Yamama, Inc., et al. v. Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company
Plaintiff: ZRNR Properties Enterprises, LLC and Yamama, Inc.
Defendant: Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Co. and Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01463
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Sh)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 10/8/2019 at 11:00 AM at Chambers 17A before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 8/2/2019. (R,Sh)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Insurance Policy)(Cahill, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Order. [non-document] The court construes the parties' #4 Stipulation for Leave to Plead as a Motion for Leave. The motion is granted. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 7/12/2019. (R,Sh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Stipulation for Leave to Plead filed by All Defendants. (Cahill, Robert)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,A)
June 25, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (Y,A)
June 25, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (Y,A)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement and second page of the civil cover sheet filed by Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Co. (Cahill, Robert) Modified text on 6/26/2019 (S,SR).
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County, case number CV 19 915813 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $400. receipt number 0647-9383030. Filed by Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint original complaint) (Cahill, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yamama, Inc., et al. v. Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Co.
Represented By: Robert E. Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company
Represented By: Robert E. Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZRNR Properties Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Ziad K. Tayeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yamama, Inc.
Represented By: Ziad K. Tayeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?