City of Huron v. Cardinal Health Inc. et al

Plaintiff: City of Huron, Ohio
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., The Purdue Federick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Wal-Mart Inc., Miami-Luken, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Ortho-McNeil Janseen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergen PLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Scott Fishman, Cardinal Health Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Perry Fine, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Endo Phamaceuticals Inc., Lynn Webster and Celaphon, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018op45431
Filed: April 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr filed by on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 Amended complaint Supplementing Complaint and Amending Defendants against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) SpecGX LLC; Par Pharmaceutical; West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.; Indiviour Inc.; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; CVS Health Corporation. Filed by City of Huron, Ohio. (Mason, William)
May 3, 2018 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Tyler G. Tarney filed by on behalf of Lynn Webster, Perry Fine, Scott Fishman. (Tarney, Tyler)
April 17, 2018 Filing 2 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (P,R)
April 16, 2018 Judge Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804) assigned to case (P,R)
April 13, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Allergen PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., Celaphon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Phamaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Lynn Webster, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Miami-Luken, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Janseen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Perry Fine, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Scott Fishman, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Federick Company, Inc., Wal-Mart Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8655263.. Filed by City of Huron, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Murphy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Huron v. Cardinal Health Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Federick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Janseen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergen PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fishman
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Phamaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celaphon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Huron, Ohio
Represented By: William D. Mason, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?