Bickerstaff v. Cuyahoga County et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Bickerstaff
Defendant: Cuyahoga County, Michael C. O'Malley, Clifford Pinkney, City of Cleveland, Daniel J. McCandless, Delonzo Goshen, Donald Nuti, Timothy McKenzie and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2018cv01142
Filed: May 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Christopher A. Boyko
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Memorandum Opinion and Order: For the reasons set forth in this order, the Court finds that the Magistrate Judge's Order denying Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Recusal is neither clearly erroneous or contrary to law. Plaintiff's Objection (Doc. No. 132 ) is overruled. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 4/15/2020. (L,Ja)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Memorandum Opinion and Order. For reasons set forth in this order, The Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Parker 87 is therefore ADOPTED with the sole exception that the Court finds that Plaintiffs Supplemental Brief (Doc. No. 69) and Sur-replies (Doc. Nos. 77, 83) should be marked on the docket as stricken. The County Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. No. 41) is GRANTED, and the John Doe Assistant County Prosecutor Defendants are sua sponte DISMISSED. The City of Cleveland and Officer Defendants Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. No. 43) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/21/2019. (L,Ja)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order: The County Defendants' 42 motion to stay discovery is DENIED in part with regard to initial disclosures and GRANTED in part with respect to all other discovery. The County Defendants shall make their initial disclosures on or before 4/19/2019. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 4/8/2019. (D,JJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bickerstaff v. Cuyahoga County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Bickerstaff
Represented By: Steven J. Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuyahoga County
Represented By: Jennifer M. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. O'Malley
Represented By: Jennifer M. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Pinkney
Represented By: Jennifer M. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cleveland
Represented By: William M. Menzalora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. McCandless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delonzo Goshen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Nuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?