Skelton v. Prudential Financial, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James R. Skelton
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America, Pruco Securities, LLC, John Does and Prudential Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02083
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for Pruco Securities, LLC filed by Pruco Securities, LLC. (Kamps, Julie)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Prudential Financial, Inc.. (Kamps, Julie)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for Prudential Insurance Company of America filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Kamps, Julie)
October 28, 2019 Notice by Clerk that Prudential Financial, Inc. and Prudential Insurance Company of America failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (S,SR)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint In Its Entirety filed by Pruco Securities, LLC, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Insurance Company of America. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support - Defendants' Memorandum of Law In Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint In Its Entirety, #2 Exhibit A to MTD (Victoria Angle Declaration), #3 Exhibit B to MTD - (Computer printout of Ms. Skeltons beneficiaries), #4 Exhibit C to MTD (March 22, 2017 letter to Plaintiff), #5 Exhibit D to MTD - (January 4, 2018 letter to Plaintiff to process claim), #6 Exhibit E to MTD (IBM Contract), #7 Exhibit F to MTD - (Mr. Skelton's beneficiary designations), #8 Proposed Order)(Kamps, Julie)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR..... Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint In Its Entirety filed by Pruco Securities, LLC, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Insurance Company of America. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support - Defendants' Memorandum of Law In Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint In Its Entirety, #2 Exhibit A to MTD (Victoria Angle Declaration), #3 Exhibit B to MTD - (Computer printout of Ms. Skelton's beneficiaries), #4 Exhibit C to MTD (March 22, 2017 letter to Plaintiff), #5 Exhibit D to MTD - (January 4, 2018 letter to Plaintiff to process claim), #6 Exhibit E to MTD (IBM Contract), #7 Exhibit F to MTD - (Mr. Skelton's beneficiary designations), #8 Proposed Order)(Kamps, Julie) Modified on 10/16/2019 (W,Jo). Modified on 10/16/2019, Document marked private due to unredacted items, counsel to refile. (L,Ja).
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting #8 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until October 16, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants Pruco Securities, LLC, Prudential Financial, Inc. and Prudential Insurance Company of America answers due 10/16/2019.. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/8/2019.(L,Ja)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until October 16, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Pruco Securities, LLC, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kamps, Julie)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Order: [non-document] granting Defendants' Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Ian H. Morrison for Pruco Securities, LLC,Ian H. Morrison for Prudential Financial, Inc.,Ian H. Morrison for Prudential Insurance Company of America. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #7 ). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/24/2019.(L,Ja)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for attorney Ian H. Morrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9538760, filed by Pruco Securities, LLC, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Bulea, Donald)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 Copies of electronically filed documents received from Cuyahoga County Court, case number 19cv919553 on 9/19/2019. (L,MI)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Defendants' Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Julie M. Kamps for Pruco Securities, LLC, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Insurance Company of America. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #5 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/17/2019.(L,Ja)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Julie M. Kamps to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9526589, filed by Pruco Securities, LLC, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Bulea, Donald)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Order: [non-document] granting #4 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Pruco Securities, LLC., Prudential Financial, Inc., and Prudential Insurance Company of America's answer due 10/9/2019. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/12/2019.(L,Ja)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until October 9, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Pruco Securities, LLC, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bulea, Donald)
September 12, 2019 Copy of #3 Order, mailed to James R. Skelton, 8758 Eaton Drive,Sagamore Hills, OH 44067 on 9/12/2019. Related document(s) #3 . (L,Ja)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order: This matter was removed to this Court on September 11, 2019. For the convenience of the Court, and by no later than September 28, 2019, the parties are directed to refile herein any motions that were previously filed in state court and which remained pending at the time of removal. (Related Document #1 ). Enter Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/12/2019. (L,Ja) : #1 Corrected Entry) (L,Ja).
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,A)
September 11, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A)
September 11, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (Y,A)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 19 919553 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9517034. Filed by Pruco Securities, LLC, Prudential Insurance Company of America, Prudential Financial, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons (State Court), #3 Exhibit B - Harrell v. Allstate Opinion, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (State Court)) (Bulea, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skelton v. Prudential Financial, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Donald C. Bulea
Represented By: Julie M. Kamps
Represented By: Ian H. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pruco Securities, LLC
Represented By: Donald C. Bulea
Represented By: Julie M. Kamps
Represented By: Ian H. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Donald C. Bulea
Represented By: Julie M. Kamps
Represented By: Ian H. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Skelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?