Optima Direct, LLC v. Everykey, LLC

Plaintiff: Optima Direct, LLC
Defendant: Everkey, LLC and Everykey, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01440
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Everykey, LLC. Service attempted by certified mail, marked unclaimed on 7/3/2019 filed on behalf of Optima Direct, LLC Related document(s) #4 . (S,SR)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/10/19. For purposes of clarification, the parties are advised that the Court's Order dated 7/2/19 was intended to terminate any upcoming telephonic and/or in-person conferences and hearings set by the previously assigned district judge. All other case management deadlines (including pleading amendment, discovery, expert, briefing, and dispositive motions deadlines) remain in effect. In addition, any referrals to the assigned Magistrate Judge (including for mediation and/or settlement conferences) remain in effect. Any status, final pre-trial and trial dates set to take place before the previously assigned district judge will be reset at a later date. (S,G)
July 2, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Everykey, LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70123460000041350921. (W,Jo)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] All deadlines and hearings set by the previous District Judge are terminated and will be reset forthwith. Any deadlines or hearing dates imposed by the referral Magistrate Judge remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 07/02/2019. (W,RA) Modified text on 7/2/19. (D,MA)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Everykey, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
June 24, 2019 This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (B,R)
June 24, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R)
June 24, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (B,R)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Optima Direct, LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Optima Direct, LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Everykey, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9378264.. Filed by Optima Direct, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US Pat No 8,498,618, #2 Exhibit 2 - US Pat No 8,115,609, #3 Exhibit 3 - Exemplary Claim Chart, #4 Exhibit 4 - Exemplary Claim Chart, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons) (Wernow, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Optima Direct, LLC v. Everykey, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Optima Direct, LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everkey, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everykey, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?