Noco Company v. Skid Auto, LLC
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Defendant: Skid Auto, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01796
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of Dismissal. Plaintiff has filed a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), seeking to voluntarily dismiss this action with prejudice. Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby dismissed with prejudice at the Plaintiff's request with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and court costs. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 9/3/2019. Related document #3 .(M,S)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Noco Company. (Malone, Sean).
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Skid Auto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
August 8, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (Y,A)
August 8, 2019 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case, (Y,A)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Skid Auto, LLC. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9458348. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Sales on eBay, #3 Exhibit C - Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (Pinney, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noco Company v. Skid Auto, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Represented By: Jon J. Pinney
Represented By: Sean P. Malone
Represented By: David R. Posteraro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skid Auto, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?