Shelby County Board of County Commissioners v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Shelby County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Purdue Pharma Inc., Actavis PLS, Watson Pharma, Inc., Walmart, Inc. fka Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, SpecGX LLC and The Kroger Co.
Case Number: 1:2018op45668
Filed: June 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Out Of State
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shelby County Board of County Commissioners. CVS Health Corporation waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; SpecGX LLC waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; The Kroger Co. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; Walmart, Inc. fka Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019 filed on behalf of Shelby County Board of County Commissioners (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Waivers of Service)(Majestro, Anthony)
May 7, 2019 Filing 24 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
March 14, 2019 Filing 23 Amended complaint SHORT FORM against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) SPECGX, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, THE KROGER CO., WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC., WALMART INC., F/K/A WAL-MART STORES, INC.. Filed by Shelby County Board of County Commissioners. (Powell, James)
July 12, 2018 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shelby County Board of County Commissioners. Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 7/10/2018, answer due 9/10/2018 filed on behalf of Shelby County Board of County Commissioners (Farrell, Paul)
July 11, 2018 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shelby County Board of County Commissioners. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Shelby County Board of County Commissioners (Farrell, Paul)
July 3, 2018 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shelby County Board of County Commissioners. Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Shelby County Board of County Commissioners (Farrell, Paul)
July 3, 2018 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shelby County Board of County Commissioners. Purdue Pharma Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Shelby County Board of County Commissioners (Farrell, Paul)
July 3, 2018 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shelby County Board of County Commissioners. Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Shelby County Board of County Commissioners (Farrell, Paul)
June 29, 2018 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shelby County Board of County Commissioners. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Shelby County Board of County Commissioners (Farrell, Paul)
June 28, 2018 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shelby County Board of County Commissioners. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Shelby County Board of County Commissioners (Farrell, Paul)
June 23, 2018 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shelby County Board of County Commissioners. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018; Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018; Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Shelby County Board of County Commissioners (Farrell, Paul)
June 23, 2018 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shelby County Board of County Commissioners. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Shelby County Board of County Commissioners (Farrell, Paul)
June 19, 2018 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shelby County Board of County Commissioners. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Shelby County Board of County Commissioners (Farrell, Paul)
June 19, 2018 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shelby County Board of County Commissioners. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Shelby County Board of County Commissioners (Farrell, Paul)
June 16, 2018 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shelby County Board of County Commissioners. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Shelby County Board of County Commissioners (Farrell, Paul)
June 16, 2018 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shelby County Board of County Commissioners. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Shelby County Board of County Commissioners (Farrell, Paul)
June 16, 2018 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shelby County Board of County Commissioners. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Shelby County Board of County Commissioners (Farrell, Paul)
June 16, 2018 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shelby County Board of County Commissioners. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Shelby County Board of County Commissioners (Farrell, Paul)
June 16, 2018 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shelby County Board of County Commissioners. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Shelby County Board of County Commissioners (Farrell, Paul)
June 16, 2018 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shelby County Board of County Commissioners. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Shelby County Board of County Commissioners (Farrell, Paul)
June 6, 2018 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 3:18-cv-00164. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 5, 2018 Filing 4 MDL Transfer Order re: CTO-34. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. (sem) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/6/2018.]
June 5, 2018 Case transferred to District of USDC ND of Ohio (Cleveland).Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (sem) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/6/2018.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-34): This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the USDC for the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 6/4/2018. (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/6/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Noramco, Inc. on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/6/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington.. (kma) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/6/2018.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6440261), filed by Shelby County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/6/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelby County Board of County Commissioners v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. fka Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: James C. Powell
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?