Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Anda, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Prescription Supply, Inc., Discount Drug Mart, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., HBC Service Company, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Walmart Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Corporation, SpecGX LLC, Noramco, Inc., Rite Aid Corp., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Purdue Pharma Inc., CVS Health Corp., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc., Actavis PLC, Watson Pharma, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and The Kroger Co.
Case Number: 1:2018op46344
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 38 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) as to HBC Service Company filed by Plaintiff. (Herman, Dustin) odified on 6/23/2021 (P,R).
September 10, 2019 Filing 37 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
July 23, 2019 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
July 23, 2019 Filing 35 Attorney Appearance by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr filed by on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
July 5, 2019 Filing 34 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
June 5, 2019 Filing 33 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corporation waiver sent on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/30/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
June 5, 2019 Filing 32 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
June 5, 2019 Party Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., The Kroger Co., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC and West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corporation added. filed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. (Weinberger, Peter)
May 10, 2019 Filing 31 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
May 10, 2019 Filing 30 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 28, 2019 Filing 29 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. waiver sent on 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 28, 2019 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Walmart Inc. waiver sent on 3/14/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Discount Drug Mart, Inc. waiver sent on 3/14/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 24 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. SpecGX LLC waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Purdue Pharma Inc. waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Noramco, Inc. waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. HBC Service Company waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 1/28/2019, answer due 3/29/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. CVS Health Corp. waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Amerisourcebergen Corporation waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Allergan Finance LLC waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. Actavis, LLC waiver sent on 1/28/2019 filed on behalf of Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties (Weinberger, Peter)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Rite Aid Corp. (P,R)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons for Rite Aid Corporation filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons Rite Aid Corporation)(Weinberger, Peter)
March 16, 2019 Filing 2 Amended complaint Short Form against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; The Kroger Co.; Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC; West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Filed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. (Weinberger, Peter)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9062551.. Filed by Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weinberger, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prescription Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discount Drug Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBC Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mental Health & Recovery Services Board of Allen, Auglaize and Hardin Counties
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Dustin B. Herman
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: J. Alan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?