County of Portage, Ohio et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Ravenna, Ohio, The State of Ohio ex rel., City of Kent, Ohio, City of Aurora, Ohio, The County of Portage, Ohio, State of Ohio ex rel and County of Portage
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Jane Does 1-50, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., SpecGX LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt plc, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Kathe Sackler, Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Dr. Richard Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Allergan USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018op45993
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 23 Attorney Appearance Notice of Appearance by Linda J. Singer filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan USA, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan Sales, LLC waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Warner Chilcott Company, LLC waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P. waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Totowa LLC waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis South Atlantic LLC waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Kadian LLC waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Elizabeth LLC waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Stipulation Service Stipulation filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #5 .(Singer, Linda)
April 1, 2019 Party Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Actavis Totowa LLC, Allergan, Inc., Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, Actavis LLC, Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Richard Sackler, Kathe Sackler and Jonathan Sackler added. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Singer, Linda)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.; Watson Laboratories, Inc.; Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.; Actavis Totowa LLC; Allergan, Inc.; Actavis Kadian LLC; Actavis South Atlantic LLC; Actavis Elizabeth LLC; Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.; Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc; Actavis LLC; Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Allergan Finance, LLC; Allergan Sales, LLC; Allergan USA, Inc.; Warner Chilcott Company, LLC; Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC; Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.; and Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.; Richard Sackler; Kathe Sackler; Jonathan Sackler. Filed by City of Ravenna, Ohio, County of Portage, City of Kent, Ohio, City of Aurora, Ohio, State of Ohio ex rel. (Singer, Linda)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 Acknowledgement of receipt of original state court record received on 9/14/18 from Portage County Court of Common Please. (P,R)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 State court documents received from Portage County Court of Common Pleas, case no. 2018-cv-00605. Record returned to Portage County with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed (Attachments: #1 Letter to Portage County Court of Common Pleas) (P,R)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas Portage County, Ohio, case number 2018 CV 00605 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8869327. Filer has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-2804. Filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - MDL Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - Service Papers, #4 Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket) (Rendon, Carole)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Rendon, Carole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Portage, Ohio et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Richard Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Ravenna, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Represented By: Donald W. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Ohio ex rel.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Kent, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Represented By: Donald W. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Aurora, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Represented By: Donald W. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Portage, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Ohio ex rel
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Represented By: Donald W. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Portage
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Represented By: Donald W. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?