KeyBank National Association v. Interlogic Outsourcing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: KeyBank National Association
Defendant: Interlogic Outsourcing, Inc., Najeeb Khan, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Berkshire Bank and JPMorgan Chase
Case Number: 1:2019cv01566
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 55 Notice of Service of Subpoena to Wells Fargo Bank N.A. filed by KeyBank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Wells Fargo)(Kaufman, Steven)
August 28, 2019 Filing 54 Case Management Plan and Trial Order. Case is assigned to the Standard Track; Deadline to add parties or amend pleadings 1/17/2020; Deadline for completing non-expert discovery 4/3/2020; The parties have agreed to a method for conducting discovery of electronically-stored information; Deadline for party with burden of proof to identify experts and provide reports 4/17/2020; Deadline to identify rebuttal experts and provide reports 5/22/2020; Deadline for completing expert discovery 6/19/2020; Deadline for filing dispositive motions 7/10/2020; Deadline for filing oppositions to motions 8/7/2020; Deadline for filing replies to responses 8/21/2020; Status Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 11:00 a.m.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 1:00 p.m.; Jury Trial set on two week standby period beginning 11/9/2020 at 8:00 a.m. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Final Pretrial Order, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List, #3 Appendix C - Witness List) (D,S)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order: Before this Court is the joint motion of plaintiff KeyBank National Association (KeyBank) and defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (JPMC) to stay this litigation as to defendant JPMC. (Doc. No. #51 .) No party has filed any opposition to the motion to stay litigation as to defendant JPMC.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is granted and this litigation is stayed as to JPMC. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/28/2019.(D,N)
August 28, 2019 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi: A telephonic case management conference was held on 8/28/19 before Judge Sara Lioi. Attorney Frank DeSantis, Attorney Steven Kaufman, Attorney Katherine Poldneff, and Attorney Mark Butscha participated on behalf of plaintiff KeyBank. Attorney Paul Harold and Attorney Jesse Barrett participated on behalf of defendant Najeeb Khan. Attorney John Alten participated on behalf of defendant JPMorgan Chase. No attorney participated on behalf of defendant Interlogic as litigation is stayed against Interlogic. The Court discussed the pending motion of KeyBank and JPMorgan to stay litigation as to JPMorgan given defendant Interlogic's bankruptcy notice. No party opposed the motion to stay litigation as to JPMorgan. The Court discussed the possibility of staying litigation as to defendant Khan too. After hearing from counsel for KeyBank and counsel for Khan, the Court elected to move forward with the case and set dates and deadlines, which will be published in the separate case management plan and trial order. The parties advised the Court that resolution is unlikely at this time. The Court reminded the parties of their obligation to file 45-day joint status reports. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 25 minutes. (D,N)
August 27, 2019 Filing 52 Answer to #3 Amended complaint,, filed by Najeeb Khan. (Harold, Paul)
August 27, 2019 Filing 51 Motion to stay KeyBank and JPMorgan Chase Bank's Motion to Stay Litigation as to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Steven)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order to Dismiss Party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Plaintiff's Motion to dismiss party is granted and Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is dismissed from this action without prejudice. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/27/2019. (Related Doc #48 ) (O,K)
August 23, 2019 Filing 49 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f) and LR 16.3(b)(3) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by KeyBank National Association. (Kaufman, Steven)
August 22, 2019 Filing 48 Motion to dismiss party Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, NA Without Prejudice filed by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Steven)
August 21, 2019 Filing 47 Stipulated Protective Order regarding continental documents. (Related Doc. No. #44 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 8/21/2019. (D,N)
August 21, 2019 Filing 46 Supplement to Joint Motion for protective order - Stipulated Protective Order, filed by KeyBank National Association. Related document(s) #44 . (Kaufman, Steven)
August 21, 2019 Filing 45 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy by Defendant Interlogic Outsourcing, Inc. filed by KeyBank National Association. (DeSantis, Frank)
August 12, 2019 Filing 44 Joint Motion for protective order filed by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order)(Kaufman, Steven)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting defendant's motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Erin J. Cox for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #42 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 8/12/2019.(T,Je)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting defendant's motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney David H. Fry for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #41 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 8/12/2019.(T,Je)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting, in part, the joint motion of plaintiff Key Bank National Association and defendant Interlogic Outsourcing, Inc. to extend the answer deadline of defendant Interlogic Outsourcing, Inc. (Doc. No. #43 .) Defendant Interlogic Outsourcing, Inc. must file its answer or other responsive pleading no later than August 27, 2019. It is so ordered. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/6/2019.(D,N)
August 5, 2019 Filing 43 Joint Motion for extension of time until 10/04/2019 to answer (Interlogic Outsourcing, Inc.) filed by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association. (Butscha, Mark)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting, in part, the motion of defendant Well Fargo Bank, N.A. to extend the answer deadline. (Doc. No. #40 .) Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. must file its answer or other responsive pleading no later than August 27, 2019. It is so ordered. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/1/2019.(T,Je)
August 1, 2019 Filing 42 Motion for attorney Erin J. Cox to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9448925, filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Erin J. Cox)(Kovach, Thomas)
August 1, 2019 Filing 41 Motion for attorney David H. Fry to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9448897, filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David H. Fry)(Kovach, Thomas)
August 1, 2019 Filing 40 Stipulated Motion for additional time, until 9/4/2019, to answer or otherwise respond to complaint filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Kovach, Thomas)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting, in part, the motion of defendant JPMorgan Chase to extend the answer deadline. (Doc. No. #39 .) Defendant JPMorgan Chase must file its answer or other responsive pleading no later than August 27, 2019. It is so ordered. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/1/2019.(T,Je)
August 1, 2019 Filing 39 Stipulated Motion for leave to plead until 09/03/2019 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase. (Alten, John)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting the parties' joint #38 motion for extension of time up to and including 8/7/19 to determine the budget for defendant Khan's ordinary course personal expenses. (Doc. No. #38 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 8/1/2019. (T,Je)
July 31, 2019 Filing 38 Joint Motion for extension of time until 08/07/2019 to Determine Budget for Ordinary Course Personal Expenses filed by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeSantis, Frank)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting, in part, the motion of defendant Najeeb Khan to extend answer deadline. (Doc. No. #36 .) Defendant Khan must file his answer or other responsive pleading no later than August 27, 2019. It is so ordered. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/24/2019.(D,N)
July 24, 2019 Filing 37 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Berkshire Bank c/o CT Corporation filed on behalf of KeyBank National Association. Related document(s) #5 . (O,K)
July 22, 2019 Filing 36 Agreed Motion for extension of time until September 3, 2019 to answer filed by Defendant Najeeb Khan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Barrett, Jesse)
July 22, 2019 Filing 35 Attorney Appearance by Jesse M. Barrett filed by on behalf of Najeeb Khan. (Barrett, Jesse)
July 22, 2019 Filing 34 Attorney Appearance by Paul Edgar Harold filed by on behalf of Najeeb Khan. (Harold, Paul)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order: The current Agreed Preliminary Injunction Order (Doc. No. #26 ) is dissolved, effective immediately. The Court construes Doc. No. #32 as a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 to dismiss defendant Berkshire without prejudice and the same is granted. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/19/2019. (D,N)
July 19, 2019 Filing 32 Joint Motion for Stipulated Dissolution of Agreed Preliminary Injunction Order as to Berkshire Bank and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Berkshire Bank Without Prejudice filed by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association. Related document #26 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Steven)
July 18, 2019 Filing 31 Notice of Filing Returns of Service (Return of Service by personal service executed) upon Berkshire Bank on 7/15/2019; Interlogic Outsourcing, Inc. on 7/15/2019; JPMorgan Chase on 7/12/2019; Najeeb Khan on 7/12/2019; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. on 7/15/2019, filed on behalf of KeyBank National Association Related document(s) #9 , #7 , #2 , #1 , #5 , #13 , #3 , #8 , #12 , #4 , #14 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service JPMorgan Chase, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service Najeeb Khan, #3 Exhibit C - Return of Service Interlogic Outsourcing, #4 Exhibit D - Return of Service Wells Fargo, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Service Berkshire Bank)(Poldneff, Katherine)
July 18, 2019 Filing 30 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order: Telephone case management conference, with counsel only, to be held on August 28, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Sara Lioi. The telephone conference will be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. After all counsel are on line, plaintiff's counsel is to place the call to the Chambers of the Honorable Sara Lioi at (330) 252-6060. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by August 7, 2019. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by August 14, 2019. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(D,N)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: In light of the stipulated preliminary injunction orders (Doc. Nos. #26 , #27 , #29 ), the hearing on the motions for preliminary injunction scheduled for 7/17/19 at 1:00 P.M. is canceled. So ordered. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/16/2019. (D,N)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order: Upon consideration of the Motion for Stipulated Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. #13 ) filed by plaintiff KeyBank National Association and agreed to by defendant Najeeb Khan, and pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court finds-based on the Motion and the Verified First Amended Complaint (Doc. No. #3 )-that preliminary injunctive relief is warranted. Accordingly, KeyBank's motion is hereby GRANTED and Khan is hereby ENJOINED as contained in this Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/16/2019. (D,N)
July 16, 2019 Filing 28 Motion for preliminary injunction as to Defendant Najeeb Khan filed by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeSantis, Frank)
July 16, 2019 Filing 27 Agreed Preliminary Injunction Order: It is hereby ordered that JPMorgan Chase, as the recipient of funds transferred from defendant Interlogic Outsourcing, Inc.'s ("Interlogics") account with KeyBank (as more specifically set forth in Exhibit B to the Verified First Amended Complaint), and its respective officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys, and all other persons who are in active concert or participation with it, shall maintain and preserve all funds transferred into the JPMorgan Chase accounts identified in Exhibit B to the Verified First Amended Complaint prior to the date of entry of the initial Temporary Restraining Order issued in this action (Doc. No. #8 ) as described below, and not disburse or otherwise dispose of them pending further Order of the Court except as described below, and that JPMorgan Chase use commercially reasonable efforts to reverse any transactions for any such funds that have been disbursed or disposed of prior to receipt of notice of the Court's initial Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. No. #8 ).See Order for complete details. Related Documents: #25 , #4 . Judge Sara Lioi on 7/16/2019. (T,Je)
July 16, 2019 Filing 26 Agreed Preliminary Injunction Order: It is hereby ordered that Berkshire, as the recipient of funds transferred from defendant Interlogic Outsourcing, Inc.'s ("Interlogics") account with KeyBank (as more specifically set forth in Exhibit B to the Verified First Amended Complaint), and its respective officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys, and all other persons who are in active concert or participation with it, shall maintain and preserve all funds transferred into the Berkshire accounts identified in Exhibit B to the Verified First Amended Complaint prior to the date of entry of the initial Temporary Restraining Order issued in this action (Doc. No. #8 ), and not disburse or otherwise dispose of them pending further Order of the Court, and that Berkshire and KeyBank shall use commercially reasonable efforts, if any are available, to reverse any transactions for any such funds that have been disbursed or disposed of prior to receipt of notice of the Courts initial Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. No. #8 ).See Order for complete details. (Related Documents #23 , #4 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 7/16/2019.(T,Je)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Plaintiff's (Doc No. #24 ) Motion to Withdraw Motion for Expedited Discovery is granted. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/16/2019.(O,K)
July 16, 2019 Filing 25 Motion to Enter Agreed Preliminary Injunction Order as Against JPMORGAN CHASE filed by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association. Related document(s) #4 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Steven)
July 16, 2019 Filing 24 Motion to withdraw motion for expedited discovery filed by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association. Related document(s) #20 . (Kaufman, Steven)
July 16, 2019 Filing 23 Motion to Enter Agreed Preliminary Injunction Order as Against Berkshire Bank filed by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association. Related document(s) #4 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Steven)
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 Attorney Appearance by John M. Alten and Michael N. Ungar filed by on behalf of JPMorgan Chase. (Alten, John)
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 Proposed Order re Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by KeyBank National Association. Related document(s) #20 , #4 . (Kaufman, Steven)
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 WITHDRAWN per 7/16/2019 non-document order - Motion Expedited Discovery filed by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association. Related document(s) #4 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documentsto Berkshire Bank)(Kaufman, Steven) Modified to note withdrawn on 7/16/2019 (O,K).
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(T,Je)
July 12, 2019 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi: A telephone conference was held on 7/12/19 by Judge Sara Lioi. Attorney Steven Kaufman and Attorney Katherine Poldneff participated on behalf of plaintiff KeyBank National Association. Attorney Robert Fogarty participated on behalf of defendant Berkshire Bank. Attorney John Alten participated on behalf of defendant JPMorgan Chase. The Court discussed plaintiff's motion to amend the temporary restraining order. (Doc. No. #17 .) The Court confirmed that counsel for defendants Berkshire Bank and JPMorgan Chase were aware of plaintiff's motion to amend and agreed to the amendments as represented in plaintiff's motion. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 10 minutes. (D,N)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order granting Motion to amend Temporary Restraining Order (Related Doc Nos. #4 , #8 , and #17 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 7/12/2019.(D,N)
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 Motion to Enter Agreed Amended Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association. Related document(s) #8 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amended TRO)(Kaufman, Steven)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order: The current Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. No. #8 ) is dissolved as to defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. only, effective immediately, but the Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. No. #8 ) shall remain in effect as to all other defendants. (Related Doc #15 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 7/12/2019.(T,Je)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 Motion for voluntary dissolution of Temporary Restraining Order as to Wells Fargo Bank N.A. filed by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association. Related document(s) #8 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dissolve TRO)(Kaufman, Steven)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Christopher Kip Schwartz for KeyBank National Association. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/12/2019. (Related Doc #12 ) (O,K)
July 11, 2019 Minutes of proceedings [non-document]: A telephone conference was held on 7/11/2019 by Judge Sara Lioi. Attorney Frank DeSantis and Attorney Curtis Tuggle participated on behalf of plaintiff KeyBank National Association. Attorney Jessy Barrett and Attorney Paul Harold participated on behalf of defendant Najeeb Khan. The Court discussed the pending motion for temporary restraining order filed by plaintiff KeyBank National Association. The Court confirmed that defendant Khan's counsel were notified of the motion for temporary restraining order, agreed to the temporary restraining order, and were aware of the date and time of the hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction. The parties also advised the Court that they are discussing the possibility of a receiver and are working towards a possible resolution of the motion for the preliminary injunction. The plaintiff indicated that it may be filing a second amended complaint. (Court Reporter: none) Time: 10 minutes. (O,K)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Setting a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction for 7/17/2019 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 530 before Judge Sara Lioi. Plaintiff's counsel shall serve a copy of the court's Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. No. #14 ) and provide notice of the date, time and place of the hearing in accordance with Federal Civil Rule 65(d)(2). Judge Sara Lioi on 7/11/2019. (O,K)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 Temporary Restraining Order: See order for details. A preliminary injunction hearing will be held on 7/17/2019 at 1:00 p.m.. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/11/2019. (O,K)
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 Motion for temporary restraining order filed by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeSantis, Frank)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 Motion for attorney Christopher Kip Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9410194, filed by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schwartz Admissions, #2 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Kaufman, Steven)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Gregory Ayers Thompson filed by on behalf of Berkshire Bank. (Thompson, Gregory)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Robert J. Fogarty filed by on behalf of Berkshire Bank. (Fogarty, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Najeeb Khan. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (T,Je)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Setting a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction for 7/17/2019 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 530 before Judge Sara Lioi. Plaintiff's counsel shall serve a copy of the court's Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. No. #8 ) and provide notice of the date, time and place of the hearing in accordance with Federal Civil Rule 65(d)(2). Judge Sara Lioi on 7/10/2019. (D,N)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Temporary Restraining Order: See order for details. A preliminary injunction hearing will be held on July 17, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/10/2019. (D,N)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 65(b)(1)(B) Certification filed by KeyBank National Association. (Kaufman, Steven)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons to Najeeb Khan filed by KeyBank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Najeeb Khan)(DeSantis, Frank)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Berkshire Bank (Pittsfield & Boston, MA addresses), Interlogic Outsourcing, Inc., JPMorgan Chase (New York, NY & Columbus, OH addresses), Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Sacramento, CA and Columbus, OH addresses). (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL)
July 10, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
July 10, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction filed by Plaintiff KeyBank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Burns Declaration, #2 Proposed Order TRO Order)(Kaufman, Steven)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 First Amended complaint for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, Permanent Injunction and Damages against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Berkshire Bank, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase. Filed by KeyBank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Master Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Outgoing Wires Spreadsheet, #3 Summons Berkshire Summons 1, #4 Summons Berkshire Summons 2, #5 Summons Wells Fargo Summons 1, #6 Summons Wells Fargo Summons 2, #7 Summons JPMorgan Summons 1, #8 Summons JPMorgan Summons 2) (Kaufman, Steven)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Key Corp. for KeyBank National Association filed by KeyBank National Association. (Ware, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Interlogic Outsourcing, Inc., Najeeb Khan. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9406321.. Filed by KeyBank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. - Master Agreement, #2 Exhibit B. - Interlogic Outgoing Wires, #3 Summons to Interlogic Outsourcing, Inc., #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ware, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KeyBank National Association v. Interlogic Outsourcing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KeyBank National Association
Represented By: Robert F. Ware
Represented By: Curtis L. Tuggle
Represented By: Sara A. Smoter
Represented By: Mark R. Butscha
Represented By: Katherine M. Poldneff
Represented By: Christopher Kip Schwartz
Represented By: Frank R. DeSantis
Represented By: Steven S. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interlogic Outsourcing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Najeeb Khan
Represented By: Paul Edgar Harold
Represented By: Jesse M. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: David H. Fry
Represented By: Thomas G. Kovach
Represented By: Erin J. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Bank
Represented By: Robert J. Fogarty
Represented By: Gregory Ayers Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase
Represented By: John M. Alten
Represented By: Michael N. Ungar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?