Cooper v. White Dove Mattress LTD

Plaintiff: Mark Cooper
Defendant: White Dove Mattress LTD
Case Number: 1:2018cv02965
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Sh)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 3/19/2019 at 03:00 PM at Chambers 17A before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr.Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 2/12/2019. (R,Sh)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by White Dove Mattress LTD. (Harley, Stephanie)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by White Dove Mattress LTD. (Harley, Stephanie)
December 28, 2018 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to White Dove Mattress LTD placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7018 1830 0002 2212 9112. (M,S)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon White Dove Mattress LTD. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,SR)
December 26, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (S,SR)
December 26, 2018 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (S,SR)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against White Dove Mattress LTD. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9068580. Filed by Mark Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Moyle, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. White Dove Mattress LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Dove Mattress LTD
Represented By: Stephanie E. Harley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Cooper
Represented By: Christopher J. Lalak
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Moyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?