Savoca v. United States Department of Justice, et al.
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Savoca
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice and Executive Office of the United States Attorney's
Case Number: 1:2019cv01545
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Supplement to #1 Complaint filed by Thomas J. Savoca. (W,CM)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of prisoner filed by Plaintiff Thomas J. Savoca. (W,Jo)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to be brought forth for Evidence hearings filed by Plaintiff Thomas J. Savoca. (W,CM)
July 18, 2019 Copy of #3 Order mailed to Plaintiff, Thomas J. Savoca, #20970-008, Hazelton P.O. Box 2000, Bruceton Mills, WV 26525 on 7/18/2019. (S,AA)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order: Within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall either (1) pay the filing fee of $400.00, or (2) complete and file an application to proceed in forma pauperis; failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert on 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Financial Application)(S,AA)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover sheet #1 filed by Thomas J. Savoca. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(S,KM)
July 18, 2019 Filing fee was not paid and no IFP Motion was provided. A blank IFP Form was mailed to Thomas J Savoca #20970-008 at Hazelton P.O. Box 2000, Bruceton Mills, WV 26525 on 7/18/19. Related document(s) #1 . (Y,A)
July 8, 2019 Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of the second page of the Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Without the entire Civil Cover Sheet, the Clerk does not know if this case is related to or is a refiling of a pending/terminated case in this Court., Copy of complaint and a blank civil cover sheet mailed to Thomas J. Savoca at P.O. Box 2000, Bruceton Mills, WV 26525 on 7/8/19. (Y,A)
July 8, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (Y,A)
July 8, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case, (Y,A)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Executive Office of the United States Attorney's, Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. Filing fee not paid. Filed by Thomas J. Savoca. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1- Letter from Dept of Justice, #3 Exhibit Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Letter from Sheriff of Jackson County, #5 Exhibit Letter to Traders Bank, #6 Exhibit 5- US Dept of Justice Documents, #7 Exhibit 6- Docket and Partial Transcript) (Y,A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savoca v. United States Department of Justice, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office of the United States Attorney's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Savoca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?