Bacik, et al. v. Neale, et al.
Plaintiff: John A. Bacik and Image Line Design Incorporated
Defendant: Parkview Homes, Tucker Neale and Parkview Homes, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01111
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Referring Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/10/19. For purposes of clarification, the parties are advised that the Court's Order dated 7/5/19 was intended to terminate any upcoming telephonic and/or in-person conferences and hearings set by the previously assigned district judge. All other case management deadlines (including pleading amendment, discovery, expert, briefing, and dispositive motions deadlines) remain in effect. In addition, any referrals to the assigned Magistrate Judge (including for mediation and/or settlement conferences) remain in effect. Any status, final pre-trial and trial dates set to take place before the previously assigned district judge will be reset at a later date. (S,G)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 Opposition to #10 Motion to dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Vary, Michael)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/5/19. All deadlines and hearings set by the previous District Judge are terminated and will be reset forthwith. (D,MA)
July 5, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Pamela A. Barker pursuant to General Order 2019-13. (B,R)
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Case Management Conference held on 6/18/2019. Case is assigned to the standard track. Discovery due by 11/1/2019. Next Status Conference set for 7/16/2019 at 09:00 AM in Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 30 minutes. (M,S)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Vary, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Tucker Neale. (Hulme, Roy)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Parkview Homes. (Heasley, Robert)
June 7, 2019 Notice by Clerk that Parkview Homes failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (L,Ja)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Parkview Homes. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Disclaimer)(Heasley, Robert)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright (AO121) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Vary, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Notice of Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Local Rule 3.13(c) requires the filing of the #AO121 Copyright Report Form or #AO120 Patent and Trademark Report Form by 6/13/2019. (K,Ca)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 6/18/2019 at 10:45 AM at Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent.. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 5/31/2019. (M,S)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service by personal service executed upon on Tucker Neale on 5/23/2019 and Parkview Homes, Inc. on 5/22/2019 , filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Parkview Return of Service)(Vary, Michael) Modified on 5/28/2019 (L,Ja).
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 Original Summons issued to Counsel for service upon Tucker Neale, Parkview Homes. (L,Ja)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Supplement - AO121 Copyright report form, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Vary, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Supplement to Complaint - Summons, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 additional summons)(Vary, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Supplement to Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (Vary, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided therefore were not issued. (Y,A)
May 16, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (Y,A)
May 16, 2019 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case, (Y,A)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9313830. Filed by John A. Bacik, Image Line Design, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6 Agreement for Design and Blueprints. (Vary, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bacik, et al. v. Neale, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. Bacik
Represented By: Michael W. Vary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Image Line Design Incorporated
Represented By: Michael W. Vary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkview Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tucker Neale
Represented By: Roy A. Hulme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkview Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Robert S. Heasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?