CRS Metalworx, Inc. et al v. Federal Constructors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: CRS Metalworx, Inc. and United States of America
Defendant: Federal Constructors, Inc. and North American Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv02202
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon North American Specialty Insurance Company (certified mail #. Service attempted by certified mail Receipt # 70162140000102826387 on 11/12/2018, marked return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. filed on behalf of CRS Metalworx, Inc., United States of America (L,Ja)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon North American Specialty Insurance Company on 11/13/2018, filed on behalf of CRS Metalworx, Inc.; United States of America Related document #1 , #9 . (L,Ja)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting the parties Proposed Stipulation for Extension of Time for 14 days, up to and including November 28, 2018. Related document #10 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 11/14/2018. (R,Sh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 Second Proposed Stipulation for Extension of Time for 14 days, up to and including November 28, 2018 to answer complaint filed by Federal Constructors, Inc. Related document(s) #1 .(Grashoff, Matthew)
November 8, 2018 Service by Clerk. Alias Summons and Complaint addressed to North American Specialty Insurance Company placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70162140000128826394. (S,SR)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 Alias Summons issued to counsel for service upon North American Specialty Insurance Company c/o James V. Hatem LLP. (P,WL)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 Praecipe for issuance of Alias Summons filed by CRS Metalworx, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Loftus, Nora)
November 7, 2018 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to North American Specialty Insurance Company placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70162140000102826387. (Second Attempt at 650 Elm Street address) (B,R)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting the Parties' #6 Motion (Stipulation) for extension of time until November 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 10/24/2018. (R,Sh)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to answer until November 14, 2018 filed by Federal Constructors, Inc. Related document(s) #1 .(Grashoff, Matthew)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon North American Specialty Insurance Company. Service attempted by certified mail on 10/11/18 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #3 . (H,D)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Federal Constructors, Inc. on 10/4/2018, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of CRS Metalworx, Inc.; United States of America Related document(s) #1 , #3 . (L,Ja)
September 27, 2018 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to North American Specialty Insurance Company placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70162140000102826363. (W,Jo)
September 27, 2018 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Federal Constructors, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70162140000102826370. (W,Jo)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Federal Constructors, Inc., North American Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,SR)
September 25, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (S,SR)
September 25, 2018 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (S,SR)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by CRS Metalworx, Inc.. (Loftus, Nora)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint for Money Damages, Prompt Pay, and Miller Act Bond Claim against Federal Constructors, Inc., North American Specialty Insurance Company. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8925914. Filed by CRS Metalworx, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Payment Bond, #2 Exhibit B - Subcontract, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to Surety, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Loftus, Nora) Modified on 9/25/2018 (S,SR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRS Metalworx, Inc. et al v. Federal Constructors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Constructors, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew K. Grashoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRS Metalworx, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P. Guenther
Represented By: Nora E. Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?