2014 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. by Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald (Fitzgerald, Patrick) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/28/2016 (ph, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 25, 2014 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City Of Chicago (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 25, 2014 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City Of Chicago (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 19, 2014 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion hearing held on Defendant City of Chicago's motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447 (c), to remand this case to the state court. The motion is entered and continued to 7/2/2014 at 9:00 a.,m. for the reason stated on the record. The Pro hac vice motions of Charles Lifland and Carolyn Kubata for leave to appear on behalf of Johnson & Johnson and Janssen Pharmaceuticals #13 , #14 , and that of Linda Singer and Eric Harrington for the City of Chicago #15 , #17 are granted. Mailed notice (ac, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 17, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Actavis PLC, Cephalon, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc. (jp, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 17, 2014 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Linda Jill Singer (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 17, 2014 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9584976. (Singer, Linda) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 17, 2014 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Eric Harrington (Harrington, Eric) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 17, 2014 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9584620. (Harrington, Eric) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 16, 2014 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9583151. (Kubota, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 16, 2014 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9583127. (Lifland, Charles) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 16, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Fiona A Burke for presentment of motion to remand #10 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 6/19/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 16, 2014 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago in support of motion to remand #10 (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 16, 2014 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff City Of Chicago to remand (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 16, 2014 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Mary Eileen Cunniff Wells (Wells, Mary) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 12, 2014 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Michael J. Dolesh (Dolesh, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 12, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE of Correction regarding notice of removal 1 . (gcy, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 12, 2014 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Fiona Burke. (Burke, Fiona) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 12, 2014 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Scott David Stein (Stein, Scott) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 11, 2014 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (daj, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 11, 2014 Filing 4 Corrected Notice of Removal by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., endo health solutions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Supplement Janssen Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Supplement Endo Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 11, 2014 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Michael P. Doss (Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 11, 2014 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Doss, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]
June 11, 2014 Filing 1 ENTERED IN ERROR (Doss, Michael). Modified on 6/12/2014 (gcy, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/22/2017.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Chicago v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn June Kubota
Represented By: Rodriguez Esteban
Represented By: Esteban Rodriguez
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Dave Roberts
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald
Represented By: Hayden A. Coleman
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Robert S Hoff
Represented By: Gretchen Maria Wolf
Represented By: Sheila L. Birnbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Represented By: Ana M. Francisco
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: Katy E Koski
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Jennifer Levy
Represented By: Timothy William Knapp
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Jeremy A. Menkowitz
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: David Barry Goroff
Represented By: Jane E. Dudzinski
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: Jason L Drori
Represented By: Megan Rose Braden
Represented By: William G. Potter
Represented By: Jonathan William Garlough
Represented By: Katy E. Koski
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Jason R. Parish
Represented By: Ana M. Francisco
Represented By: Jennifer Levy
Represented By: Timothy William Knapp
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Jeremy A. Menkowitz
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Jane E. Dudzinski
Represented By: Megan Rose Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Doss
Represented By: Carolyn June Kubota
Represented By: Rodriguez Esteban
Represented By: Esteban Rodriguez
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Dave Roberts
Represented By: Ivana Cingel
Represented By: Scott David Stein
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Joanna G Persio
Represented By: Steven G. Reade
Represented By: Jonathan L. Stern
Represented By: Joshua M. Davis
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Kristen Elizabeth Hudson
Represented By: Melissa A Ku
Represented By: Peter Vincent Baugher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Represented By: Ana M. Francisco
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: Katy E Koski
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Jennifer Levy
Represented By: Timothy William Knapp
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Jeremy A. Menkowitz
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: David Barry Goroff
Represented By: Jane E. Dudzinski
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: Jason L Drori
Represented By: Megan Rose Braden
Represented By: William G. Potter
Represented By: Jonathan William Garlough
Represented By: Katy E. Koski
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Represented By: Ana M. Francisco
Represented By: Katy E Koski
Represented By: Jennifer Levy
Represented By: Timothy William Knapp
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: David Barry Goroff
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: Jason L Drori
Represented By: William G. Potter
Represented By: Nicholas William Marietti
Represented By: Jonathan William Garlough
Represented By: Katy E. Koski
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn June Kubota
Represented By: Rodriguez Esteban
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Dave Roberts
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Jeremy A. Menkowitz
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Jane E. Dudzinski
Represented By: Megan Rose Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Represented By: Ana M. Francisco
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: Katy E Koski
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Jennifer Levy
Represented By: Timothy William Knapp
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Jeremy A. Menkowitz
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: David Barry Goroff
Represented By: Jane E. Dudzinski
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: Jason L Drori
Represented By: Megan Rose Braden
Represented By: William G. Potter
Represented By: Jonathan William Garlough
Represented By: Katy E. Koski
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald
Represented By: Hayden A. Coleman
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Robert S Hoff
Represented By: Gretchen Maria Wolf
Represented By: Sheila L. Birnbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael P. Doss
Represented By: Carolyn June Kubota
Represented By: Rodriguez Esteban
Represented By: Esteban Rodriguez
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Dave Roberts
Represented By: Ivana Cingel
Represented By: Scott David Stein
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jason R. Parish
Represented By: Ana M. Francisco
Represented By: Katy E Koski
Represented By: Jennifer Levy
Represented By: Timothy William Knapp
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: David Barry Goroff
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: Jason L Drori
Represented By: William G. Potter
Represented By: Jonathan William Garlough
Represented By: Katy E. Koski
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company Inc.
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: endo health solutions
Represented By: Joanna G Persio
Represented By: Steven G. Reade
Represented By: Jonathan L. Stern
Represented By: Nicholas A. Gowen
Represented By: Joshua M. Davis
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Kristen Elizabeth Hudson
Represented By: Melissa A Ku
Represented By: Peter Vincent Baugher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Represented By: Ana M. Francisco
Represented By: Katy E Koski
Represented By: Jennifer Levy
Represented By: Timothy William Knapp
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: Jason L Drori
Represented By: William G. Potter
Represented By: Jonathan William Garlough
Represented By: Katy E. Koski
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPOMED, INC.
Represented By: Michael J. Shepard
Represented By: Robert B. Hawk
Represented By: David J. Stetler
Represented By: Christopher Mitchell
Represented By: Samuel R. Welch
Represented By: Mariah E Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald
Represented By: Hayden A. Coleman
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Robert S Hoff
Represented By: Gretchen Maria Wolf
Represented By: Sheila L. Birnbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald
Represented By: Hayden A. Coleman
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Robert S Hoff
Represented By: Gretchen Maria Wolf
Represented By: Sheila L. Birnbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Joanna G Persio
Represented By: Steven G. Reade
Represented By: Nicholas A. Gowen
Represented By: Jonathan L. Stern
Represented By: Joshua M. Davis
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Represented By: Kristen Elizabeth Hudson
Represented By: Melissa A Ku
Represented By: Peter Vincent Baugher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn June Kubota
Represented By: Rodriguez Esteban
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Dave Roberts
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Ana M. Francisco
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Jeremy A. Menkowitz
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: David Barry Goroff
Represented By: Jane E. Dudzinski
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: Jason L Drori
Represented By: Megan Rose Braden
Represented By: William G. Potter
Represented By: Jonathan William Garlough
Represented By: Katy E. Koski
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Linda Singer
Represented By: Jason Michael Bradford
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Colman
Represented By: Michael Anthony Scodro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
Represented By: Jason Michael Bradford
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Colman
Represented By: Michael Anthony Scodro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Of Chicago
Represented By: Joshua Dubin Glickman
Represented By: Kara Anne Elgersma
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: David I. Ackerman
Represented By: Jason Michael Bradford
Represented By: Bryan D. Pasciak
Represented By: Fiona A. Burke
Represented By: Eric Harrington
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Nelson
Represented By: Michael J. Dolesh
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Colman
Represented By: Thomas Arthur Doyle
Represented By: Thomas P. McNulty
Represented By: Justin Nicholas Boley
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Smith
Represented By: Brian E. Bowcut
Represented By: Mary Eileen Cunniff Wells
Represented By: Bethany R. Turke
Represented By: Adam Michael Prom
Represented By: Anthony Raymond Juzaitis
Represented By: Michael Anthony Scodro
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Represented By: Joseph F. Rice
Represented By: Adam M. Prom
Represented By: Justin Tresnowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: USA Today
Represented By: Jeffrey Irvine Cummings
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Los Angeles Times
Represented By: Jeffrey Irvine Cummings
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Chicago Tribune Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Irvine Cummings
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?