Monetari v. Shima Limousine Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steven Monetari
Defendant: Shima Limousine Service, Inc. and Michelle Carothers
Case Number: 1:2019cv01450
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Thomas M. Parker for further proceedings. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 8/22/19. (LC,S) re #5
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge filed by All Defendants. (Ehrnfelt, Walter)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Defendants' motion for extension of time to move, plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is granted to 8/26/19. #4 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/29/19.(D,Ma)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for extension of time until August 26, 2019 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Michelle Carothers, Shima Limousine Service, Inc.. (Ehrnfelt, Walter)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 8/27/2019 at 9:00 am to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/02/19. (D,Ma)
July 2, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Michelle Carothers, receipt # 70171070000082062441, Shima Limousine Service, Inc., receipt # 70171070000082062434 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (Y,A)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Michelle Carothers, Shima Limousine Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
June 24, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,R)
June 24, 2019 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, (B,R)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9380634.. Filed by Steven Monetari. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Simon, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monetari v. Shima Limousine Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Monetari
Represented By: James L. Simon
Represented By: Clifford P. Bendau, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shima Limousine Service, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew M. Medoro
Represented By: Walter F. Ehrnfelt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Carothers
Represented By: Andrew M. Medoro
Represented By: Walter F. Ehrnfelt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?