United States of America v. $22,310.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $22,310.00 in U.S. Currency
Interested Party: Michelle K. Moore
Case Number: 1:2018cv02857
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for leave to File Answer Instanter filed by Interested Party Michelle K. Moore. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Answer)(Watson, Myron)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #6 Claimant Moore's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for an additional 7 days from the date of this order. Michelle K. Moore answer due 1/29/2019. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 1/22/2019.(R,Sh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for extension of time to answer until 1/22/2019 filed by Michelle K. Moore. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Watson, Myron)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Phillip J. Tripi and adding attorney filed by United States of America. (DeBaggis, Henry)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) staying case during the government shut down. The stay remains in effect until such time as appropriations funding the federal government are made available. See #General Order 2019-1 for details. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/9/19. (S,AA)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) staying case for a period of 14 days due to the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government. See #General Order 2018-15 for details. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 12/26/2018. (H,SN)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR, document uploaded sideways. Answer filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #1 . (Watson, Myron)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Michelle K. Moore on 12/14/2018, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
December 12, 2018 Service by Clerk. Notice and Complaint addressed to Michelle K. Moore placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70151660000011648271. (B,R)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest in Rem for $22,310.00 in U.S.Currency issued to U.S. Marshal on 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Department of Treasury Process Receipt and Return) (B,R)
December 12, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R)
December 12, 2018 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint in Forfeiture against $22,310.00 in U.S. Currency. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in REM, #4 Process and Return, #5 Notice to Potential Claimant) (Tripi, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $22,310.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $22,310.00 in U.S. Currency
Represented By: Myron P. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Michelle K. Moore
Represented By: Myron P. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Phillip J. Tripi
Represented By: Henry F. DeBaggis, II
Represented By: Phillip J. Tripi_AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?