Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland v. Omni Construction Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
Defendant: Suzanna L. Stone, Richard Stone and Omni Construction Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00049
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Defendants. (Baumgart, Richard)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Omni Construction Company, Inc., Richard Stone, Suzanna L. Stone. (Baumgart, Richard)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland. Omni Construction Company, Inc. waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland (Brewer, Lee)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland. Suzanna L. Stone waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland (Brewer, Lee)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland. Richard Stone waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 filed on behalf of Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland (Brewer, Lee)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group, Ltd., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company, Ltd., Corporate Parent Zurich American Insurance Company for Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland filed by Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland. (Brewer, Lee)
January 9, 2019 Notice by Clerk that Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (S,SR)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (S,SR)
January 9, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (S,SR)
January 9, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case, (S,SR)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for indemnity against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9084611. Filed by Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - General Indemnity Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brewer, Lee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland v. Omni Construction Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanna L. Stone
Represented By: Richard A. Baumgart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Stone
Represented By: Richard A. Baumgart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Richard A. Baumgart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: Lee M. Brewer
Represented By: Jonathan M. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?