Sideris v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jamie Hope Sideris
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv01594
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Referring Judge: David A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service by Certified Mail executed upon the U.S. Attorney on 7/17/2019, Commissioner of Social Security on 7/19/2019 and the Attorney General on 7/23/2019 filed on behalf of Jamie Hope Sideris (Osterhout, Karl)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 7/16/2019. (G,CA)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
July 12, 2019 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 7/12/19. (Y,A)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (Y,A)
July 12, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A)
July 12, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case, (Y,A)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Social Security Number filed by Jamie Hope Sideris. (Osterhout, Karl)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9413531. Filed by Jamie Hope Sideris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Atty Summons, #3 Summons OCG Summons, #4 Summons Atty Gen Summons) (Osterhout, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sideris v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lynne H. Buck
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Hope Sideris
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?