McNabb v. Equity Trust Company et al

Plaintiff: Christina McNabb
Defendant: Equity Trust Company and Heather Derise
Case Number: 1:2019cv00350
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (D,N)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Telephone case management conference, with counsel only, to be held on 5/6/2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Sara Lioi. The telephone conference will be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. After all counsel are on line, plaintiff's counsel is to place the call to the Chambers of the Honorable Sara Lioi at (330) 252-6060. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 4/15/2019. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 4/22/2019. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties Planning Meeting)(D,N)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Heather Derise, Equity Trust Company. (Parker, Johanna)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #6 unopposed motion by defendants for extension of time until March 25, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/20/2019.(P,J)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(P,J)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until March 25, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Heather Derise, Equity Trust Company. Related document(s) #1 . (Parker, Johanna)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,SR)
February 15, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (S,SR)
February 15, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case, (S,SR)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet, filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #1 . (Parker, Johanna)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Equity Trust Company. (Parker, Johanna)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Removal filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #1 .(Parker, Johanna)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, case number CV19910233 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9151152. Filed by Heather Derise, Equity Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Summons, #3 Exhibit C: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Parker, Johanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNabb v. Equity Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina McNabb
Represented By: Barry R. Murner
Represented By: Corinne A. Huntley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Trust Company
Represented By: Johanna Fabrizio Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Derise
Represented By: Johanna Fabrizio Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?