Local 860, AFL-CIO Laborers' International Union of North America v. Kokosing Construction Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Local 860, AFL-CIO Laborers' International Union of North America
Defendant: Kokosing Construction Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02000
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Referring Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint and Counterclaim against Local 860, AFL-CIO Laborers' International Union of North America filed by Kokosing Construction Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. - Collective Bargaining Agreement, #2 Exhibit B. - Settlement Agreement)(Lampton, Nadia)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Management Conference with case management conference to be held on 12/10/2019 at 11:00 AM in Chambers 15B. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties Planning Meeting, #2 Consent Package)(S,HR)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Kokosing Construction Company, Inc. on 9/16/2019, filed on behalf of Local 860, AFL-CIO Laborers' International Union of North America Related document(s) #2 . (B,R)
September 11, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Kokosing Construction Company, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70161370000165783674. (S,AN)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Kokosing Construction Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
September 4, 2019 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, Judge Patricia A. Gaughan terminated. (Y,A)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The Clerk's Office has indicated that this case was assigned to the docket of Chief Judge Gaughan in error. Therefore, this case is returned to the Clerk's Office for proper assignment. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 9/3/19. (LC,S)
August 30, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A)
August 30, 2019 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, (Y,A)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Kokosing Construction Company, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9499520. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be a refiling of terminated case 1:19-cv-00467. Filed by Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 860, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit February 11, 2019 Agreement, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Guarino, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Local 860, AFL-CIO Laborers' International Union of North America v. Kokosing Construction Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kokosing Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Nadia A. Lampton
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlevey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 860, AFL-CIO Laborers' International Union of North America
Represented By: Joseph J. Guarino, III
Represented By: Basil W. Mangano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?