United States of America et al v. Postal Fleet Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: United States of America and Rodney Stahl
Defendant: Postal Fleet Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01900
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Amanda M Knapp
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Reply in support of #55 Motion to dismiss filed by Postal Fleet Services, Inc.. (Rendon, Carole)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Opposition to #55 Motion to dismiss filed by Rodney Stahl, United States of America. (Mendenhall, Warner)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 United States' Statement of Interest Addressing the Supreme Court's Escobar Decision filed by United States of America. Related document(s) #55 .(Deucher, Elizabeth)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Postal Fleet Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Rendon, Carole)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Stipulation and Order: Respondent's Initial Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #50 ) is MOOT in light of Relator's filing of an #51 amended complaint. Respondent shall have until February 8, 2023 to file its motion to dismiss (or otherwise respond to) Relator's amended complaint. Relator shall have until March 10, 2023 to file an opposition to Respondent's anticipated motion to dismiss. Respondent shall have until March 31, 2023 to file a reply brief in support of its anticipated motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 1/17/2023. (Related document #53 ) (S,S)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Joint Proposed Stipulation on Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule filed by Postal Fleet Services, Inc.. (Kash, Kendall)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Attorney Appearance by Kendall C. Kash filed by on behalf of Postal Fleet Services, Inc.. (Kash, Kendall)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Amended complaint against Postal Fleet Services, Inc.. Filed by United States of America, Rodney Stahl. (Mendenhall, Warner)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Postal Fleet Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Shively, Douglas)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Notice regarding November 18th, 2022 document production filed by Postal Fleet Services, Inc.. Related document(s) #46 .(Rendon, Carole)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 11/7/2022. (S,S)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]. Notwithstanding any provision in the Protective Order (ECF Doc. #48 ), no party shall file a document or information under seal without leave of Court granted in advance. Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 11/7/2022. (S,S)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Stipulated Motion for protective order filed by Defendant Postal Fleet Services, Inc. (Rendon, Carole)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Stipulation and Order. Relator hereby withdraws his motion for default judgment and amended motion for default judgment (ECF Nos. #26 and #27 ). The Parties hereby jointly request that the Court set aside the Clerk's entry of default (ECF No. #18 ) pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(c). The parties will file a proposed mutually-agreeable protective order and a Federal Rule of Evidence 408 order by November 4, 2022. Within 14 days following the Court's entry of a protective order and Rule 408 order, Postal Fleet shall produce to Relator a certain set of payroll and financial records previously produced to the government in response to the governments Civil Investigative Demand in connection with this matter, which consists of approximately 1.5 million files and 230 GB of data. The Parties shall notify the Court when Postal Fleet has produced the payroll and financial records previously identified. Postal Fleet shall have thirty (30) days from the noticed date of production to move to dismiss or otherwise respond to Relator's complaint, unless the thirtieth day falls on a weekend or holiday, in which case Postal Fleet shall have until the next business day to file its motion or pleading; Postal Fleet shall not file any motion to dismiss earlier than thirty (30) days from the date of production. Discovery is otherwise stayed pending resolution of Postal Fleet's anticipated motion to dismiss, including any motion to dismiss an amended complaint if one is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 10/12/2022. (Related documents #1 , #10 , #32 , #41 , #45 ) (S,S)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]. Pursuant to the Stipulation and Order dated 10/12/2022 (ECF Doc. #46 ), the Entry of Default (ECF Doc. #18 ) is hereby set aside and vacated. Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 10/12/2022. (S,S)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Joint Proposed Stipulation and [Proposed] Order filed by Postal Fleet Services, Inc.. (Shively, Douglas)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Joint Status Report , Stipulation, and Proposed Order filed by Rodney Stahl. Related document(s) #41 .(Unger, Brian)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]. At the joint request of the parties (ECF Doc. #43 ), the parties are granted an additional week, until September 27, 2022, to advise the Court through a joint status report whether the parties have reached an agreement or narrowed any issues as to the pending motions, whether they have an agreed proposal for moving forward with the case procedurally, and whether there are any other matters for the Court's attention. The joint status report shall not exceed three double-spaced pages and shall be signed by counsel for all parties. Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 9/21/2022. (D,PA)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Joint Status Report filed by Rodney Stahl. Related document(s) #41 .(Unger, Brian)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]. At the joint request of the parties (ECF Doc. 42), the parties are granted an additional week, until September 20, 2022, to advise the Court through a joint status report whether the parties have reached an agreement or narrowed any issues as to the pending motions, whether they have an agreed proposal for moving forward with the case procedurally, and whether there are any other matters for the Courts attention. The joint status report shall not exceed three double-spaced pages and shall be signed by counsel for all parties. Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 9/14/2022. (D,PA)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Joint Status Report filed by Postal Fleet Services, Inc.. Related document(s) #41 .(Shively, Douglas)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Minute Order of Telephone Conference held on 8/30/2022. Counsel for the parties shall meet and confer with each other and file a Joint Status Report no later than September 13, 2022. The Joint Status Report shall advise the Court whether the parties have reached an agreement or narrowed any issues as to the pending motions, whether they have an agreed proposal for moving forward with the case procedurally, and whether there are any other matters for the Courts attention. The joint status report shall not exceed three double-spaced pages and shall be signed by counsel for all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 8/31/2022. (Time: 10 min.) (S,S)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice [non-document]. The case management conference scheduled on 8/30/2022 at 2:00 p.m. is converted to a telephonic status conference with counsel only. Lead counsel for each party is expected to attend. Bridge line instructions will be emailed to counsel for the parties. (D,PA)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp for further proceedings. Related Document #38 . Judge John R. Adams on 08/17/2022. (M,TL)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp assigned to case pursuant to consent. Judge John R. Adams terminated. Related document(s) #40 . (P,G)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures filed by Postal Fleet Services, Inc.. (Shively, Douglas)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Joint Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Rodney Stahl. Related document(s) #36 .(Mendenhall, Warner)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Initial Disclosures notice of service filed by Rodney Stahl. (Unger, Brian)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with telephonic case management conference to be held on 8/30/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge John R. Adams. Judge John R. Adams on 8/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, #2 Local Rule 30.1, #3 Magistrate Consent Form, #4 Budget, #5 ECF Policies and Procedures)(L,J)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ReAssignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 20021-15. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (M,TL)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Reply to response to #27 Amended Motion for default judgment and Reply in support of Respondent's Motion to set aside default filed by Postal Fleet Services, Inc.. (Rendon, Carole)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Attorney Appearance by Emily S. P. Baxter filed by on behalf of Postal Fleet Services, Inc.. (Baxter, Emily)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Reply in support of #27 Amended Motion for default judgment and Opposition to Respondents Motion to Set Aside Default filed by Rodney Stahl. (Mendenhall, Warner)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Opposition to #27 Amended Motion for default judgment and Motion to set aside default filed by Postal Fleet Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Waters Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Waters Decl. - USPS Termination Letter, #3 Exhibit 2 to Waters Decl. - Waters-Mendenhall Emails, #4 Exhibit 3 to Waters Decl. - Washington Post Article)(Rendon, Carole)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Marginal Entry Order granting #30 Defendant's unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to Relator's Amended Default Judgment Motion until April 21, 2022. Judge John R. Adams on 3/24/2022.(L,J)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Unopposed Motion for extension of Time to Respond to Relator's Amended Default Judgment Motion until April 21, 2022 filed by Defendant Postal Fleet Services, Inc.. Related document(s) #27 . (Rendon, Carole)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Attorney Appearance by Douglas L. Shively filed by on behalf of Postal Fleet Services, Inc.. (Shively, Douglas)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Attorney Appearance by Carole S. Rendon filed by on behalf of Postal Fleet Services, Inc.. (Rendon, Carole)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Amended Motion for default judgment filed by Plaintiff Rodney Stahl. Related document(s) #26 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Perlmuter Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1-1 Contract 440N9, #3 Exhibit 1-2 Contract 280N6, #4 Exhibit 1-3 Wage determination letter 77-0195, #5 Exhibit 1-4 Wage determination letter 77-0193, #6 Exhibit 1-5 7445 HCR 440N9, #7 Exhibit 1-6 7445 HCR 280N6, #8 Exhibit 1-7 PFS 2019 contracts, #9 Exhibit 1-8 Stahl and Pryor benefits sheet, #10 Exhibit 1-9 Pryor time sheet 11/16/18-11/30/18, #11 Exhibit 1-10 Pryor time sheet 12/1/18-12/15/18, #12 Exhibit 1-11 Pryor time sheet 2/16/19-2/28/19, #13 Exhibit 1-12 Pryor time sheet 3/16/19-3/31/19, #14 Exhibit 1-13 Stahl time sheet 1/16/19-1/31/19, #15 Exhibit 1-14 Stahl time sheet 2/1/19-2/15/19, #16 Exhibit 1-15 DOL press release, #17 Exhibit 1-16 Page 1, 2015 financial statement notes, #18 Exhibit 1-17 PFS 2013 Form 5500, #19 Exhibit 1-18 PFS 2014 Form 5500, #20 Exhibit 1-19 PFS 2015 Form 5500, #21 Exhibit 1-20 PFS 2016 Form 5500, #22 Exhibit 1-21 PFS 2017 Form 5500, #23 Exhibit 1-22 PFS 2018 Form 5500, #24 Exhibit 1-23 PFS 2019 Form 5500, #25 Exhibit 2 Mendenhall Declaration)(Mendenhall, Warner)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Motion for default judgment filed by Plaintiff Rodney Stahl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Perlmuter Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1-1 Contract 440N9, #3 Exhibit 1-2 Contract 280N6, #4 Exhibit 1-3 Wage determination letter 77-0195, #5 Exhibit 1-4 Wage determination letter 77-0193, #6 Exhibit 1-5 7445 HCR 440N9, #7 Exhibit 1-6 7445 HCR 280N6, #8 Exhibit 1-7 PFS 2019 contracts, #9 Exhibit 1-8 Stahl and Pryor benefits sheet, #10 Exhibit 1-9 Pryor time sheet 11/16/18-11/30/18, #11 Exhibit 1-10 Pryor time sheet 12/1/18-12/15/18, #12 Exhibit 1-11 Pryor time sheet 2/16/19-2/28/19, #13 Exhibit 1-12 Pryor time sheet 3/16/19-3/31/19, #14 Exhibit 1-13 Stahl time sheet 1/16/19-1/31/19, #15 Exhibit 1-14 Stahl time sheet 2/1/19-2/15/19, #16 Exhibit 1-15 DOL press release, #17 Exhibit 1-16 Page 1, 2015 financial statement notes, #18 Exhibit 1-17 PFS 2013 Form 5500, #19 Exhibit 1-18 PFS 2014 Form 5500, #20 Exhibit 1-19 PFS 2015 Form 5500, #21 Exhibit 1-20 PFS 2016 Form 5500, #22 Exhibit 1-21 PFS 2017 Form 5500, #23 Exhibit 1-22 PFS 2018 Form 5500, #24 Exhibit 1-23 PFS 2019 Form 5500, #25 Exhibit 2 Mendenhall Declaration)(Mendenhall, Warner) Modified text on 3/7/2022 (O,K).
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Marginal Entry Order granting #23 Relator's Motion to Extend the Deadline to file his motion for default judgment until March 4, 2022. Judge John R. Adams on 2/15/2022.(L,J)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Notice of withdrawal of Assistant United States Attorney David M. DeVito filed by United States of America. Related document(s) #15 .(Deucher, Elizabeth) Modified text on 2/7/2022 (M,TL).
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Motion for extension of time to file motion for default judgment until March 4, 2022 filed by Plaintiff Rodney Stahl. (Unger, Brian)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Attorney Appearance by Brian C. Unger filed by on behalf of Rodney Stahl. (Unger, Brian)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Marginal Entry Order granting in part and denying in part #19 Relators' Motion to Extend Deadlines. Relators shall move for default judgment by no later than 2/2/2022. Judge John R. Adams on 1/3/2022.(L,J)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Response to #19 Motion for extension of to File Motion for Default Judgment until February 28, 2022 filed by United States of America. (Deucher, Elizabeth)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment until February 28, 2022 filed by Rodney Stahl, United States of America. (Perlmuter, Scott)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Default Entered on 12/22/21 against Postal Fleet Services, Inc. Sandy Opacich, Clerk by Christin Kestner, Deputy Clerk. Related document(s) #17 . (K,C)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Postal Fleet Services, Inc. filed by Rodney Stahl, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Scott Perlmuter)(Perlmuter, Scott)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order that it appears from the docket that service was completed in this matter on October 12, 2021. To date, no answer or responsive pleading has been filed. If this matter has been resolved, the parties are instructed to file a dismissal by no later than December 30, 2021. If Defendant is in default, Plaintiff is instructed to seek default and default judgment by no later that December 30, 2021. Failure to take any action by December 30, 2021 will result in dismissal for want of prosecution. Judge John R. Adams on 12/20/2021. (L,J)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Steven J. Paffilas and adding attorney filed by United States of America. (Deucher, Elizabeth)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Proof of Service by personal service executed upon Postal Fleet Services, Inc. on 10/12/2021, filed on behalf of United States of America; Rodney Stahl (Perlmuter, Scott) Modified text on 10/27/2021 (D,Ju).
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Postal Fleet Services, Inc.. (W,CM)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Rodney Stahl, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Perlmuter, Scott)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order unsealing the complaint (Doc. #1 ) and motion to decline intervention (Doc. #10 ). Judge John R. Adams on 7/21/21. (K,C)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Election to Decline Intervention filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (H,SP)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order LAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint for Violation of Federal False Claims Act with jury demand against Postal Fleet Services, Inc. Filing fee paid. $400.00. Receipt # 54660007171. Filed by United States of America, Rodney Stahl. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (T,Je)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (S,He)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (S,He)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Postal Fleet Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: David M. DeVito
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Deucher
Represented By: Scott D. Perlmuter
Represented By: Steven J. Paffilas
Represented By: Steven J. Paffilas_AUSA
Represented By: Warner Mendenhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Stahl
Represented By: Warner Mendenhall
Represented By: Brian C. Unger
Represented By: Scott D. Perlmuter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Postal Fleet Services, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Represented By: Emily S. P. Baxter
Represented By: Kendall C. Kash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?