Rivera v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Edmanuel Rivera
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv01400
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James R Knepp
Referring Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:425
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx Delivery Service executed upon Commissioner of Social Security through the U.S. Attorney on 6/24/2019; Social Security Administration, Office of Regional Chief Counsel on 6/25/2019; U.S. Attorney General on 6/25/2019 filed on behalf of Edmanuel Rivera. Related document(s) #6 , #1 . (M,L)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant is granted a maximum of 60 days after the complaint has been served to file an answer and transcript. Within 30 days of the filing of the answer and transcript, Plaintiff shall file its Brief on the Merits. In the event Plaintiff's brief is not filed within 30 days of the answer, case may be subject to dismissal for want of prosecution. Defendant shall file its Brief on the Merits within 30 days thereafter. Plaintiff's Reply Brief, if any, shall be filed within 14 days of filing of Defendant's Brief. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,JM)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Original Summons issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney General, and Office of the U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,JM)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 6/20/2019. (S,JM)
June 18, 2019 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 6/18/19. (Y,A)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (Y,A)
June 18, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (Y,A)
June 18, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (Y,A)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Compliance filed by Edmanuel Rivera. (Braun, Katherine)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Edmanuel Rivera. (Braun, Katherine)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Edmanuel Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Appeals Council Denial, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 USM-285, #7 USM-285, #8 USM-285) (Braun, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmanuel Rivera
Represented By: Katherine M. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?