City of Utica, New York v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Utica, New York
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Walmart Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Walgreens Eastern Co., Rite Aid of New York, Inc., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., H.D. Smith LLC, John Doe, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Walgreens Co., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Endo Generics Holding, Inc., Anda Inc, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Rite Aid of Maryland, SpecGX LLC, Depomed, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #1-10 John Does, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., John Doe Corporation, Purdue Pharma Inc., Richard S. Sackler, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Sandoz, Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Indivior, Inc., Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Institutional, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Omnicare, Inc., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC, Theresa Sackler, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Beverly Sackler, Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC, David A. Sackler, Stuart D. Baker, CVS Albany, LLC, Walgreen Co., Omnicare of New York, LLC, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Rhodes Technology, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, CVS RX Services, Inc., McKesson Specialy Care Distribution Corporation, Rhodes Technology, Inc., Kathe A. Sackler, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Wal-Mart Stores East, L. P., Jonathan D. Sackler, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., CVS Indiana, LLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc. and Associated Pharmacies Inc
Case Number: 1:2018op46359
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 46 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Theresa Sackler. (P,R)
March 7, 2019 Filing 45 Supplement - Summons in a Civil Action, filed by City of Utica, New York. (Pearlman, Eva)
March 7, 2019 Filing 44 Supplement - Summons in a Civil Action - corrected, filed by City of Utica, New York. (Pearlman, Eva)
March 6, 2019 Filing 43 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Allergan USA, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Associated Pharmacies Inc, Stuart D. Baker, CVS Albany, LLC, CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Indivior, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC, McKesson Specialy Care Distribution Corporation, Mylan Institutional, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC, Omnicare of New York, LLC, Omnicare, Inc., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Rhodes Technology, Rhodes Technology, Inc., Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Sandoz, Inc., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Wal-Mart Stores East, L. P., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. (P,R)
March 5, 2019 Filing 42 Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Richard S. Sackler; Jonathan D. Sackler; Mortimer D. A. Sackler; Kathe A. Sackler; Ilene Sackler Lefcourt; Beverly Sackler; Theresa Sackler; David A. Sackler; Rhodes Technology; Rhodes Technology, Inc.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family; The P. F. Laboratories, Inc.; Stuart D. Baker; Allergan USA, Inc.; Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.; West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.; Indivior, Inc.; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Mylan Institutional, Inc.; Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC; Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC; Sandoz, Inc.; Cardinal Health 110, LLC; McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.; McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC; McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation; Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Walgreen Co.; Walgreen Eastern Co.; Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.; KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.; CVS Pharmacy, Inc.; CVS Albany, LLC; CVS Indiana, LLC; CVS Rx Services, Inc.; Omnicare, Inc.; Omnicare of New York, LLC; Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC; Associated Pharmacies, Inc.. Filed by City of Utica, New York. (Attachments: #1 Summons New Defendant, #2 Summons New Defendant, #3 Summons New Defendant, #4 Summons New Defendant, #5 Summons New Defendant, #6 Summons New Defendant, #7 Summons New Defendant, #8 Summons New Defendant, #9 Summons New Defendant, #10 Summons New Defendant, #11 Summons New Defendant, #12 Summons New Defendant, #13 Summons New Defendant, #14 Summons New Defendant, #15 Summons New Defendant, #16 Summons New Defendant, #17 Summons New Defendant, #18 Summons New Defendant, #19 Summons New Defendant, #20 Summons New Defendant, #21 Summons New Defendant, #22 Summons New Defendant, #23 Summons New Defendant, #24 Summons New Defendant, #25 Summons New Defendant, #26 Summons New Defendant, #27 Summons New Defendant, #28 Summons New Defendant, #29 Summons New Defendant, #30 Summons New Defendant, #31 Summons New Defendant, #32 Summons New Defendant, #33 Summons New Defendant, #34 Summons New Defendant, #35 Summons New Defendant, #36 Summons New Defendant, #37 Summons New Defendant, #38 Summons New Defendant, #39 Summons New Defendant, #40 Summons New Defendant, #41 Summons New Defendant, #42 Summons New Defendant, #43 Summons New Defendant) (Pearlman, Eva)
February 28, 2019 Filing 41 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Endo Generics Holding, Inc. on 02/19/19 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
February 20, 2019 Filing 40 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
February 20, 2019 Filing 39 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
February 20, 2019 Filing 38 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
February 20, 2019 Filing 37 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
February 14, 2019 Filing 36 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Insys Therapeutics, Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
February 14, 2019 Filing 35 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
February 14, 2019 Filing 34 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
February 14, 2019 Filing 33 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
February 14, 2019 Filing 32 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. SpecGX LLC waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
February 14, 2019 Filing 31 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
February 14, 2019 Filing 30 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Rite Aid of New York, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2019, answer due 3/12/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
February 14, 2019 Filing 29 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Rite Aid of Maryland waiver sent on 1/11/2019, answer due 3/12/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 30, 2019 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Depomed, Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 30, 2019 Filing 27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 24, 2019 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 1/14/2019, answer due 3/15/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 24, 2019 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Walmart Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2019, answer due 3/12/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 23, 2019 Filing 24 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Walgreens Eastern Co. waiver sent on 1/11/2019, answer due 3/12/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 23, 2019 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Walgreens Co. waiver sent on 1/11/2019, answer due 3/12/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 22, 2019 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. H.D. Smith LLC waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 17, 2019 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Anda Inc waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 16, 2019 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 16, 2019 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Purdue Frederick Company Inc. waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 16, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 16, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 16, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Purdue Pharma Inc. waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 16, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 1/15/2019, answer due 3/18/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Allergan Finance LLC waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Allergan PLC waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Utica, New York. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of City of Utica, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Northern. Case number 6:18-cv-01394. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #72. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of Ohio for inclusion into MDL-2804 National Prescription Opiate Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Dan A. Polster, U.S. District Judge. (plp) [Transferred from nynd on 12/27/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Purdue Pharma, Inc., #2 Summons for Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., #3 Summons for Cephalon, Inc., #4 Summons for Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, #5 Summons for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #6 Summons for Johnson & Johnson, #7 Summons for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #8 Summons for Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #9 Summons for Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., #10 Summons for Depomed, Inc., #11 Summons for Endo Health Solutions Inc., #12 Summons for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #13 Summons for Endo Generics Holding, Inc., #14 Summons for Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., #15 Summons for Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., #16 Summons for Mallinckrodt PLC, #17 Summons for Mallinckrodt, LLC, #18 Summons for SPECGX, LLC, #19 Summons for Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #20 Summons for Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC, #21 Summons for Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc., #22 Summons for Allergan PLC, #23 Summons for Allergan Finance, LLC, #24 Summons for Watson Laboratories, Inc., #25 Summons for Actavis, LLC, #26 Summons for Actavis Pharma, Inc., #27 Summons for Insys Therapeutics, Inc., #28 Summons for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, #29 Summons for Cardinal Health, Inc., #30 Summons for McKesson Corporation, #31 Summons for H.D. Smith, LLC, #32 Summons for Anda, Inc., #33 Summons for Rite Aid of New York, Inc., #34 Summons for Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., #35 Walgreens Co., #36 Summons for Walgreens Eastern Co., #37 Summons for Walmart Inc.)(see) [Transferred from nynd on 12/27/2018.]
December 4, 2018 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: deleted document no. 2, which was entered on 12/4/2018 at 2:25 p.m., as it was intended for a different case (1:18-CV-1294). (see) [Transferred from nynd on 12/27/2018.]
December 4, 2018 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe, John Does, or John Doe Corporation in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendants at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (see) [Transferred from nynd on 12/27/2018.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/4/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone, unless the parties are specifically directed to appear, before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/25/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see) [Transferred from nynd on 12/27/2018.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4580117) filed by City of Utica, New York. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see) [Transferred from nynd on 12/27/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Utica, New York v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Eastern Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of New York, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Generics Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depomed, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: #1-10 John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Albany, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Specialy Care Distribution Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L. P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Pharmacies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Utica, New York
Represented By: Eva Brindisi Pearlman
Represented By: John C. Cherundolo
Represented By: John Petrone
Represented By: Louis T. Brindisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?