Moore, et al. v. Harris, et al.
Plaintiff: Carl L. Moore and Ronnie Moore
Defendant: Rachel Hartshorn and Donald Harris
Case Number: 1:2019cv01507
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 7:25
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order of Case Dismissal. As the parties appear to agree that federal court jurisdiction is lacking, the Motions to Dismiss (Doc. Nos. 4, and 5) are granted. This action is dismissed without prejudice to any state law claims Plaintiff may seek to pursue in a court with jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 8/28/2019. (R,Sh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to dismiss case without prejudice, with brief in support. Filed by Carl L. Moore, Ronnie Moore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (W,Jo)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to Dismiss filed by Donald Harris. Related document #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter showing districts licensed)(Harris, Donald) Wrong event used, modified on 7/31/2019 (W,CM).
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim with memorandum in support filed by Defendant Rachel Hartshorn. (Harris, Donald - s/by Rachel Hartshorn). Modified on 7/19/2019 to correct event
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided therefore were not issued. (Y,A)
July 2, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (Y,A)
July 2, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (Y,A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore, et al. v. Harris, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Hartshorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Harris
Represented By: Donald R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?