Vida v. Field Office Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) District 13, Cleveland District Office et al
Plaintiff: Elvira Vida
Defendant: Director, USCIS, Acting Deputy Director, USCIS, Field Office Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) District 13, Cleveland District Office, Secretary, DHS, Acting Deputy Secretary Department of Homeland Security and District Director, USCIS District 13, Cleveland District Office
Case Number: 1:2018cv02428
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 12 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon U.S. Attorney's Office on 12/3/18 filed on behalf of Elvira Vida (Related document(s) #9 ). (H,SP)
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Field Office Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) District 13, Cleveland District Office on 11/26/2018, filed on behalf of Elvira Vida (Related document(s) #6 ). (H,SP)
November 29, 2018 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Attorney General of the United States, Receipt # 70181130000229873046, and Civil Process Clerk U.S. Attorney's Office, Receipt #70181130000229873107, placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail.. (B,R)
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon District Director, USCIS District 13, Cleveland District Office on 11/23/2018, filed on behalf of Elvira Vida (Related document(s) #6 ). (H,SP)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon United States Attorney General and United States Attorney. (M,S)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Elvira Vida. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Rendon, Michael)
November 19, 2018 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Acting Deputy Director, USCIS, (Receipt # 70181130000229873022) Acting Deputy Secretary Department of Homeland Security,(Receipt # 70181130000229872995) Director,(Receipt # 70151520000165523298) USCIS, District Director,(Receipt # 70181130000229873015) USCIS District 13, Cleveland District Office, Field Office Director, (Receipt # 70181130000229873008) U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) District 13, Cleveland District Office, Secretary, DHS (Receipt # 70102780000363151202) placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (B,R)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of failure to file electronically, pursuant to Local Rule 5.1(c). Non-compliant document: #5 Praecipe filed on behalf of Elvira Vida Related document(s) #5 . (B,R)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 Original Summons issued to counsel over the counter for service upon Acting Deputy Director, USCIS, Acting Deputy Secretary Department of Homeland Security, Director, USCIS, District Director, USCIS District 13, Cleveland District Office, Field Office Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) District 13, Cleveland District Office, Secretary, DHS. (B,R)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons for all defendants filed by Elvira Vida. (B,R)
October 20, 2018 Filing 4 Amended complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Petition for Hearing on Naturalization Application) against All Defendants. Filed by Elvira Vida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decision, #2 Exhibit B - Form I-797C, #3 Exhibit C - Form N652, #4 Exhibit D - Form I-797C, #5 Exhibit E - Form N652, #6 Exhibit F - Correspondence, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Action, #8 Exhibit H - Notice to Appear) (Rendon, Michael) Modified text/added exhibit descriptions on 10/23/2018 (M,S).
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (S,SR)
October 19, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (S,SR)
October 19, 2018 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (S,SR)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 Supplement to Complaint, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Elvira Vida. Related document(s) #1 . (Rendon, Michael)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Petition for Hearing on Naturalization Application) against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8967403. Filed by Elvira Vida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- application, #2 Exhibit B- application, #3 Exhibit C- decision) (Rendon, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vida v. Field Office Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) District 13, Cleveland District Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvira Vida
Represented By: Michael J. Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, USCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Deputy Director, USCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) District 13, Cleveland District Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Deputy Secretary Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director, USCIS District 13, Cleveland District Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?