Stearns v. Menorah Park Center for Senior Living Bet Moshav Zekenim Hadati et al

Plaintiff: Jane Stearns
Defendant: Menorah Park Center for Senior Living Bet Moshav Zekenim Hadati, James Newbrough, Lori Lozier, Jami Herbst, Janet Craven and Jamie Herbst
Case Number: 1:2019cv00324
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 5/20/2019 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 575 before Judge John R. Adams. Lead counsel and party representatives to attend. Judge John R. Adams on 4/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties, #2 Rule 30.1, #3 Consent to Magistrate Judge, #4 Budget, #5 Policy and Procedure Manual)(K,C)
April 3, 2019 Filing 13 Answer to #7 Amended complaint with jury demand filed by Janet Craven, Jamie Herbst, Lori Lozier, Menorah Park Center for Senior Living Bet Moshav Zekenim Hadati, James Newbrough. (Dileno, Jon)
March 19, 2019 Minutes of proceedings[non-document] before Judge John R. Adams.Telephone Conference held on 3/19/19. (Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke.)Time: 10 Mins. (K,C)
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 Brief In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Janet Craven, Jamie Herbst, Lori Lozier, Menorah Park Center for Senior Living Bet Moshav Zekenim Hadati, James Newbrough. Related document(s) #8 . (Dileno, Jon)
March 17, 2019 Filing 11 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to excuse appearance of Attorney Brian Spitz from the Telephone Conference (Related Doc #10 ). Judge John R. Adams on 3/15/19.(K,C)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to excuse appearance of Attorney Brian Spitz filed by Plaintiff Jane Stearns. (Dubow, Daniel)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 IMPORTANT: Notice of Telephone Conference. Telephone Conference set for 3/19/2019 at 01:00 PM with Judge John R. Adams. Only counsel is required to participate. Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call to the court. (K,C)
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Plaintiff Jane Stearns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Notice of Trial Deposition of Plaintiff Jane Stearns)(Dubow, Daniel)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 First Amended complaint for Damages and Reinstatement against All Defendants. Filed by Jane Stearns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Right to Sue) (Dubow, Daniel)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Menorah Park Center for Senior Living Bet Moshav Zekenim Hadati. (Caspary, Christopher)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Janet Craven, Jamie Herbst, Lori Lozier, Menorah Park Center for Senior Living Bet Moshav Zekenim Hadati, James Newbrough. (Caspary, Christopher)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Janet Craven on 2/19/2019; Jami Herbst on 2/19/2019; Lori Lozier on 2/19/2019; Menorah Park Center for Senior Living Bet Moshav Zekenim Hadati on 2/19/2019, filed on behalf of Jane Stearns Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (W,CM)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon James Newbrough on 2/19/2019, filed on behalf of Jane Stearns Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (W,CM)
February 15, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Menorah Park Center for Senior Living Bet Moshav Zekenim Hadati (statutory agent) placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70180040000079029823. (W,Jo)
February 15, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to James Newbrough placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70180040000079029847. (W,Jo)
February 15, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Menorah Park Center for Senior Living Bet Moshav Zekenim Hadati placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70180040000079029816. (W,Jo)
February 15, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Lori Lozier placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70180040000079029854. (W,Jo)
February 15, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Jami Herbst placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70180040000079029861. (W,Jo)
February 15, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Janet Craven placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70180040000079029830. (W,Jo)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Janet Craven, Jami Herbst, Lori Lozier, Menorah Park Center for Senior Living Bet Moshav Zekenim Hadati, James Newbrough. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,SR)
February 12, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (S,SR)
February 12, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case, (S,SR)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for damages and reinstatement with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9143226. Filed by Jane Stearns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Craven, #3 Summons Herbst, #4 Summons Lozier, #5 Summons Menorah Park, #6 Summons Newbrough, #7 Summons Stat Agent) (Dubow, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stearns v. Menorah Park Center for Senior Living Bet Moshav Zekenim Hadati et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menorah Park Center for Senior Living Bet Moshav Zekenim Hadati
Represented By: Jon M. Dileno
Represented By: Christopher D. Caspary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Newbrough
Represented By: Jon M. Dileno
Represented By: Christopher D. Caspary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Lozier
Represented By: Jon M. Dileno
Represented By: Christopher D. Caspary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jami Herbst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Craven
Represented By: Jon M. Dileno
Represented By: Christopher D. Caspary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Herbst
Represented By: Jon M. Dileno
Represented By: Christopher D. Caspary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Stearns
Represented By: Brian D. Spitz
Represented By: Daniel S. Dubow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?