County of Lake v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: County of Lake
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Actavis, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Perry Fine, Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Scott Fishman, Miami-Luken, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Russell Portenoy, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Lynn Webster, CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC, Mylan Specialty, L.P., Sandoz, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Mylan Pharms, Inc., HBC Service Company, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., west-ward pharmaceuticals corp. k/n/a hikma pharmaceuticals, inc., WSE Investment, LLC, Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., WSE Management, LLC, RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC,, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana L.L.C., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Wal-Mart, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Eckerd Corporation D/B/A Rite Aid Liverpool Distribution Center, SpecGX LLC, CVS Pharmacy Inc., wse, Rite Aid Corp., WalMart, Inc., f/k/a/ Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Rite Aid Corp. Hdqtrs., Actavis plc, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Eckerd Corporation doing business as Rite Aid Liverpool Distribution Center and West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Giant Eagle Inc., Walgreen Co., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Ohio CVS Stores, LLC, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Walmart Inc. and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-5000
Case Number: 1:2018op45032
Filed: January 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Filing 41 Opposition to Defendant CVS's Objections to the Order Regarding Various Discovery Issues filed by County of Lake. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Plaintiffs' 1.8.21 correspondence, #2 Exhibit B Defendant's 1.18.21 correspondence)(Weinberger, Peter)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] denying Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Ruling Regarding Re-Deposition of Expert Witness. Parties are directed to meet and confer with each other and Special Master Cohen and determine how best to ensure non-repetitive depositions of experts and third parties (Related Doc #39 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/12/21.(P,R)
March 9, 2021 Filing 40 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Revise the Order Regarding Time Limits for Expert Depositions filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company, Ohio CVS Stores, LLC, Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. Related document(s) #39 . (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
March 3, 2021 Filing 39 Motion to Amend Ruling Regarding Re-Deposition of Expert Witnesses filed by Plaintiff County of Lake. (Weinberger, Peter)
January 21, 2021 Filing 38 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Rite Aid Corporation filed by Plaintiff County of Lake. (Weinberger, Peter)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Rite Aid Corporation (Related Doc #38 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 1/21/21.(P,R)
November 18, 2020 Filing 37 Opinion and Order granting Plaintiff'S Motion to strike Pharmacy Defendants' Third-Party Complaint (Related Doc #33 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/18/20.(P,R)
November 16, 2020 Filing 36 Reply in support of #33 Motion to strike Third-Party Complaints filed by County of Lake. (Weinberger, Peter)
November 9, 2020 Filing 35 Opposition to #33 Motion to strike Third-Party Complaints filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Giant Eagle Inc., Ohio CVS Stores, LLC, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
November 6, 2020 Filing 34 Response to the Court's Request for Input Regarding Statutes and Regulations to be Quoted in Jury Instructions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weinberger, Peter)
October 26, 2020 Filing 33 Motion to strike Third-Party Complaints filed by Plaintiff County of Lake. Related document(s) #32 . (Weinberger, Peter)
October 5, 2020 Filing 32 Third party complaint against John and Jane Does 1-5000. Filed by Giant Eagle Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Ohio CVS Stores, LLC, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Walgreen Co and Walmart Inc. (Barnes, Robert)
September 21, 2020 Filing 31 Answer to #19 Amended complaint,, filed by Eckerd Corporation, Rite Aid Corp. Hdqtrs., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc.. (Moore, Kelly)
September 21, 2020 Filing 30 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to #19 County of Lake's Supplemental and Amended Allegations to be Added to Short form for Supplementing Complaint filed by Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company. (Barnes, Robert)
September 21, 2020 Filing 29 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Supplemental and Amended Allegations To Be Added to "Short Form for Supplementing Complaint and Amending Defendants and Jury Demand" filed by Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. Related document(s) #19 . (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
September 21, 2020 Filing 28 Answer to #19 Amended complaint,, filed by Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
September 21, 2020 Filing 27 Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) As To Certain Track Three Walmart Defendants filed by Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
September 21, 2020 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Eastern Co. filed by Walgreen Eastern Co.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
September 21, 2020 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Co. filed by Walgreen Co.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
September 21, 2020 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
September 21, 2020 Filing 23 Attorney Appearance by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr filed by on behalf of Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
August 6, 2020 Filing 22 Opinion and Order denying Pharmacy Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Related Doc #20 #21 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/6/20.(P,R)
June 17, 2020 Filing 21 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Defendant Rite Aid Corp.. Related document(s) #19 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit Chima Declaration)(Moore, Kelly)
June 16, 2020 Filing 20 Motion to dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Thomas S. Moffatt)(Delinsky, Eric)
June 5, 2020 Filing 19 Supplemental Amended complaint As to Short Form Complaint against CVS Health Corporation, HBC Service Company, Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, Wal-Mart, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., CVS Indiana L.L.C., CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Ohio CVS Stores, LLC, Eckerd Corporation D/B/A Rite Aid Liverpool Distribution Center, Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid Corp. Hdqtrs., RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC,, Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Giant Eagle Inc., WalMart, Inc., f/k/a/ Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., WSE Investment, LLC, wse, WSE Management, LLC. Filed by County of Lake. (Badala, Salvatore)
April 5, 2019 Filing 18 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
April 2, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Withdrawal of Brian J. Laliberte filed by McKesson Corporation. (Laliberte, Brian)
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) SpecGx LLC; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.; West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. k/n/a Hikma Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Mylan Specialty, L.P.; Mylan Pharms, Inc.; Walgreen Eastern Co.; Walgreen Co.; Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.; Sandoz, Inc.; Wal-Mart, Inc.; HBC Service Company; Omnicare Distribution Center LLC; CVS Health Corporation; Richard S. Sackler; Jonathan D. Sackler; Mortimer D.A. Sackler; Kathe A. Sackler; Ilene Sackler Lefcourt; Beverly Sackler; Theresa Sackler; David A. Sackler; Rhodes Technologies; Rhodes Technologies Inc.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family; The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.; Stuart D. Baker; John N. Kapoor; Mallinckrodt PLC; Mallinckrodt LLC; Noramco, Inc.; Anda, Inc.; Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.; and Rite Aid Corp.. Filed by County of Lake. (Badala, Salvatore)
October 30, 2018 Filing 15 Attorney Appearance by Shayna Erin Sacks filed by on behalf of County of Lake. (Sacks, Shayna)
October 30, 2018 Filing 14 Attorney Appearance by Salvatore C. Badala filed by on behalf of County of Lake. (Badala, Salvatore)
October 25, 2018 Filing 13 Attorney Appearance by Hunter J. Shkolnik filed by on behalf of County of Lake. (Shkolnik, Hunter)
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 Attorney Appearance by Joseph L. Ciaccio filed by on behalf of County of Lake. (Ciaccio, Joseph)
October 8, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Alana Valle Tanoury and adding attorney Brian J. Laliberte filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Laliberte, Brian)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) of dismissal of Defendant Russell Portenoy. Judge Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804) on 3/24/18. (P,R)
March 20, 2018 Filing 10 Amended Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) without prejudice filed by Russell Portenoy. (Spencer, S.)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order of Dismissal of Defendant Russell Portenoy. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804) on 3/20/18. (P,R)
January 18, 2018 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Tyler G. Tarney filed by on behalf of Lynn Webster, Perry Fine, Scott Fishman. (Tarney, Tyler)
January 18, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion to stay The Date by Which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and For an Extension of Time Pending final Determination of Removal filed by Defendant Russell Portenoy. Related document(s) #1 . (Rauch, Jordan)
January 16, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent)
January 16, 2018 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Alana V. Tanoury filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Tanoury, Alana)
January 16, 2018 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Vincent I. Holzhall filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Rendon, Carole)
January 11, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas, Lake County, Ohio, case number 17 CV 001972 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8502101. Filer has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-02804-DAP; 1:17-op-45000-DAP; 1:17-op-45001-DAP; 1:17-op-45002-DAP; 1:17-op-45003-DAP; 1:17-op-45004-DAP; 1:17-op-45005-DAP; 1:18-op-45012-DAP; 1:18-op-45013-DAP; 1:18-op-45031-DAP. Filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 1) - Service Papers, #3 Exhibit 1 (Part 2) - Service Papers, #4 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket, #5 Exhibit 3 - MDL Transfer Order, #6 Exhibit 4 - Joseph v. Baxter Int'l Inc., #7 Exhibit 5 - Cty. Comm'n of McDowell Cty. v. McKesson Corp., #8 Exhibit 6 - City of Huntington v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp.) (Rendon, Carole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Lake v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Vincent I. Holzhall
Represented By: Alana V. Tanoury
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Represented By: Brian J. Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Represented By: Stacey A. Greenwell
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Eric H. Zagrans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Represented By: Daniel J. Hyzak
Represented By: Tyler Tarney
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Represented By: Stacey A. Greenwell
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Hadden
Represented By: Brian K. Murphy
Represented By: Joseph F. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fishman
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Represented By: Daniel J. Hyzak
Represented By: Tyler Tarney
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Represented By: Laurie K. Miller
Represented By: Clay K. Keller
Represented By: Thomas J. Hurney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Sandra K. Zerrusen
Represented By: Aaron E. McQueen
Represented By: Mark W. Bernlohr
Represented By: Andrew N. Schock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Represented By: O. Judson Scheaf, III
Represented By: Jordan D. Rauch
Represented By: S. Amy Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Represented By: Daniel J. Hyzak
Represented By: Tyler Tarney
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Specialty, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBC Service Company
Represented By: Robert M. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: west-ward pharmaceuticals corp. k/n/a hikma pharmaceuticals, inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WSE Investment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare Distribution Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WSE Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Tara A. Fumerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckerd Corporation D/B/A Rite Aid Liverpool Distribution Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WalMart, Inc., f/k/a/ Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp. Hdqtrs.
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Represented By: Stacey A. Greenwell
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Represented By: Stacey A. Greenwell
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckerd Corporation doing business as Rite Aid Liverpool Distribution Center
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Lake
Represented By: Leo M. Spellacy, Jr.
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Joseph L. Ciaccio
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Giant Eagle Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Ohio CVS Stores, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: John and Jane Does 1-5000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?