Fulkerson v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Judy Fulkerson
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01180
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] denying Defendant's Motion to attend Case Management Conference by telephone (Related Doc #7 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/9/2019.(W,CM)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion to attend /Participate of its Representative During the Case Management Conference by telephone filed by Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Bacon, Brett)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 7/30/2019 at 09:00 AM at Chambers 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting due no later than 12:00 p.m. on 7/26/2019. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/2/2019. (K,K)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate UNUM Group for Unum Life Insurance Company of America filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Southam, Olivia)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Bacon, Brett)
June 24, 2019 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] On June 24, 2019, the Court held a scheduled teleconference attended by Plaintiff's counsel Justin P. Rudin and Defendant's counsel Brett K. Bacon. The Court discussed the status of the case with the parties and encouraged them to negotiate a resolution in advance of the Case Management Conference. The Court will schedule a Case Management Conference once the Answer is filed. (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 15 minutes. (K,K)
June 18, 2019 Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 6/24/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. (K,K)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #3 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer. Unum Life Insurance Company of America answer due 7/5/2019. Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 6/17/2019.(K,K)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance and Unopposed Motion for extension of time to respond, move or plead to Plaintiff's Complaint by Brett K. Bacon filed by on behalf of Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Bacon, Brett)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
May 22, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R)
May 22, 2019 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (B,R)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9322306.. Filed by Judy Fulkerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary of Benefits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Rudin, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fulkerson v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Fulkerson
Represented By: Justin P. Rudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Brett K. Bacon
Represented By: Olivia Lin Southam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?