Noco Company v. Ko
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Defendant: John Ko
Case Number: 1:2019cv01547
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon John Ko. Service attempted by certified mail on 8/10/2019 filed on behalf of Noco Company (S,KM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(T,Je)
July 10, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to John Ko placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70183090000032259997. (Y,A)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon John Ko. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
July 8, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (Y,A)
July 8, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case, (Y,A)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against John Ko. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9402743. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Pinney, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noco Company v. Ko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Represented By: Sean P. Malone
Represented By: David R. Posteraro
Represented By: Jon J. Pinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?