Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Suggs et al

Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Michelle Crayton Suggs and Astrid Suggs
Case Number: 1:2019cv01063
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Stipulated Order of Dismissal. The parties have settled and agreed that 50% of the $62,000 insurance proceeds plus interest will go to Michelle Suggs; the remaining 50% plus interest will be split evenly among the following four people: Tyshea Suggs, Tyrone Suggs, Tyeopa Carlisle and Calvin Carlisle. This case is settled and dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 6/26/2019. (K,K)
June 24, 2019 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. In-Person Status Conference held on 6/24/2019. Case settled. (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 1 hour 30 minutes. (K,K)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Astrid Suggs, Michelle Crayton Suggs. (S,SR)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons (for Michelle Crayton Suggs), #2 Summons (for Astrid Suggs))(Lanz, C.)
June 12, 2019 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of In-Person Status Conference set for 6/24/2019 at 03:00 PM in Chambers 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. (K,K)
May 24, 2019 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] After reviewing the life insurance proceeds complaint in interpleader, the Court held a teleconference on 5/24/2019 with Attorney C. Scott Lanz for Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Ins. Co. and Defendants Michelle Suggs proceeding pro se, and Cleveland Suggs appearing with power of attorney for Defendant Astrid Suggs, also proceeding pro se. The purpose of the teleconference was to determine how to proceed efficiently given the amount in dispute and the costs of litigation. As a result, the Court encouraged Defendants to communicate together to see if they can reach agreement absent litigation. Nothing further was scheduled. (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 15 minutes. (K,K)
May 23, 2019 Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 5/24/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. (K,K)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, therefore were not issued. (Y,A)
May 13, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (Y,A)
May 13, 2019 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (Y,A)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Lanz, C.)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint in Interpleader against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9305184. Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cleveland Suggs POA for Astrid Suggs, #2 Exhibit B - Death Certificate, #3 Exhibit C - Claim of Michelle Crayton Suggs, #4 Exhibit D - Claim of Astrid Suggs, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lanz, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Suggs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: C. Scott Lanz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Crayton Suggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrid Suggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?