Medical Mutual of Ohio vs Dynotag, Inc.
Plaintiff: Medical Mutual of Ohio
Defendant: Dynotag, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01851
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order of Voluntary Case Dismissal, with prejudice, at Plaintiff's costs. Related document #6 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 9/27/2019. (R,Sh)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Medical Mutual of Ohio. (Wilson, Glenn)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Medical Mutual of Ohio. (Wilson, Glenn)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service by counsel by certified mail executed upon Dynotag, Inc. on 8/19/2019, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Medical Mutual of Ohio (Related document(s) #1 , #3 ). (Kruse, Mark)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Dynotag, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (D,TM)
August 14, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (D,TM)
August 14, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (D,TM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Supplement to Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet filed by Medical Mutual of Ohio. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Wilson, Glenn)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Dynotag, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9470466.. Filed by Medical Mutual of Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trademark Registration, #2 Exhibit Trademark Registration, #3 Exhibit Trademark Registration, #4 Exhibit Trademark Registration, #5 Exhibit Trademark Registration, #6 Exhibit Trademark Registration, #7 Exhibit Trademark Registration, #8 Exhibit Trademark Registration, #9 Exhibit Trademark Registration, #10 Exhibit Emergency Contact Information Product, #11 Exhibit Federal Trademark Application, #12 Exhibit Press Release, #13 Exhibit Press Release, #14 Exhibit Article, #15 Exhibit Article, #16 Exhibit Demand Letter) (Wilson, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medical Mutual of Ohio vs Dynotag, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynotag, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medical Mutual of Ohio
Represented By: Glenn R. Wilson
Represented By: Mark F. Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?