Cain Thomas v. University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center
Plaintiff: JAMIA CAIN THOMAS
Defendant: University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv01576
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2019 Filing 10 Letter Plaintiff's Estimated Attorney's Fees and Budget filed by Jamia Cain Thomas. (Bailey, Donyetta)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center. (Israel, Rachael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Rachael L. Israel, Rachael L. Israel and In Son J. Loving filed by on behalf of University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center. (Israel, Rachael)
August 1, 2019 Copy of #6 Initial Discovery Protocols Order and #7 Telephonic Case Management Conference Scheduling Order mailed to Marcie A. Manson, Associate General Counsel, University Hospitals Health System, UH Management Services Center, 3605 Warrensville Center Rd., Shaker Heights, OH 44122 on 8/1/2019. Related document(s) #6 , #7 . (JLG)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Telephonic Case Management Conference to be held on 9/18/2019 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at 330-884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Attachment No. 3, #4 Attachment No. 4, #5 Attachment No. 5) (JLG)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Discovery Protocols Order. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/1/2019. (JLG)
July 28, 2019 Filing 5 First Amended complaint with Jury Demand against University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center. Filed by Jamia Cain Thomas. (Bailey, Donyetta)
July 28, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Jamia Cain Thomas. University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center waiver sent on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 filed on behalf of Jamia Cain Thomas (Bailey, Donyetta)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order The Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) in this action was filed on 7/10/2019, and no summons has been provided or issued. if Plaintiff's counsel does not receive a returned Waiver of the Service of Summons from Defendant by 8/9/2019, she shall immediately file a Praecipe for Issuance of the original summons. The summons to be issued to Defendant should be uploaded as an attachment to the Praecipe. See LR 4.2, if service of the summons will be made by certified mail. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 7/26/2019. (JLG)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided therefore were not issued. (Y,A)
July 11, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (Y,A)
July 11, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case, (Y,A)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9408667. Filed by Jamia Cain Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-Letter from US Equal Employment Opportunity Commission , #3 Exhibit 2-Dismissal and Notice of Rights) (Bailey, Donyetta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cain Thomas v. University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMIA CAIN THOMAS
Represented By: Donyetta D. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center
Represented By: In Son J. Loving
Represented By: Rachael L. Israel
Represented By: Kerin L. Kaminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?