Great Lakes Packers, Inc. et al v. PK Produce et al
Plaintiff: Keith Connell, Inc. and Great Lakes Packers, Inc.
Defendant: PK Produce, Paul G.A. Kasapis, Debra Kasapis, Sipasak Properties, LLC, Kasapis Family Irrevocable Intervivos Trust and P.K. Produce, Inc.
Interested Party: C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. and B & D Produce Sales LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02754
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 17 Affidavit of Process Server. Complaint and summons personally served upon Sipasak Properties, LLC on 1/4/2019, filed on behalf of plaintiffs. (Connick, Michael) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (S,HR).
January 18, 2019 Filing 16 Affidavit of Process Server. Complaint and summons personally served upon Debra Kasapis on 12/13/2018, filed on behalf of plaintiffs. (Connick, Michael) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (S,HR).
January 18, 2019 Filing 15 Affidavit of Process Server. Complaint and summons personally served upon P.K. Produce, Inc. on 12/11/2018, filed on behalf of plaintiffs. (Connick, Michael) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (S,HR).
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 Affidavit of Process Server. Complaint and summons personally served upon Kasapis Family Irrevocable Intervivos Trust on 12/11/2018, filed on behalf of plaintiffs. (Connick, Michael) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (S,HR).
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Related Case filed by B & D Produce Sales LLC. (Stokes, Craig)
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 Answer to #1 Complaint filed by Kasapis Family Irrevocable Intervivos Trust. (Johnson, Christine)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Related Case (1:18-cv-2849) filed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Amendola, Mark)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 Motion for temporary restraining order filed by Plaintiff Great Lakes Packers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Thornsberry's Declaration, #3 Connell's Declaration, #4 TRO)(Connick, Michael)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 Supplement to Complaint - Exhibit C General Terms and Condidionts letter, filed by Great Lakes Packers, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit General Terms and Conditions letter)(Connick, Michael)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 Original Summons issued to Counsel for service upon Debra Kasapis, Paul G.A. Kasapis, Kasapis Family Irrevocable Intervivos Trust, PK Produce, Sipasak Properties, LLC. (L,Ja)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 Supplement to Motion for preliminary injunction - Exhibit A Charts and Invoices, filed by Great Lakes Packers, Inc.. Related document(s) #5 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charts and Invoices)(Connick, Michael)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 Supplement to Complaint - Exhibits and Summons, filed by Great Lakes Packers, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Great Lake's Invoices, #2 Exhibit Connell's Invoices, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Connick, Michael)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Plaintiff Great Lakes Packers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Cases, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit Collection letter, #5 Declaration, #6 Exhibit Payment Terms Agreement, #7 Trust Chart and Invoices, #8 Corporate Discolure, #9 Certification of Counsel)(Connick, Michael)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (B,R)
November 29, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (B,R)
November 29, 2018 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Supplement to Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Great Lakes Packers, Inc. Related document(s) #1 . (Connick, Michael)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9030096. Filed by Great Lakes Packers, Inc. and Keith Connell, Inc. (Connick, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Lakes Packers, Inc. et al v. PK Produce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PK Produce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul G.A. Kasapis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Kasapis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sipasak Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kasapis Family Irrevocable Intervivos Trust
Represented By: Christine A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.K. Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Connell, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Packers, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Amendola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: B & D Produce Sales LLC
Represented By: Craig A. Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?