A. et al v. University Hospitals Health System, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Novak, Rebecca Novak, Melinda Brown, S. T., V. M., D. T., Renee Cottrill, B. R., P. P., A. H., Bill Fenell, Stacy Bayus, T. W., K. M. L., P. T., A. A., Daniel Bayus, E. T., A. M., Larry Cottrill, K. P., C. W., Hillary Fenell, Peter Brown, M. L. and W. M.
Defendant: University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, Inc., University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center, University Hospitals Health System, Inc., University Hospitals Medical Practice, Computer Aided Solutions, LLC d/b/a CAS Data Loggers and Computer Aided Solutions LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02026
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Chelsea R. Mikula filed by on behalf of University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, Inc., University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center, University Hospitals Health System, Inc., University Hospitals Medical Practice. (Mikula, Chelsea)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Michael C. Zellers filed by on behalf of University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, Inc., University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center, University Hospitals Health System, Inc., University Hospitals Medical Practice. (Zellers, Michael)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Edward E. Taber filed by on behalf of University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, Inc., University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center, University Hospitals Health System, Inc., University Hospitals Medical Practice. (Taber, Edward)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Rita A. Maimbourg filed by on behalf of University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, Inc., University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center, University Hospitals Health System, Inc., University Hospitals Medical Practice. (Maimbourg, Rita)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. University Hospitals Medical Practice waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Abbarno, Kenneth)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, Inc. waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Abbarno, Kenneth)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Abbarno, Kenneth)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. University Hospitals Health System, Inc. waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Abbarno, Kenneth)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided therefore were not issued. (Y,A)
September 4, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (Y,A)
September 4, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (Y,A)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9502994. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:19-cv-00180. Filed by K. M. L., P. P., Renee Cottrill, V. M., E. T., D. T., K. P., A. A., S. T., C. W., David Novak, A. M., P. T., Peter Brown, Stacy Bayus, Hillary Fenell, M. L., Rebecca Novak, A. H., W. M., Larry Cottrill, Daniel Bayus, T. W., B. R., Bill Fenell, Melinda Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Abbarno, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A. et al v. University Hospitals Health System, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Novak
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Novak
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Brown
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. T.
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. M.
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. T.
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Cottrill
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. R.
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P. P.
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. H.
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Fenell
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Bayus
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. W.
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. M. L.
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P. T.
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. A.
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bayus
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. T.
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. M.
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Cottrill
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. P.
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. W.
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillary Fenell
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Brown
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. L.
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. M.
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Chelsea R. Mikula
Represented By: Edward E. Taber
Represented By: Michael C. Zellers
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Represented By: Rita A. Maimbourg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Chelsea R. Mikula
Represented By: Edward E. Taber
Represented By: Michael C. Zellers
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Represented By: Rita A. Maimbourg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Hospitals Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Chelsea R. Mikula
Represented By: Edward E. Taber
Represented By: Michael C. Zellers
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Represented By: Rita A. Maimbourg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Hospitals Medical Practice
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Chelsea R. Mikula
Represented By: Edward E. Taber
Represented By: Michael C. Zellers
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark M. Abramowitz
Represented By: Rita A. Maimbourg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Computer Aided Solutions, LLC d/b/a CAS Data Loggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Computer Aided Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?