Shelton v. Resortcom International, LLC.
Plaintiff: James Everett Shelton
Defendant: Resortcom International, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01378
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 Motion for attorney Ana Tagvoryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9465061, filed by Defendant Resortcom International, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ana Tagvoryan Affidavit)(Oberly, David)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendant's Motion for Admission of Jeffrey N. Rosenthal Pro Hac Vice is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 8/8/19. (Related Doc #12 ) (LC,S)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 Motion for attorney Jeffrey N. Rosenthal to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9459765, filed by Defendant Resortcom International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jeff Rosenthal Affidavit)(Oberly, David)
August 5, 2019 Notice to Attorney Jeffrey N. Rosenthal. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
August 5, 2019 Notice to Attorney Anahit Tagvoryan. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Resortcom International, LLC. for Resortcom International, LLC. filed by Resortcom International, LLC.. (Oberly, David)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to dismiss with memorandum in support and exhibits attached filed by Defendant Resortcom International, LLC.. (Oberly, David) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (S,SR).
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by David J. Oberly filed by on behalf of Resortcom International, LLC.. (Oberly, David)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 Stipulation & Order: The parties stipulated that the date by which Defendant must answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended by seven (7) days through Friday, August 2, 2019. So Ordered. #7 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/29/19. (D,Ma)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 Second Proposed Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Resortcom International, LLC.. (Oberly, David)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 8/23/2019 at 9:00 am to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/02/19. (D,Ma)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Stipulation & Order: The parties stipulated that the date by which Defendant must answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint ishereby extended by twenty-one (21) days through Friday, July 26, 2019. So Ordered. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/1/19. (LC,S) re #4
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by James Everett Shelton. (Murphy, Brian)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Resortcom International, LLC. on 6/14/2019, filed on behalf of James Everett Shelton (Murphy, Brian)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Resortcom International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
June 14, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (Y,A)
June 14, 2019 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, (Y,A)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 Class Action Complaint with jury demand against Resortcom International, LLC. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9364595. Filed by James Everett Shelton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Resortcom International, LLC.) (Murphy, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelton v. Resortcom International, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resortcom International, LLC.
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Rosenthal
Represented By: Anahit Tagvoryan
Represented By: David J. Oberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Everett Shelton
Represented By: Jonathan P. Misny
Represented By: Brian K. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?