Shotwell v. Miller Recovery Service, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Ray Shotwell
Defendant: Miller Recovery Service, Inc., Miller Vance and Miller Rosa
Case Number: 1:2019cv01444
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 Joint Motion for extension of time until August 29, 2019 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint of Otherwise Plead Miller Recovery Service, Inc. answer due 8/29/2019; Miller Rosa answer due 8/29/2019; Miller Vance answer due 8/29/2019.. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 8/16/2019.(R,Sh)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Joint Motion for extension of time until August 29, 2019 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint of Otherwise Plead filed by Miller Recovery Service, Inc., Miller Rosa, Miller Vance. (Frondorf, Alexander)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' #5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 16, 2019 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint or Otherwise Plead. Miller Recovery Service, Inc. answer due 8/16/2019; Miller Rosa answer due 8/16/2019; Miller Vance answer due 8/16/2019. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 7/18/2019.(R,Sh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 16, 2019 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Miller Recovery Service, Inc., Miller Rosa, Miller Vance. (Frondorf, Alexander)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Miller Recovery Service, Inc. on 6/26/2019; Miller Rosa on 6/26/2019; Miller Vance on 6/26/2019, no delivery date on green cards, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Ray Shotwell Related document(s) #3 . (W,CM)
June 24, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Miller Recovery Service, Inc., receipt # 70173040000060334709, Miller Rosa, receipt # 70173040000060334723, Miller Vance, receipt # 70173040000060334716. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (Y,A)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Miller Recovery Service, Inc., Miller Rosa, Miller Vance. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Ray Shotwell. (Attachments: #1 Marzett Dean Consent Form, #2 Ray Shotwell Consent Form, #3 Allen Trimble Consent Form)(Griffin, Lori)
June 24, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A)
June 24, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (Y,A)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Miller Recovery Service, Inc., Miller Rosa, Miller Vance. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9379030. Filed by Ray Shotwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Miller Recovery Service, Inc., #3 Summons to Vance Miller, #4 Summons to Rosa Miller) (Griffin, Lori)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shotwell v. Miller Recovery Service, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Recovery Service, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander R. Frondorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Vance
Represented By: Alexander R. Frondorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Rosa
Represented By: Alexander R. Frondorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Shotwell
Represented By: Lori M. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?