Adams v. Frito-Lay, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Kenneth E Adams
Defendant: Ohio Department of Medicaid, Frito-Lay, Inc., Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation, John Doe and Rolling Frito-Lay Sales LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv02084
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Referring Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Frito-Lay, Inc.. (McGurk, Tracey)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to remand to State Court, Motion for attorney fees filed by Plaintiff Kenneth E Adams. (Horning, Gerald). Modified text on 10/29/2019 (S,SR).
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Case Management Conference with case management conference to be held on 1/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 15B. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties Planning Meeting, #2 Consent Package)(S,HR)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 Certified copy of state court documents received from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas. (S,SR)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Frito-Lay, Inc. and Rolling Frito-Lay Sales LP. (McGurk, Tracey) Modified text on 9/25/2019 (S,SR).
September 13, 2019 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, Judge James S. Gwin terminated. (B,R)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order of Recusal signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/13/2019. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. (S,KM)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate PepsiCo for Rolling Frito-Lay Sales LP filed by Rolling Frito-Lay Sales LP. (McGurk, Tracey)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate PepsiCo, Inc. for Frito-Lay, Inc. filed by Frito-Lay, Inc.. (McGurk, Tracey)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,A)
September 11, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A)
September 11, 2019 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (Y,A)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Answer to Cross-Claim with Jury Demand filed by Frito-Lay, Inc. (McGurk, Tracey)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Frito-Lay, Inc.. (McGurk, Tracey)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 19 919407 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9517306. Filed by Frito-Lay, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer of Medicaid and Cross-Claim Against Frito-Lay Defendants, #3 Exhibit Cuyahoga Court of Common Pleas Docket, #4 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet) (McGurk, Tracey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Frito-Lay, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Department of Medicaid
Represented By: Joseph M. McCandlish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frito-Lay, Inc.
Represented By: Tracey S. McGurk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolling Frito-Lay Sales LP
Represented By: Tracey S. McGurk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth E Adams
Represented By: Gerald R. Horning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?