United States of America v. $15,439.00 in U.S. Currency, et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $15,439.00 in U.S. Currency and $5,010.00 in U.S. Currency
Interested Party: Keith Green
Case Number: 1:2018cv02781
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Phillip J. Tripi and adding attorney filed by United States of America. (DeBaggis, Henry)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) staying case during the government shut down. The stay remains in effect until such time as appropriations funding the federal government are made available. See #General Order 2019-1 for details. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/9/19. (S,AA)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 Motion by Jane Timonere to withdraw as attorney filed by Interested Party Keith Green. (Timonere, Jane)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) staying case for a period of 14 days due to the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government. See #General Order 2018-15 for details Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 12/26/2018. (H,SN)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Keith Green on 12/5/2018, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of United States of America. Related document(s) #1 . (M,S)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 Marshal's Return on warrant for arrest in rem on 12/4/2018, on CATS Asset ID# 18-DEA-636847. Related document(s) #2 . (H,D)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 Marshal's Return on warrant of arrest in rem on 12/4/2018, for CATS Asset ID# 18-DEA-636846. Related document(s) #2 . (H,D)
December 4, 2018 Service by Clerk. Notice and Complaint addressed to Keith Green c/o Jane Timonere, Esq placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70151660000011648257. (B,R)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest in Rem for $15,439.00 and $5,010.00 in U.S. Currency issued to U.S. Marshal on 12/3/2018. (B,R)
December 3, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R)
December 3, 2018 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (B,R)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint in Forfeiture against $15,439.00 in U.S. Currency, and $5,010.00 in U.S. Currency.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in REM, #4 USM Process Receipt and Return, #5 Notice to Potential Claimant) (Tripi, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $15,439.00 in U.S. Currency, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $15,439.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,010.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Keith Green
Represented By: Jane E. Timonere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Phillip J. Tripi
Represented By: Phillip J. Tripi_AUSA
Represented By: Henry F. DeBaggis, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?