Li v. Cissna, et al.
Plaintiff: Xinyuan Li
Defendant: Donald Neufeld, Lee Francis Cissna, Kevin McAleenan and William Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv00999
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Xinyuan Li. (Wong, Margaret)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(T,Je)
May 7, 2019 Remark by Clerk re Service Upon U.S. Government Defendant. If a U.S. Government agency or officer is sued, you must provide summons for that defendant, for the U.S. Attorney General (Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. 20530) and the U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Ohio (801 West Superior Avenue, Suite 400, Cleveland, OH 44113-1852). (Y,A)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon William Barr, Lee Francis Cissna, Kevin McAleenan, Donald Neufeld. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
May 3, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (Y,A)
May 3, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case, (Y,A)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9292697. Filed by Xinyuan Li. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- I-130 receipt notice, #2 Exhibit B-Petitioner's naturalization certificate, #3 Exhibit C-Case status information, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Lee Francis Cissna, #6 Summons Kevin McAleenan, #7 Summons Donald Neufeld, #8 Summons William Barr, #9 Summons Justin Herdman) (Wong, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Li v. Cissna, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xinyuan Li
Represented By: Margaret W. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?