Henry County, Georgia v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Plaintiff: Henry County, Georgia
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Actavis LLC, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Walmart Inc., CVS Health Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Actavis Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Narendra Nagareddy, Purdue Pharma Inc., Lynn Webster, Walgreen Co., Actavis plc, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Mylan Specialty, L.P., Richard S. Sackler, Anda, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharms, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Miami-Luken, Inc., west-ward pharmaceuticals corp. k/n/a hikma pharmaceuticals, inc., Theresa Sackler, Rite Aid Corp., Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Stuart D. Baker, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Publix Supermarkets, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, Walgreen Eastern Co., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Mallinckrodt, PLC, John N. Kapoor, Kathe A. Sackler, SpecGX LLC, Noramco, Inc., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family and Jonathan D. Sackler
Case Number: 1:2018op46310
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 30 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
July 1, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Eastern Co. filed by Walgreen Eastern Co.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
July 1, 2019 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
July 1, 2019 Filing 27 Attorney Appearance by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr filed by on behalf of Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
March 19, 2019 Filing 26 Attorney Appearance by Joseph L. Ciaccio filed by on behalf of Henry County, Georgia. (Ciaccio, Joseph)
March 19, 2019 Filing 25 Attorney Appearance by Shayna Erin Sacks filed by on behalf of Henry County, Georgia. (Sacks, Shayna)
March 18, 2019 Filing 24 Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) SpecGx LLC; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.; West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. k/n/a Hikma Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Mylan Specialty, L.P.; Mylan Pharms, Inc.; Sandoz, Inc.; Walgreen Eastern Co.; Publix Supermarkets, Inc.; Richard S. Sackler; Jonathan D. Sackler; Mortimer D.A. Sackler; Kathe A. Sackler; Ilene Sackler Lefcourt; Beverly Sackler; Theresa Sackler; David A. Sackler; Rhodes Technologies; Rhodes Technologies Inc.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family; The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.; Stuart D. Baker; John N. Kapoor; Miami-Luken, Inc.; Noramco, Inc.; Anda, Inc.; Rite Aid Corp.; and Mallinckrodt, plc. Filed by Henry County, Georgia. (Badala, Salvatore)
December 11, 2018 Filing 23 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Northern. Case number 1:18-cv-03899. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 10, 2018 Filing 22 CONDITIONAL CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to be transferred to USDC, Northern District of Ohio. (bdb) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
December 10, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (bdb) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
December 10, 2018 Electronically Transferring Case to USDC, Northern District of Ohio as to #22 MDL Conditional Certified Transfer Order. (bdb) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Vernon Phillip Hill, IV on behalf of Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster (Hill, Vernon) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 20 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 11/19/18 through 3/19/19, by Cecily J. McLeod. (McLeod, Cecily) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re: #18 Defendant Dr. Nagareddy's Motion for Clarification. If this case is not transferred to the multidistrict litigation pending in the Northern District of Ohio, In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation, Case No. CV 17-2804 (MDL 2804), Defendants will have 45 days after that determination to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court (Doc. 16). Dr. Nagareddy is not required to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court until further order from this court. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/23/2018. (jtj) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Submission of #18 MOTION for Clarification re: #14 Order, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Clarification re: #14 Order on Motion to Stay, by Narendra Nagareddy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Response to Motion to Remand)(Cochran, Anthony) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Citation List)(Cole, Brenton) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Henry County, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Remand)(Edmond, Roderick) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Alan Daxe on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Daxe, Jeffrey) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Stay Proceedings. All proceedings, preliminary requirements, and filing deadlines in this action under this Court's local rules, including Initial Disclosures, Early Planning Conference, and Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, are STAYED until 45 days after the final determination of removal of this action to federal court or transfer to the multidistrict litigation pending in the Northern District of Ohio, In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation, Case No. CV 17-2804 (MDL 2804), whichever is later. When the stay lifts, the usual deadlines under this Courts local rules shall apply except that any event timed to the removal of an action shall instead be timed to the filing of the Retail Pharmacy Defendants' responsive pleading(s). Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 9/12/2018. (jtj) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
September 12, 2018 Submission of #13 Proposed Consent Order to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 13 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Granting Motion to Stay Proceedings re: #12 Consent MOTION to Stay. (Fleming, Lindsay) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Remand or Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation 2804 by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fleming, Lindsay) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.. (Mazziotti, Thomas) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #1 Notice of Removal with Complaint. Narendra Nagareddy's answer due 45 days after the later of the JPML's order, or this Court's ruling on remand, should any party file a motion to remand. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/30/2018. (btql) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Submission of #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (btql) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Narendra Nagareddy. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cochran, Anthony) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 the Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Defendants Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co., CVS Health Corporation, Wal-Mart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., and Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. The Retail Pharmacy Defendants' time to move, answer, object, or otherwise to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until 45 days following the final determination of removal of this action to federal court or transfer to the multidistrict litigation pending in the Northern District of Ohio, In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation, Case No. CV 17-2804, whichever is later. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/24/18. (ddm) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 The Moving Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. The Moving Defendants shall have up to 45 days following any decision on a motion for remand that Plaintiff may file or final decision by the JPML transferring the case to In re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, MDL No. 2804 (N.D. Ohio) to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/24/18. (ddm) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff and Defendants AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, and PSS World Medical, Inc. Joint Motion to Extend the Time for the Distributor Defendants to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. The period in which the Distributor Defendants must answer, object, plead, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 30 days after the later of (i) the JPML's order granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise renders a final decision denying transfer to the MDL, or (ii) this Court's ruling on remand, should any party file a motion to remand. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/24/18. (ddm) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to attorneys not receiving electronic copy re [6,7,8] Orders. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (ddm) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Submission of #5 Proposed Consent Order Granting Extension to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Granting Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re: #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Response to Complaint. (Fleming, Lindsay) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Response to Complaint by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Fleming, Lindsay) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint with Brief In Support by Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cole, Brenton) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Submission of #3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, and PSS World Medical, Inc. to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order)(Knapp, Halsey) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
August 21, 2018 Submission of #2 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, and PSS World Medical, Inc. to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-8083480) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 - Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit -2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit -3 - State Court File, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry County, Georgia v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Neil K. Roman
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr.
Represented By: Megan L. Rodgers
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Hayden A. Coleman
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: J. Matthew Donohue
Represented By: Joseph L. Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Seth A. Litman
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland
Represented By: Thomas J. Mazziotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Hayden A. Coleman
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Cecily J. McLeod
Represented By: Chad A. Shultz
Represented By: Vernon Phillip Hill, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fishman
Represented By: Cecily J. McLeod
Represented By: Chad A. Shultz
Represented By: Vernon Phillip Hill, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Represented By: Ingo W. Sprie, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer Grandoff Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: Christopher A. Wiech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Represented By: Ingo W. Sprie, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer Grandoff Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Claire E. Castles
Represented By: Sarah G. Conway
Represented By: Laura Kolesar Gura
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Dan Foster Laney, III
Represented By: Richard H. Sinkfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Robert A. Nicholas
Represented By: Edward McDowell Newsom
Represented By: Shannon E. McClure
Represented By: Eileen Elizabeth Hintz Rumfelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Lindsay Anglin Fleming
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Daxe
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Seth A. Litman
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narendra Nagareddy
Represented By: Anthony L. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Hayden A. Coleman
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Cecily J. McLeod
Represented By: Chad A. Shultz
Represented By: Vernon Phillip Hill, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Lindsay Anglin Fleming
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Daxe
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Seth A. Litman
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Seth A. Litman
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Represented By: Claire E. Castles
Represented By: Sarah G. Conway
Represented By: Laura Kolesar Gura
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Specialty, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: west-ward pharmaceuticals corp. k/n/a hikma pharmaceuticals, inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Supermarkets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John N. Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry County, Georgia
Represented By: Roderick E. Edmond
Represented By: Joseph L. Ciaccio
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?