United States of America v. $40,850.00 U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $40,850.00 U.S. Currency
Interested Party: Angel Navarro
Case Number: 1:2019cv00189
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. Case is assigned to the standard track. Status Conference set for 5/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in Chambers 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Claimant and counsel may appear by telephone. Discovery due by 5/28/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2019. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 2/28/2019. (K,K)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Claimaint's Motion to attend by telephone (Related Doc #11 ). Call in instructions will be provided separately. Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 2/26/2019.(K,K)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to attend by telephone filed by Interested Party Angel Navarro. (Herrick, Peter)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by United States of America. (Morford, James)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Angel Navarro c/o Peter S. herrick, no delivery date on green card, date of 2/1/19 obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Angel Navarro. (Herrick, Peter)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 2/28/2019 at 02:00 PM at Chambers 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting due no later than 12:00 p.m. on 2/26/2019. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 2/7/2019. (K,K) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2019: #1 Complete Case Management Scheduling Order) (K,K).
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Peter S. Herrick as to Angel Navarro. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #3 ). Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 2/6/2019.(K,K)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 Verified Claim of Interest filed by Angel Navarro. (Herrick, Peter)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Angel Navarro on 1/31/2019, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 Declaration in support of Motion for pro hac vice filed by Angel Navarro. (Related document #3 ) (Herrick, Peter)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for attorney Peter S Herrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9118012, filed by Interested Party Angel Navarro. (Herrick, Peter)
January 25, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Angel Navarro placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70081300000030279617 (East Ocean Blvd address) Receipt #70150640000293372764(Bayshore Blvd address). (B,R)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest in Rem for $40,850.00 U.S. Currency issued on 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Dept. of Treasury Process Receipt and Return) (B,R)
January 25, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R)
January 25, 2019 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (B,R)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint in Forfeiture against $40,850.00 U.S. Currency Seized on September 18, 2018, by Homeland Security Investigations. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 Process Receipt and Return, #5 Notice to Potential Claimant, #6 Notice to Potential Claimant) (Morford, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $40,850.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Angel Navarro
Represented By: Peter S. Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $40,850.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James L. Morford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?