Noco Company v. Barber
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Defendant: Michael Barber
Case Number: 1:2019cv01935
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Voluntary Case Dismissal, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and court costs. Related document #4 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 8/28/2019. (R,Sh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Noco Company. (Malone, Sean)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Michael Barber. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
August 26, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (B,R)
August 26, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Michael Barber. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9487496.. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's sales on eBay, #3 Exhibit C - Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Pinney, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noco Company v. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Represented By: Sean P. Malone
Represented By: David R. Posteraro
Represented By: Jon J. Pinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?