Trupanion, Inc. v. Embrace Pet Insurance Agency, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trupanion, Inc.
Defendant: Embrace Pet Insurance Agency, LLC, Cleverland Holdings LLC d/b/a Embrace Pet Insurance and Cleverland Holdings LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01471
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #11 Unopposed/Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and to continue case management conference. Cleverland Holdings LLC and Embrace Pet Insurance Agency, LLC answer due 9/16/2019. Case management conference RESET for 9/20/2019 at 2:00 PM. Counsel for plaintiff is to set up the call by calling Chambers with all counsel on the line at 216-357-7151 or providing call-in information to all counsel and the Court. Parties shall be available by phone, if needed. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/16/2019.(D, I)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 9/15/19 to answer , respond or otherwise plead in response to the Complaint, Joint Motion to continue Case Management Conference and attendant deadlines to 9/15/19 filed by Plaintiff Trupanion, Inc.. (Rawlin, Dustin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Case Management Conference with telephonic conference to be held on 8/30/2019 at 2:00 PM before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. This Court requires the participation of lead counsel. Counsel for plaintiff is to set up the call by calling Chambers with all counsel on the line at 216-357-7151 or providing call-in information to all counsel and the Court. Parties shall be available by phone, if needed. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting, #2 Consent Package)(D, I)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motions for attorneys Ryan S. Benyamin, James C. Yoon and Erik J. Carlson to appear pro hac vice (Related Doc #'s #6 , #7 , #8 ). Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 7/12/2019.(H,CM)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' #9 Motion for extension of time until 8/16/2019 to Answer. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 7/12/2019.(H,CM)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 16, 2019 to answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Cleverland Holdings LLC, Embrace Pet Insurance Agency, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Auvil, Steven)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for attorney Erik J. Carlson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9405522, filed by Plaintiff Trupanion, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration Of Erik J. Carlson)(Rawlin, Dustin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for attorney James C. Yoon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9405491, filed by Plaintiff Trupanion, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration Of James C. Yoon)(Rawlin, Dustin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for attorney Ryan S. Benyamin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9405410, filed by Plaintiff Trupanion, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration Of Ryan S. Benyamin)(Rawlin, Dustin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Cleverland Holdings LLC on 6/26/2019, filed on behalf of Trupanion, Inc. (Rawlin, Dustin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Embrace Pet Insurance Agency, LLC on 6/26/2019, filed on behalf of Trupanion, Inc. (Rawlin, Dustin)
June 26, 2019 Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: Duplicate filing fee (accidental). Receipt #: 0647-9384424, filed by Trupanion, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Rawlin, Dustin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Cleverland Holdings LLC, Cleveland Holdings Statutory Agent and Embrace Pet Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Cleverland Statutory Agent, #2 Summons Embrace Pet, #3 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
June 26, 2019 This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (B,R)
June 26, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (B,R)
June 26, 2019 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, (B,R)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate American Pet Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Trupanion Australia Pty Ltd. for Trupanion, Inc. filed by Trupanion, Inc.. (Rawlin, Dustin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Embrace Pet Insurance Agency, LLC and Cleverland Holdings LLC. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9384424. Filed by Trupanion, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark, #3 Summons Cleverland Holdings LLC, #4 Summons Cleverland Holdings LLC, #5 Summons Embrace, #6 Exhibit A - Transcript, #7 Exhibit B - 530 Patent, #8 Exhibit C - 530 Patent Chart, #9 Exhibit D - 993 Patent, #10 Exhibit E - 993 Patent Chart) (Rawlin, Dustin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trupanion, Inc. v. Embrace Pet Insurance Agency, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Embrace Pet Insurance Agency, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy W. Dutra
Represented By: Theresa A. Rakocy
Represented By: Steven M. Auvil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleverland Holdings LLC d/b/a Embrace Pet Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleverland Holdings LLC
Represented By: Jeremy W. Dutra
Represented By: Theresa A. Rakocy
Represented By: Steven M. Auvil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trupanion, Inc.
Represented By: Dustin B. Rawlin
Represented By: Ryan S. Benyamin
Represented By: Erik J. Carlson
Represented By: Allison R. Burke
Represented By: James C. Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?