Noco Company v. Olsen

Plaintiff: Noco Company
Defendant: David Olsen
Case Number: 1:2019cv01393
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Copy of #7 Default Entered mailed to David Olsen d/b/a Grav37, at 21022 West Boulder Drive, Plainfield, IL 60544 on 8/5/2019. (K,K)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Default Entered on 8/5/2019 against David Olsen, d/b/a Grav37. Sandy Opacich, Clerk by Katherine King, Deputy Clerk. Related document(s) #6 . (K,K)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Defendant David Olsen d/b/a Grav37 filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit for Entry of Default)(Posteraro, David)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by via Federal Express executed upon David Olsen on 6/25/2019, filed on behalf of Noco Company Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Express Proof of Delivery)(Pinney, Jon)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon David Olsen. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
June 18, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R)
June 18, 2019 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (B,R)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Supplement to Complaint, - Summons, filed by Noco Company. Related document(s) #1 . (Pinney, Jon)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against David Olsen. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9369476.. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Cease and Desist Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Pinney, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noco Company v. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Represented By: Sean P. Malone
Represented By: David R. Posteraro
Represented By: Jon J. Pinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?