Dobson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Victoria Dobson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv01424
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Referring Judge: James R Knepp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx executed upon Commissioner of Office of the Regional Chief Counsel - Social Security Administration on 6/26/2019, U.S. Attorney on 6/26/19 and Attorney General - Department of Justice on 6/26/19 filed on behalf of Victoria Dobson Related document(s) #5 . (K,AR)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant is granted a maximum of 60 days after the complaint has been served to file an answer and transcript. Within 30 days of the filing of the answer and transcript, Plaintiff shall file its Brief on the Merits. In the event Plaintiff's brief is not filed within 30 days of the answer, case may be subject to dismissal for want of prosecution. Defendant shall file its Brief on the Merits within 30 days thereafter. Plaintiff's Reply Brief, if any, shall be filed within 14 days of filing of Defendant's Brief. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,JM)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Original Summons issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, and Office of the U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,JM)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 6/21/2019. (S,JM)
June 20, 2019 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge John R. Adams on 6/20/2019. (B,R)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (B,R)
June 20, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (B,R)
June 20, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case, (B,R)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Victoria Dobson. Related document(s) #1 . (Margolius, Marcia)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Victoria Dobson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons Regional Chief Counsel SSA, #3 Summons US Attorney, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 USM-285 US Attorney, #6 USM-285 Attorney General, #7 USM-285 Regional Chief Counsel SSA) (Margolius, Marcia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dobson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Dobson
Represented By: Marcia W. Margolius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Ruchi Vikram Asher
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?