Kassay, et al. v. Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeffrey T. Kassay and Patricia A. Kassay
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01423
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Biomet, Inc., Other Affiliate Zimmer Inc., Other Affiliate Zimmer US, Inc., Other Affiliate Zimmer CEP USA, Inc., Other Affiliate Zimmer Surgical, Inc., Other Affiliate Zimmer Production, Inc., Other Affiliate Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Other Affiliate Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Other Affiliate Biomet 3i, LLC, Other Affiliate LVB Acquisition, Inc., Other Affiliate Implant Innovations Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Other Affiliate ZB Manufacturing, LLC, Other Affiliate Accelero Health Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate Biomet Biologics, LLC, Other Affiliate Biomet CV Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Biomet Fair Lawn, LLC, Other Affiliate Biomet Finance US, LLC, Other Affiliate Biomet Holdings US, Inc., Other Affiliate Biomet International Orthopedics, LLC, Other Affiliate Biomet International, Inc., Other Affiliate Biomet Leasing, Inc., Other Affiliate Biomet Sports Medicine, LLC, Other Affiliate Biomet Trauma, LLC, Other Affiliate Biomet US Inc., Other Affiliate Cayenne Medical, Inc., Other Affiliate CD Diagnostics, Inc., Other Affiliate CD Laboratories, Inc., Other Affiliate Citra Labs, LLC, Other Affiliate Compression Therapy Concepts, Inc., Other Affiliate Dornoch Medical Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate EBI Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate EBI Medical Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate EBI, LLC, Other Affiliate Electro-Biology, LLC, Other Affiliate ETEX Corporation, Other Affiliate ETEX Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate InnoVision, Inc., Other Affiliate Interpore Cross International, LLC, Other Affiliate Jamabil US, Inc., Other Affiliate Kirschner Medical Corporation, Other Affiliate Medical Compression Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Medtech Surgical, Inc., Other Affiliate Orthopaedic Advantage, LLC, Other Affiliate ResponDesign, Inc., Other Affiliate Synvasive Technology, Inc., Other Affiliate ZB COOP, LLC, Other Affiliate ZB LHS LLC, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet CMF and Thoracic, LLC, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Connected Health, LLC, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Finance US Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Spine, Inc., Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet US 2 Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate Zimmer Caribe, LLC, Other Affiliate Zimmer CBT I Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate Zimmer CBT II Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate Zimmer CEP USA Holding Co., Other Affiliate Zimmer Co-op Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Zimmer CV, Inc., Other Affiliate Zimmer Dental, Inc., Other Affiliate Zimmer Investments, LLC, Other Affiliate Zimmer Knee Creations, Inc., Other Affiliate Zimmer Orthobiologics, Inc., Other Affiliate Zimmer Southeast Florida, LLC, Other Affiliate Zimmer Spine Next, Inc., Other Affiliate Zimmer Trabecular Metal Technology, Inc., Other Affiliate Biomet Argentina SA, Other Affiliate Biomet 3i Australia Pty. Ltd., Other Affiliate Biomet Australia Pty. Ltd., Other Affiliate Zimmer Australia Holding Pty. Ltd., Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Pty. Ltd., Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Austria GmbH, Other Affiliate ZH2LX Barbados Branch (branch), Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Finance Srl, Other Affiliate Biomet 3i Belgium N.V., Other Affiliate Biomet 3i Benelux Holdings N.V., Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet BVBA, Other Affiliate Biomet Insurance Ltd., Other Affiliate Biomet 3i do Brasil Comercio de Aparelhos Medicos Ltda., Other Affiliate Biomet Brazil Medical Device Ltda., Other Affiliate LDR Brasil Comercio, Importacao e Exportacao Ltda., Other Affiliate Ospol Participacoes Ltda., Other Affiliate Zimmer do Brasil Comercio Ltda., Other Affiliate ORTHOsoft ULC, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Canada, Inc., Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Dental Canada Inc., Other Affiliate ZB Cayman (Asia) Holding Ltd., Other Affiliate ZB Cayman Island CBT 2 Ltd., Other Affiliate Zimmer Cayman Islands Holding Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Biomet Chile SA, Other Affiliate Zimmer Dental Chile Spa, Other Affiliate Beijing Montagne Medical Device Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Biomet China Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Changzhou Biomet Medical Devices Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Shanghai Biomet Business Consulting Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Zhejiang Biomet Medical Products Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet CBT, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet CBT 2, Other Affiliate Zimmer Dental (Shanghai) Medical Device Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Zimmer (Shanghai) Medical International Trading Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Zimmer Columbia SAS, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Centroamerica SA, Other Affiliate Zimmer Czech sro, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Denmark ApS, Other Affiliate Biomet El Salvador SA de CV, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Finland Oy, Other Affiliate Biomet France Sarl, Other Affiliate LDR Medical S.A.S., Other Affiliate Medtech SA, Other Affiliate Zimmer Dental SAS, Other Affiliate Zimmer France Manufacturing Sarl, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet France SAS, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet France Holdings SAS, Other Affiliate Zimmer Spine SAS, Other Affiliate Biomet Deutschland GmbH, Other Affiliate Biomet Deutschland Holding GmbH, Other Affiliate Biomet Healthcare Management GmbH, Other Affiliate Medtech Surgical GmbH, Other Affiliate Zimmer Dental GmbH, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Deutschland GmbH, Other Affiliate Zimmer Germany Holdings GmbH, Other Affiliate Zimmer International Logistics GmbH, Other Affiliate Zfx GmbH, Other Affiliate ZB (Gibraltar) CV Holding Limited, Other Affiliate ZB (Gibraltar) CV Holding Limited, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Hellas SA, Other Affiliate SM Re Ltd., Other Affiliate Biomet Hong Kong CBT Ltd., Other Affiliate Biomet Hong Kong Holding Ltd., Other Affiliate Biomet Hong Kong No.1 Ltd., Other Affiliate Biomet Hong Kong 2 Ltd., Other Affiliate LDR Medical Hong Kong (branch), Other Affiliate ZB Hong Kong CBT 2 Ltd., Other Affiliate ZB Hong Kong Holding Ltd., Other Affiliate ZB Hong Kong Ltd., Other Affiliate Zimmer Asia (HK) Ltd., Other Affiliate Zimmer India Private Ltd., Other Affiliate CelgenTek, Limited, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Ireland Limited, Other Affiliate Zimmer Orthopedics Manufacturing Limited, Other Affiliate D.S. Comp Ltd., Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Comp Ltd., Other Affiliate Zimmer Dental Ltd., Other Affiliate Lanx Srl, Other Affiliate Zimmer Dental Italy Srl, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Italia Srl, Other Affiliate Zfx Innovation GmbH, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Dental K.K., Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet GK, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Korea Ltd., Other Affiliate JERDS Luxembourg Holding Sarl, Other Affiliate Zimmer Luxembourg Sarl, Other Affiliate Zimmer Luxembourg II Sarl, Other Affiliate Zimmer Medical Malaysia SDN BHD, Other Affiliate Biomet 3i Mexico S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate Biomet Mexico S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate Representaciones Zimmer Inc., S. de R.L. de C.V., Other Affiliate Biomet 3i Netherlands B.V., Other Affiliate Biomet C.V., Other Affiliate Biomet Global Supply Chain Center B.V., Other Affiliate Biomet Holdings B.V., Other Affiliate Biomet Microfixation B.V., Other Affiliate ZB COOP C.V., Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Asia Holding B.V., Other Affiliate Zimmer Europe Holdings B.V., Other Affiliate Zimmer Manufacturing B.V., Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Nederland B.V., Other Affiliate Zimmer Netherlands Cooperatief U.A., Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet New Zeland Company, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Norway AS, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Polska Sp. z.o.o., Other Affiliate Biomet 3i Portugal Lda, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Portugal Unipessoal, Lda, Other Affiliate Biomet Orthopedics Puerto Rico, Inc., Other Affiliate EBI Patient Care, Inc., Other Affiliate Lanx Puerto Rico, LLC, Other Affiliate Zimmer Manufacturing B.V. (branch), Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Romania S.R.L., Other Affiliate Zimmer CIS Ltd., Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Asel Alarabiya Limited Company, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Asia Holdings Pte. Ltd., Other Affiliate Zimmer Pte. Ltd., Other Affiliate Zimmer Slovakia sro, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet South Africa (Pty) Ltd., Other Affiliate Biomet 3i Dental Iberica SL, Other Affiliate Biomet Spain Orthopaedics S.L., Other Affiliate Espanormed S.L., Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Spain S.L., Other Affiliate Biomet 3i Nordic AB, Other Affiliate Biomet Cementing Technologies AB, Other Affiliate Scandimed Holding AB, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Sweden AB, Other Affiliate Biomet 3i Switzerland GmbH, Other Affiliate Biomet Orthopaedics Switzerland GmbH, Other Affiliate Guillaume Genin & Co., Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Global Holdings Switzerland GmbH, Other Affiliate Zimmer GmbH, Other Affiliate Zimmer GmbH Euro IP Branch (branch), Other Affiliate Zimmer Luxembourg II Sarl, Luxembourg (LU), Winterthur Branch (branch), Other Affiliate Zimmer Surgical SA, Other Affiliate Zimmer Switzerland Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Zimmer Switzerland Manufacturing GmbH, Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet Taiwan Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet (Thailand) Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Biomet 3i Turkey, Other Affiliate Zimmer Tibbi Cihazlar Sanayi ve Ticaret AS, Other Affiliate Zimmer Gulf FZ LLC, Other Affiliate Biomet 3i UK Ltd., Other Affiliate Biomet Acquisitions (Unlimited), Other Affiliate Biomet UK Ltd., Other Affiliate Biomet UK Healthcare Ltd., Other Affiliate CelgenTek UK Limited, Other Affiliate Centerpulse (UK) Ltd., Other Affiliate Zimmer Biomet UK Ltd., Other Affiliate Zimmer Trustee Ltd., Other Affiliate CelgenTek Innovations Corporation, Other Affiliate Zimmer Finance Ireland for Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. filed by Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subsidiaries)(Java, Sachin)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for attorney Parwana Noorzad to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9474506, filed by Defendant Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Parwana Noorzad)(Java, Sachin)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 Amended complaint against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. Filed by Patricia A. Kassay, Jeffrey T. Kassay. (Biggerman, Mark)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to excuse appearance of Lead Counsel, and Representative at Case Management Conference filed by Defendant Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. Related document(s) #4 . (Java, Sachin)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for attorney Keely F. Morton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9473749, filed by Defendant Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Java, Sachin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Joseph W. Pappalardo and Sachin V. Java filed by on behalf of Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. (Pappalardo, Joseph)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 8/23/2019 at 10:15 AM at Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 8/2/2019. (M,S)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Biggerman, Mark)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, therefore were not issued. (Y,A)
June 20, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (Y,A)
June 20, 2019 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case, (Y,A)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9374733. Filed by Patricia A. Kassay, Jeffrey T. Kassay. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Biggerman, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kassay, et al. v. Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey T. Kassay
Represented By: Mark W. Biggerman
Represented By: William A. Carlin
Represented By: David J. Eardley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Kassay
Represented By: Mark W. Biggerman
Represented By: William A. Carlin
Represented By: David J. Eardley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Sachin V. Java
Represented By: Joseph W. Pappalardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?